California Central District Court
Judge:Serena R Murillo
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 8:23-cv-02364
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 11, 2024 1:27 AM PDT
Cross Claimant
Alfredo Valdez
Represented By
Sean Bruce Janzen
Engels Law Apc
contact info
Sarah K O'Brien
Engels Law Apc
contact info
Christopher Michael Engels
Engels Law Apc
contact info
Cross Claimant
RMP Safety Services Inc.
Represented By
Sean Bruce Janzen
Engels Law Apc
contact info
Sarah K O'Brien
Engels Law Apc
contact info
Christopher Michael Engels
Engels Law Apc
contact info
Cross Defendant
Michael Waters
11609 North Harrison Street
Kansas City, MO 64155
Cross Defendant
Michael Smith
Represented By
James K. Ulwelling
Ulwelling Law, Apc
contact info
Cross Defendant
Alpha Water Technologies LLC
Cross Defendant
Roes
Defendant
Alpha Water Technologies LLC
Defendant
RMP Safety Services Inc.
Represented By
Sean Bruce Janzen
Engels Law Apc
contact info
Sarah K O'Brien
Engels Law Apc
contact info
James K. Ulwelling
Ulwelling Law, Apc
contact info
Christopher Michael Engels
Engels Law Apc
contact info
Defendant
Michael Smith
Represented By
James K. Ulwelling
Ulwelling Law, Apc
contact info
Defendant
Alfredo Valdez
Represented By
Sean Bruce Janzen
Engels Law Apc
contact info
Sarah K O'Brien
Engels Law Apc
contact info
Christopher Michael Engels
Engels Law Apc
contact info
Defendant
Michael Waters
11609 North Harrison Street
Kansas City, MO 64155
Plaintiff
Global Financial and Leasing Services, LLC.
Represented By
Barry Wayne Ferns
Ferns Adams And Associates Apc
contact info
Dennis A Dressler
Dressler Peters LLC
contact info
Amanda Nichole Ferns
Ferns Adams And Associates Apc
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Alpha Water Technologies, LLC (Delaware)
115 Majorca Place
Placentia, CA 92870
ThirdParty Plaintiff
RMP Safety Services Inc.
Represented By
Sean Bruce Janzen
Engels Law Apc
contact info
Sarah K O'Brien
Engels Law Apc
contact info
Christopher Michael Engels
Engels Law Apc
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Alfredo Valdez
Represented By
Sean Bruce Janzen
Engels Law Apc
contact info
Sarah K O'Brien
Engels Law Apc
contact info
Christopher Michael Engels
Engels Law Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
115 115 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Tue 04/29 10:30 AM
CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Serena R. Murillo. (mku)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
114 114 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Mon 04/28 5:10 PM
MINUTES SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Serena R. Murillo: The Court sets the following schedule: Jury Trial set for 2/3/2026 at 9:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 1/15/2026 at 2:00 PM. Last Date to Hear Motions: 10/9/2025. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference: 10/23/2025. Motions in Limine with Proposed Orders: 12/4/2025. Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order: 12/18/2025. (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]