Maryland District Court
Judge:Stephanie A Gallagher
Case #: 1:23-cv-03392
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2023
Terminated:Jul 31, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 11, 2024 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
AMCO Insurance Company
One Nationwide Blvd FRAP Solutions
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Laura Basem Jacobs
Budow And Noble, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Andover Condominium Association, Inc.
405 E. Joppa Road
Towson, MD 21286
Represented By
Brian S Goodman
Goodman Law Group, LLC
contact info
Judson Arnold
Goodman & Arnold, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
30 30 order Settlement Order Thu 08/01 8:16 AM
ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 7/31/2024. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
minutes Settlement Conference Thu 08/01 10:12 AM
Settlement Conference held on 7/15/2024 before Magistrate Judge Charles D. Austin. (rc2s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 06/03 1:04 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting28 Consent Motion for Extension of Scheduling Order deadlines. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 6/3/2024. (vals, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
28 28 motion Extension of Time Fri 05/31 9:33 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order by AMCO Insurance Company(Jacobs, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
order Order Tue 03/05 10:36 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER: The Settlement Conference set for Tuesday, August 6, 2024, is rescheduled to Wednesday, July 31, 2024, starting at 10 a.m. The deadline for ex parte submissions is Wednesday, July 17, 2024. All other guidelines set forth in the order dated February 20, 2024 (ECF 13) will remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles D. Austin on 3/5/2024. (cw5s, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/21 2:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Judson Arnold on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Arnold, Judson)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Wed 02/21 10:51 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by AMCO Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate NW-Peachtree, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Portales, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Tysons, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Athens Way, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Baseline, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Beech, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Buena Vista, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Carothers, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Castle Rock, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Civita NLAIC, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Civita, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Grapevine Bluffs, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Groves, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Ironhorse, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Lenexa II, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Lenexa, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Marketplace, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Mayo, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Millenia, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Naples, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Park Place, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Twin Lakes, LLC, Other Affiliate Ohio Center Hotel Company Limited, Other Affiliate Polyphony Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate Riverview Multi Series Fund, LL-Class Event, Other Affiliate Riverview Multi Series Fund, LL-Class N, Other Affiliate VN-3 Property Owners Association, Inc., Other Affiliate U.S. Regional Logistics Program, L.P. for AMCO Insurance Company.(Jacobs, Laura)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Wed 02/21 10:41 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by AMCO Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate AD Investments, LLC, Other Affiliate Broad Street Retail, LLC, Other Affiliate COLHOC Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate Jerome Village Residential Property Owners Association, Inc., Other Affiliate Co-investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate Brooke School Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate NTCIF-2011 Georgia State Investor, LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Life Tax Credit Partners 2009-A, LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Life Tax Credit Partners 2009-E, LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Life Tax Credit Partners 2009-F, LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Tax Credit Partners 2009-H, LLC, Other Affiliate Berkshire Crossing Development, LLC, Other Affiliate CHP New Markets Investment Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate Columbus Arena Management, LLC, Other Affiliate GPN-1 Property Owners Association, Inc., Other Affiliate Northstar Master Property Owners Association, Inc., Other Affiliate Northstar Residential Development, LLC, Other Affiliate NS Developers, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Amesbury, LLC, Other Affiliate Arena District Garage Condominium Association, Other Affiliate Arena District Swim Club Association, Other Affiliate ERN-4 Property Owners Association, Inc., Other Affiliate Jerome Village Master Property Owners Association, Inc., Other Affiliate NW Village Park, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-442 Ocean, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Amesbury II, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Amesbury III, LLC for AMCO Insurance Company.(Jacobs, Laura)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Wed 02/21 10:29 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by AMCO Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Scottsdale Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Titan Insurance Company, Other Affiliate scottsdale Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Veterinary Pet Insurance Company, Other Affiliate OCH Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Perimeter A, Ltd., Other Affiliate The Waterfront Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate Olentangy Reinsurance, LLC, Other Affiliate Registered Investment Advisors Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Titan Insurance Services, Inc., Other Affiliate V.P.I. Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Victoria Fire & Casualty Company, Other Affiliate Victoria Select Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Retention Alternatives Ltd., Other Affiliate NW-Riverchase, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-RPG Cranberry, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Ruby, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-San Marco, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-San Pablo, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Southbank, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Springfield, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Spring Hill, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-SR-16, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Sweetwater, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Townsend, LLC, Other Affiliate Old Track Street Owners Association, Inc., Other Affiliate Rail Street Parking, LLC, Other Affiliate Wellington Park, LLC for AMCO Insurance Company.(Jacobs, Laura)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Wed 02/21 10:18 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by AMCO Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate NWD Investments, LLC, Other Affiliate NWD Franklinton, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Jasper WAG, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Promenade at Madison, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Boise, LLC, Other Affiliate NWD Brodbelt, LLC, Other Affiliate NWD HP, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Englewood, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Escalante II, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Escalante, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-FSU, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Gallatin, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Gator Walk, LLC, Other Affiliate NWGH, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Holly Springs, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Holly Springs, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Hub13, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Huntersville, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Kingsbury, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Logan, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Midtown, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-UNCC, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Oakbrook, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-OG, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-ORBPD, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Pleasant Prairie, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Radius, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Rancho, LLC for AMCO Insurance Company.(Jacobs, Laura)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Wed 02/21 9:45 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by AMCO Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate NWD 205 Vine, LLC, Other Affiliate NWD 225 Nationwide, LLC, Other Affiliate NWD 230 West, LLC, Other Affiliate NWD 265 Neil, LLC, Other Affiliate NWD 275 Marconi, LLC, Other Affiliate NWD 300 Neil, LLC, Other Affiliate NWD 300 Spring, LLC, Other Affiliate NWD 355 McConnell, LLC, Other Affiliate NWD 425 Nationwide, LLC, Other Affiliate NWD 500 Nationwide, LLC, Other Affiliate NWD Arena Crossing, LLC, Other Affiliate NWD Arena District I, LLC, Other Affiliate NWD Arena District II, LLC, Other Affiliate NWD Arena District MM, LLC, Other Affiliate NWD Arena District PW, LLC, Other Affiliate NWD Arena District V, LLC, Other Affiliate NWD Athletic Club, LLC, Other Affiliate NWD 240 Nationwide, LLC, Other Affiliate NWD 250 Brodbelt, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Adams, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Asheville, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Beloit, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Broadway at Surf, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Colfax, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Conroe, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Corazon, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Cranberry, LLC, Other Affiliate NWD 250 West, LLC, Other Affiliate NW-Brandon LLC for AMCO Insurance Company.(Jacobs, Laura)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
20 20 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Tue 02/20 5:05 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by AMCO Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate NRI Equity Land Investments, LLC, Other Affiliate ND La Quinta Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate North of Third, LLC, Other Affiliate NRI Arena, LLC, Other Affiliate NRI Brooksedge, LLC, Other Affiliate NRI Builders, LLC, Other Affiliate NRI Cramer Creek, LLC, Other Affiliate NRI Equity Tampa, LLC, Other Affiliate NRI Office Ventures, Ltd., Other Affiliate NRI Telecom, LLC, Other Affiliate NFS Distributors, Inc., Other Affiliate NTCP 2011-A, LLC, Other Affiliate NTCIF-2011, LLC, Other Affiliate NNOV8, LLC, Other Affiliate NRI-Rivulon, LLC, Other Affiliate NTCP 2012-A, LLC, Other Affiliate NTCP 2013-C, LLC, Other Affiliate NTCP 2014-A, LLC, Other Affiliate NTCP 2014-B, LLC, Other Affiliate NTCP 2014-C, LLC, Other Affiliate NTCP 2015-A, LLC, Other Affiliate NTCP 2015-B, LLC, Other Affiliate NW REI, LLC, Other Affiliate NBS Insurance Agency, Inc., Other Affiliate NCS Arizona, LLC, Other Affiliate NLAIC REO Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate NLIC REO Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate NMIC REO Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate NRI Cavasson, LLC, Other Affiliate NRI Corporate Housing, LLC, Other Affiliate NTCP 2016-A, LLC, Other Affiliate NTCP 2017-A, LLC, Other Affiliate NW Fyrebyrd, LLC, Other Affiliate NW Next, LLC, Other Affiliate NW Private Debt, LLC, Other Affiliate NW REI (NLAIC), LLC, Other Affiliate NW REI (NLIC), LLC, Other Affiliate NW REI (NMFIC), LLC for AMCO Insurance Company.(Jacobs, Laura)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Tue 02/20 4:47 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by AMCO Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide SBL, LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Nationwide Life and Annuity Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Nationwide Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Nationwide Insurance Company of Florida, Other Affiliate Nationwide Insurance Company of America, Other Affiliate Nationwide Realty Investors, Ltd., Other Affiliate Nationwide Private Equity Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Realty Services, Ltd., Other Affiliate Nationwide Mutual Capital, LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Realty Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Investment Advisors, LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Investment Services Corporation, Other Affiliate Nationwide Retirement Solutions, Inc., Other Affiliate Nationwide Securities, LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Life Tax Credit Partners No. 1, LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Life Tax Credit Partners 2002-A, LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Life Tax Credit Partners 2002-B, LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Life Tax Credit Partners 2003-A, LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Life Tax Credit Partners 2003-B, LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Life Tax Credit Partners 2004-A, LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Life Tax Credit Partners 2004-F, LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Life Tax Credit Partners 2005-A, LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Life Tax Credit Partners 2005-B, LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Life Tax Credit Partners 2005-E, LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Life Tax Credit Partners 2009-I, LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Tax Credit Partners 2013-A, LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Tax Credit Partners 2013-B, LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Nationwide Sales Solutions, Inc. (fka Nationwide Member Solutions Agency Inc.), Other Affiliate Nationwide Trust Company, FSB, Other Affiliate Nationwide Ventures, LLC for AMCO Insurance Company.(Jacobs, Laura)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Tue 02/20 4:26 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by AMCO Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate National Casualty Company, Other Affiliate Nationwide Assurance Company, Other Affiliate Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Nationwide Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Lone Star General Agency, Inc., Other Affiliate Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America, Other Affiliate Nationwide Asset Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Cash Management Company, Other Affiliate Nationwide Corporation, Other Affiliate Jerome Village Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Other Affiliate Nationwide Financial Services, Inc., Other Affiliate National Casualty Company of America, Ltd., Other Affiliate Nationwide Financial Assignment Company, Other Affiliate Nationwide Financial General Agency, Inc., Other Affiliate Nationwide Financial Services Capital Trust, Other Affiliate Nationwide Fund Advisors, Other Affiliate Nationwide Fund Distributors LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Fund Management LLC, Other Affiliate Nationwide Arena, LLC, Other Affiliate Jefferson National Life Insurance Company of New York, Other Affiliate Nationwide Agent Risk Purchasing Group, Inc. (fka On Your Side Nationwide Insurance Agency, Inc.), Other Affiliate Nationwide General Insurance Company for AMCO Insurance Company.(Jacobs, Laura)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Tue 02/20 4:12 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by AMCO Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Harleysville Insurance Company of New Jersey, Other Affiliate Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Freedom Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Arena District CA I, LLC, Other Affiliate Arena District Owners Association, Other Affiliate CNRI-Cannonsport, LLC, Other Affiliate Grandview Yard Hotel Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate CNRI-Cannonsport Condominium, LLC, Other Affiliate Crewville, Ltd., Other Affiliate Grandview Yard Hotel, LLC, Other Affiliate DVM Insurance Agency, Inc., Other Affiliate Depositors Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Harleysville Insurance Company of New York, Other Affiliate Harleysville Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Crestbrook Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Discover Affordable Housing Investment Fund I LLC, Other Affiliate Eagle Captive Reinsurance, LLC, Other Affiliate American Tax Credit Fund 2023-A, LLC, Other Affiliate Cavasson Hotel Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Cavasson Hotel, LLC, Other Affiliate Danforth, LLC, Other Affiliate E-Risk Services, LLC, Other Affiliate GVY Residential, LLC, Other Affiliate Jefferson National Life Insurance Company for AMCO Insurance Company.(Jacobs, Laura)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Tue 02/20 3:42 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by AMCO Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate AMCO Insurance Company, Other Affiliate ALLIED Insurance Company of America, Other Affiliate American Marine Underwriters, Inc., Other Affiliate ADTV, LLC, Other Affiliate ALLIED Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate ALLIED Texas Agency, Inc., Other Affiliate 975 Rail Street, LLC, Other Affiliate 960 Bobcat Avenue, LLC, Other Affiliate 995 Yard Street, LLC, Other Affiliate AD DORA, LLC, Other Affiliate American Tax Credit Fund 2017-A, LLC, Other Affiliate American Tax Credit Fund 2017-B, LLC, Other Affiliate American Tax Credit Fund 2018-A, LLC, Other Affiliate American Tax Credit Fund 2018-B, LLC, Other Affiliate American Tax Credit Fund 2018-C, LLC, Other Affiliate American Tax Credit Fund 2019-A, LLC, Other Affiliate American Tax Credit Fund 2019-B, LLC, Other Affiliate American Tax Credit Fund 2020-A, LLC, Other Affiliate American Tax Credit Fund 2020-B, LLC, Other Affiliate American Tax Credit Fund 2021-A, LLC (aka American Tax Credit Fund 2020-C, LLC), Other Affiliate American Tax Credit Fund 2021-B, LLC, Other Affiliate American Tax Credit Fund 2021-C, LLC, Other Affiliate American Tax Credit Fund 2023-B, LLC (fka American Tax Credit Fund 2022-A, LLC), Other Affiliate American Tax Credit Fund 2023-C, LLC (fka American Tax Credit Fund 2022-B, LLC) for AMCO Insurance Company.(Jacobs, Laura)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Tue 02/20 3:24 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by AMCO Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate 775 Yard Street, LLC, Other Affiliate 800 Bobcat Avenue, LLC, Other Affiliate 805 Bobcat Avenue, LLC, Other Affiliate 75 Rivulon Boulevard, LLC, Other Affiliate 780 Yard Street, LLC, Other Affiliate 780 Yard Street, LLC, Other Affiliate 795 Rail Street, LLC, Other Affiliate 800 Goodale Boulevard, LLC, Other Affiliate 800 Yard Street, LLC, Other Affiliate 808 Yard Street, LLC, Other Affiliate 820 Goodale Boulevard, LLC, Other Affiliate 840 Third Avenue, LLC, Other Affiliate 860 Third Avenue, LLC, Other Affiliate 880 Third Avenue, LLC, Other Affiliate 845 Yard Street, LLC, Other Affiliate 895 W. Third Avenue, LLC, Other Affiliate 525 Cleveland Avenue, LLC, Other Affiliate 822 Williams Avenue, LLC, Other Affiliate 825 Junction Way, LLC, Other Affiliate 828 Bobcat Avenue, LLC, Other Affiliate 840 Yard Street, LLC, Other Affiliate 855 Third Avenue, LLC, Other Affiliate 875 First Avenue, LLC, Other Affiliate 880 Yard Street, LLC, Other Affiliate 950 Dorchester Way, LLC, Other Affiliate 950 Goodale Boulevard, LLC, Other Affiliate 500 Neil Avenue, LLC, Other Affiliate 515 Kilbourne Street, LLC, Other Affiliate 777 Swan Street, LLC for AMCO Insurance Company.(Jacobs, Laura)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Tue 02/20 3:06 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by AMCO Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate 10 W. Nationwide, LLC, Other Affiliate 1492 Capital, LLC, Other Affiliate 120 Acre Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate 400 West Nationwide Boulevard, LLC, Other Affiliate 425 West Nationwide Boulevard, LLC, Other Affiliate 44 Chestnut, LLC, Other Affiliate 1000 Yard Street, LLC, Other Affiliate 1015 Long Street, LLC, Other Affiliate 1050 Yard Street, LLC, Other Affiliate 1125 Rail Street, LLC, Other Affiliate 155 Rivulon Boulevard, LLC, Other Affiliate 275 Rivulon Boulevard, LLC, Other Affiliate 111 Rivulon Boulevard, LLC, Other Affiliate 1125 Yard Street, LLC, Other Affiliate 1175 Bobcat, LLC, Other Affiliate 161 Rivulon Boulevard, LLC, Other Affiliate 170 Marconi, LLC, Other Affiliate 18615 Claret Drive, LLC, Other Affiliate 18655 Claret Drive, LLC, Other Affiliate 18700 Hayden Road, LLC, Other Affiliate 18750 Hayden Road, LLC, Other Affiliate 220 Vine Street, LLC, Other Affiliate 245 Parks Edge Place, LLC, Other Affiliate 300 Rivulon Boulevard, LLC, Other Affiliate 310 Rivulon Boulevard, LLC, Other Affiliate 343 N. Front, LLC, Other Affiliate 400 Rivulon Boulevard, LLC, Other Affiliate 410 Rivulon Boulevard, LLC for AMCO Insurance Company.(Jacobs, Laura)
Related: [-]
13 13 4 pgs order Order for Settlement Conference Tue 02/20 2:30 PM
LETTER ORDER to counsel Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles D. Austin on 2/20/2024. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice Deficiency Notice Tue 02/20 9:34 AM
Deficiency Notice for AMCO Insurance Company -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 2/27/2024 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 02/16 1:47 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles D. Austin for Mediation. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/16/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Status Report Fri 02/16 10:22 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by AMCO Insurance Company(Jacobs, Laura)
Related: [-]
order Order Fri 02/16 1:46 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING10 Status Report and the request for modification of the Scheduling Order deadlines as set forth therein. Status Report due July 15, 2024. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/16/2024. (vals, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
9 9 order Scheduling Order Tue 02/06 10:45 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 6/20/2024.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/6/2024. (ah8s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/05 2:04 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by AMCO Insurance Company.(Jacobs, Laura)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order Fri 01/19 8:34 AM
ORDER that plaintiff file and serve by mail on the defendant a motion for entry of default by the Clerk and a motion for default judgment, or provide a report as to why such motions would be inappropriate, within 30 days of this order. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/19/2024. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/26 12:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andover Condominium Association, Inc.. AMCO Insurance Company served on 12/19/2023, answer due 1/9/2024.(Goodman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 12/14 2:53 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to AMCO Insurance Company. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Thu 12/14 1:55 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Andover Condominium Association, Inc. (Goodman, Brian)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Thu 12/14 1:53 PM
NOTICE by Andover Condominium Association, Inc. re1 Complaint, (Goodman, Brian)
Related: [-]
2 2 QC NOTICE:1 Complaint, filed by Andover Condominium Association, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to 1 . (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 12/14 1:17 PM
COMPLAINT against AMCO Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-10987226.), filed by Andover Condominium Association, Inc..(Goodman, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Exhibit
notice Deficiency Notice Thu 12/14 1:41 PM
Deficiency Notice for Andover Condominium Association, Inc.-- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 12/21/2023 (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Thu 12/14 1:40 PM
QC NOTICE:1 Complaint, filed by Andover Condominium Association, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to 1 . (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]