New York Southern District Court
Judge:Dale E Ho
Referred: Sarah Netburn
Case #: 1:23-cv-10871
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12132 Americans with Disabilities Act - Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2023
Terminated:Feb 08, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 11, 2024 4:51 AM EDT
Defendant
The Airplane Shop, Inc.
Plaintiff
Pedro Liz
Represented By
Gabriel Levy
Gabriel A. Levy, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, February 08, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order of Dismissal Thu 02/08 12:58 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been advised at ECF No. 7 that all claims asserted herein have been settled in principle, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and is hereby DISMISSED and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within thirty days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed by the aforementioned deadline; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, requests to extend the deadline to reopen are unlikely to be granted. If the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court by the deadline to reopen to be "so ordered" by the Court. Per the Court's Individual Rule No. 7, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are moot. All conferences are canceled. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 2/8/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
10 10 misc Letter Wed 02/07 2:26 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Gabriel A. Levy dated 2/7/24 re: RESPONSE TO ORDER (DOC 9). Document filed by Pedro Liz..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order Wed 02/07 12:52 PM
ORDER: In light of Defendant's overdue answer, Plaintiff was previously directed to file a letter with the Court by February 2, 2024, addressing whether Plaintiff's counsel has had any contact with Defendant or whether counsel intends to seek a Certificate of Default from the Clerk of Court and file a Motion for Default Judgment. To date, no such letter has been filed. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED to file that letter by February 8, 2024. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Court will recommend that the case be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/7/2024) (dsh)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 02/07 12:20 PM
NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Pedro Liz..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order Fri 01/26 4:41 PM
ORDER: Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Complaint was due on January 19, 2024. To date, Defendant has not appeared or responded to Plaintiff's Complaint. Accordingly, Plaintiff is directed to file a letter with the Court, by February 2, 2024, as to whether counsel has had any contact with the Defendant or whether counsel intends to seek an Order of Default from the Clerk of Court and file a Motion for Default Judgment. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/26/2024) (dsh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/04 11:45 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. The Airplane Shop, Inc. served on 12/29/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. Service was accepted by Craig Hawkins, CEO. Document filed by Pedro Liz..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 12/18 11:21 AM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 12/18/2023) (ks)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 12/15 10:34 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Airplane Shop, Inc...(jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Fri 12/15 10:30 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Gabriel Levy to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the incorrect Jury Demand code was selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 12/15 10:32 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Dale E. Ho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 12/15 10:33 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 12/15 10:33 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 12/14 3:59 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Airplane Shop, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Pedro Liz..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 12/14 3:58 PM
FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levy, Gabriel) Modified on 12/15/2023 (jgo)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 12/14 3:57 PM
COMPLAINT against The Airplane Shop, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28695810)Document filed by Pedro Liz..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]