Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:John F Kness
Case #: 1:23-cv-16765
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 11, 2024 4:01 AM CDT
Defendant
Breakthru Beverage Illinois, LLC
Represented By
Thomas M Horan
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
David J. Rowland
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Defendant
Liquor & Wine Sales Representatives, Warehousemen, Clerical, Distillery, Rectifying, Tire, Plastic and Allied Workers' Union, Local No. 3
Represented By
Patrick Joseph Calihan
Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Local 3 Liquor and Allied Workers Sales Division Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By
Garrick Joseph Gulino
Mcgann, Ketterman & Rioux
contact info
Travis J. Ketterman
Mcgann, Ketterman & Rioux
contact info
Ashley Lauren Stead
Mcgann, Ketterman & Rioux
contact info
Defendant
Tenzing Wine & Spirits, LLC
Represented By
Thomas M Horan
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
David J. Rowland
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Defendant
Trustees of the Local 3 Liquor and Allied Workers Sales Division Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By
Garrick Joseph Gulino
Mcgann, Ketterman & Rioux
contact info
Travis J. Ketterman
Mcgann, Ketterman & Rioux
contact info
Ashley Lauren Stead
Mcgann, Ketterman & Rioux
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael K Desmond
Represented By
Caryn Cecelia Lederer
Hughes Socol Piers Resnick Dym, Ltd.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
Morgan Mesi
Terminated: 02/20/2024
Represented By
Tory Tilton
Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym Ltd
contact info
Caryn Cecelia Lederer
Hughes Socol Piers Resnick Dym, Ltd.
contact info
Charles David Wysong
Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd.
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/25/2024 4:49 PM CDT
Thursday, December 14, 2023
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Keri L. Holleb Hotaling. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (daj, )
Related: [-]
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached[LINK:Consent To] [LINK:form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (daj, )
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT filed by Morgan Mesi; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21422682.(Lederer, Caryn)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lederer, Caryn)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Morgan Mesi by Caryn Cecelia Lederer (Lederer, Caryn)
Related: [-]
4 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Morgan Mesi by Charles David Wysong (Wysong, Charles)
Related: [-]
5 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Morgan Mesi by Tory Tilton (Tilton, Tory)
Related: [-]