California Eastern District Court
Judge:Daniel J Calabretta
Referred: Chi Soo Kim
Case #: 2:23-cv-02904
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2023
Terminated:Nov 04, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jun 09, 2024 3:05 AM PDT
Defendant
Todd Scrima
Represented By
John T. Cu
Hanson Bridgett LLP
contact info
Stella Padilla
Hanson Bridgett LLP
contact info
Kaylen K. Kadotani
Hanson Bridgett LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Movement Mortgage, LLC
Represented By
Corey Allen Johanningmeier
Bunsow Demory LLP
contact info
Gareth DeWalt
Bunsow De Mory LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 25 2024
(Lopez, K)ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 03/22/2024 GRANTING 8 Motion for Extension of Time. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's deadline to file an opposition to Defendant's 6 Motion to Dismiss shall be set for 04/02/2024, the deadline for Defendant to file any Reply in support of his 6 Motion to Dismiss shall run from 21 days following the filing of Plaintiff's Opposition, and that the hearing on Defendant's Motion remain scheduled for 05/09/2024.
GPO Jun 11 2024
rder. (Woodson, A)ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 6/10/2024 GRANTING IN PART as to Counts Three through Six, and DENYING IN PART as to Counts One and Two for the 6 Motion to Dismiss. An Amended Complaint must be filed within 30 days of this o
GPO Nov 04 2024
ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 11/4/2024 GRANTING 26 Motion to Change Venue and TRANSFERRING Case to USDC Western District of North Carolina. CASE CLOSED. (Kyono, V)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
misc Other Court Case Number Wed 11/13 11:54 AM
OTHER COURT CASE NUMBER from Western District of North Carolina case number 3:24-cv-00998. (Gonzalez, R)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
27 27 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Case Transferred Out - District Order on Motion to Change Venue Mon 11/04 9:25 AM
ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 11/4/2024 GRANTING26 Motion to Change Venue and TRANSFERRING Case to USDC Western District of North Carolina. CASE CLOSED. (Kyono, V)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
26 26 9 pgs motion Change Venue Tue 09/17 11:31 AM
MOTION to CHANGE VENUE by Todd Scrima. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (DJC) before District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta. (Padilla, Stella) Modified on 9/18/2024 (Salmeron, A).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Stella Padilla,
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice
Thursday, August 08, 2024
25 25 6 pgs order Scheduling Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Thu 08/08 10:50 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 8/8/2024 SETTING deadlines as follows: All Fact Discovery due by 5/15/2025; Initial Experts Disclosures due by 6/16/2025; Rebuttal Experts Disclosures due by 7/16/2025; All Expert Discovery due by 8/15/2025; Joint Mid-Discovery Statement Due by 1/4/2025; All Dispositive Motions due by 10/24/2025 and shall be noticed at the Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (DJC) before District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2026 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (DJC) before District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta; Jury Trial set for 4/27/2026 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (DJC) before District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta. Objections to this Scheduling Order due within 14 days of the entry of this Order. (Mendez Licea, O)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
24 24 27 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/07 4:51 PM
ANSWER by Todd Scrima. (Padilla, Stella)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
23 23 order Minute Order Fri 08/02 5:05 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 8/2/2024: On July 11, 2024, Plaintiff filed a First Amended Complaint. (ECF No.21 .) Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(3), a response to an amended pleading must be made within fourteen (14) days after service of the amended pleading. To date, Defendant has failed to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and has not requested an extension of time to do so. Accordingly, Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint within five (5) days. Defendant's failure to comply with this Order may result in monetary sanctions. IT IS SO ORDERED. [TEXT ENTRY ONLY] (Michel, G.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
22 22 7 pgs notice Notice (Other) Thu 07/11 4:40 PM
NOTICE of Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Movement Mortgage, LLC. (DeWalt, Gareth)
Related: [-]
21 21 28 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Thu 07/11 4:36 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Todd Scrima by Movement Mortgage, LLC. (DeWalt, Gareth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 41 pgs Exhibit E,
Att: 6 3 pgs Exhibit F,
Att: 7 2 pgs Exhibit G,
Att: 8 8 pgs Exhibit H,
Att: 9 6 pgs Exhibit I,
Att: 10 3 pgs Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Redline Complaint
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
20 20 13 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 06/11 11:55 AM
ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 6/10/2024 GRANTING IN PART as to Counts Three through Six, and DENYING IN PART as to Counts One and Two for the6 Motion to Dismiss. An Amended Complaint must be filed within 30 days of this order. (Woodson, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
19 19 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Motions Submitted/Under Advisement Order on Request Mon 05/06 11:39 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 5/6/2024: The Court GRANTS the parties' Joint Request for Waiver of Appearance and Oral Argument. (ECF No.18 ). Accordingly, Defendant's15 Motion to Dismiss, now calendared for 5/9/2024, is ORDERED submitted without appearance and without oral argument pursuant to Local Rule 230(g) and the hearing on said motion is VACATED. If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. IT IS SO ORDERED. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
18 18 2 pgs motion Request Fri 05/03 3:00 PM
REQUEST for JOINT REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AND ORAL ARGUMENT RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT by Todd Scrima. (Padilla, Stella)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
17 17 order Minute Order Thu 05/02 6:15 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 5/2/2024: The parties' Joint Request for Remote Appearance, ECF No.15 is DENIED. The parties shall appear in person at the hearing as previously scheduled. In lieu of appearing in person, the parties may file a joint request to waive appearance and oral argument, no later than close of business on Friday, May 4, 2024, after which the matter will be ordered submitted under E.D. Cal. L.R. 230(g). IT IS SO ORDERED. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/02 5:50 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by John T. Cu on behalf of Todd Scrima. Attorney Cu, John T. added. (Cu, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
15 15 2 pgs motion Request Wed 05/01 12:19 PM
JOINT REQUEST for Remote Appearance re6 Motion to Dismiss by Todd Scrima. (Padilla, Stella) Modified on 5/2/2024 (Licea Chavez, V).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
14 14 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/23 12:23 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Gareth DeWalt on behalf of Movement Mortgage, LLC. Attorney DeWalt, Gareth added. (DeWalt, Gareth)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
13 13 12 pgs misc Reply Mon 04/22 2:03 PM
REPLY by Todd Scrima re6 Motion to Dismiss. (Kadotani, Kaylen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
12 12 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/18 4:27 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Stella Padilla on behalf of Todd Scrima. Attorney Padilla, Stella added. (Padilla, Stella)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
11 11 22 pgs respm Opposition to Motion Tue 04/02 11:22 PM
OPPOSITION by Movement Mortgage, LLC to6 Motion to Dismiss. (Johanningmeier, Corey)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs misc Order Reassigning Newly Appointed Magistrate Judge (CSK) Tue 04/02 10:23 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim to the bench of the Eastern District of California, the court hereby reassigns this case from Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman to Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim for all further proceedings. (Woodson, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 03/25 11:33 AM
ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 03/22/2024 GRANTING8 Motion for Extension of Time. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's deadline to file an opposition to Defendant's6 Motion to Dismiss shall be set for 04/02/2024, the deadline for Defendant to file any Reply in support of his6 Motion to Dismiss shall run from 21 days following the filing of Plaintiff's Opposition, and that the hearing on Defendant's Motion remain scheduled for 05/09/2024. (Lopez, K)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
8 8 4 pgs motion Extension of Time Fri 03/15 12:59 PM
MOTION for 14-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by Movement Mortgage, LLC. (Johanningmeier, Corey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
7 7 order Minute Order Wed 03/06 1:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 3/6/2024: The parties shall file a Joint Status Report pursuant to the provisions of Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 and 26, in accordance with Local Rule 240 and the Court's Case Management Order referenced on Judge Calabretta's webpage under Case Management Procedures, within thirty (30) days after the Court's ruling on Defendant's6 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS SO ORDERED. [TEXT ENTRY ONLY] (Michel, G.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
6 6 11 pgs motion Dismiss Tue 03/05 2:36 PM
MOTION to DISMISS by Todd Scrima. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta. (Kadotani, Kaylen)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
5 5 2 pgs misc Stipulation Fri 02/02 1:12 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to respond to the1 Complaint by Todd Scrima. Attorney Kadotani, Kaylen K. ADDED. (Kadotani, Kaylen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
4 4 1 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/30 4:19 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Todd Scrima served on 1/23/2024, answer due 2/13/2024. (Johanningmeier, Corey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
3 3 4 pgs misc Civil New Case Documents for DJC Wed 12/13 12:18 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs Standing Order,
Att: 2 4 pgs Consent Form,
Att: 3 2 pgs VDRP
2 2 2 pgs service Summons Wed 12/13 12:17 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Todd Scrima* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Corey Allen Johanningmeier* *Bunsow DeMory LLP* *701 El Camino Real* *Redwood City, CA 94618*. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
1 1 25 pgs COMPLAINT against Todd Scrima by Movement Mortgage, LLC. Attorney Johanningmeier, Corey Allen added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11238179)(Johanningmeier, Corey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 4 7 pgs Exhibit D,
Att: 5 41 pgs Exhibit E,
Att: 6 3 pgs Exhibit F,
Att: 7 2 pgs Exhibit G,
Att: 8 8 pgs Exhibit H,
Att: 9 6 pgs Exhibit I,
Att: 10 3 pgs Exhibit J,
Att: 11 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet