Texas Western District Court
Judge:Robert Pitman
Case #: 1:23-cv-01517
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2023
Terminated:Jun 05, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 11, 2024 4:19 AM CDT
Defendant
National Credit Audit Corporation
Represented By
Jason A. Spak
Fisherbroyles, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Claire Abernathy
Represented By
Joel Spencer Halvorsen
Halvorsen Klote
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 06/05 1:31 PM
ORDER, IT IS ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 06/05 1:29 PM
Case reassigned to Judge Robert Pitman. Judge Docket II - Austin no longer assigned to the case. (pg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
9 9 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 06/04 4:24 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to National Credit Audit Corporation by Claire Abernathy. (Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order Staying Case Tue 04/30 11:56 AM
ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 04/16 4:04 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to National Credit Audit Corporation by Claire Abernathy(Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 16, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Fri 02/16 1:58 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by National Credit Audit Corporation. (Spak, Jason)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/16 1:55 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Jason A. Spak added to party National Credit Audit Corporation(pty:dft) by National Credit Audit Corporation.(Spak, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/14 10:26 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Claire Abernathy. National Credit Audit Corporation served on 1/31/2024, answer due 2/21/2024. (Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 12/18 10:14 AM
Summons Issued as to National Credit Audit Corporation. (so)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 12/14 10:02 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Claire Abernathy. (Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/14 10:01 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18208104), filed by Claire Abernathy.(Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 12/18 10:12 AM
Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (so)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Mon 12/18 10:13 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower (so)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Mon 12/18 10:14 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Claire Abernathy. (so)
Related: [-]