Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Jennifer P Wilson
Case #: 1:23-cv-02080
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2023
Terminated:Dec 30, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 11, 2024 5:14 AM EDT
Defendant
George Kaldes
Represented By
David Dagle
Law Offices Of Peter J Russo, P.C.
contact info
Peter J. Russo
Law Offices Of Peter J. Russo, PC
contact info
Defendant
Photini Kaldes
Represented By
David Dagle
Law Offices Of Peter J Russo, P.C.
contact info
Peter J. Russo
Law Offices Of Peter J. Russo, PC
contact info
Defendant
Kaldes, Inc.
Represented By
David Dagle
Law Offices Of Peter J Russo, P.C.
contact info
Peter J. Russo
Law Offices Of Peter J. Russo, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Golden Bear Insurance Company
Represented By
Kristie M Abel
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Abby J Sher
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Cecil J. Jones
Cozen O'Connor
contact info

GPO Dec 30 2025
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 22 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Golden Bear Insurance Company. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 12/30/2024. (ve)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, December 30, 2024
31 31 order Judgment - Clerk Mon 12/30 11:16 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered in favor of Golden Bear Insurance Company. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/30/2024. (ve)
Related: [-]
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Mon 12/30 10:56 AM
ORDER (Memorandum filed previously as a separate entry) granting22 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 12/30/2024 (ve)
Related: [-]
29 29 24 pgs order Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry) Mon 12/30 10:56 AM
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re22 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Golden Bear Insurance Company. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 12/30/2024. (ve)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
28 28 8 pgs order Order on Motion to Intervene Tue 11/26 12:43 PM
ORDER denying26 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 11/26/2024 (ve)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
27 27 respm Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Wed 10/16 8:30 AM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re26 MOTION to Intervene filed by Golden Bear Insurance Company.(Sher, Abby)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A
Thursday, October 03, 2024
26 26 motion Intervene Thu 10/03 5:59 PM
MOTION to Intervene by James Bey, Esther Sinkler.(Britten, Seth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
25 25 respm Reply Brief Wed 09/11 4:35 PM
REPLY BRIEF re22 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Golden Bear Insurance Company.(Sher, Abby)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
24 24 respm Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Wed 08/28 5:00 PM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re22 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by George Kaldes, Photini Kaldes, Kaldes, Inc..(Dagle, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
23 23 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Tue 08/13 10:35 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re22 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Golden Bear Insurance Company.(Sher, Abby)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unpublished Opinion(s),
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
22 22 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Tue 08/13 9:59 AM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Golden Bear Insurance Company.(Sher, Abby)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo,
Att: 2 Unpublished Opinion(s),
Att: 3 Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
misc Docket Annotation Tue 08/13 10:09 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is directed to file the brief in support to Doc. 22 as a separate entry. (ve)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
21 21 order Case Management Order - Standard Track Wed 07/17 2:12 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 7/17/2024. (ve)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
19 19 misc Case Management Plan Thu 07/11 12:52 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (JOINT) by Golden Bear Insurance Company. (Sher, Abby)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
18 18 order Scheduling Order Tue 06/18 9:39 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT:The initial case management conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 will be conducted via telephone by the court on July 16, 2024, at 11:30 a.m.1 The parties shall call-in to the conference calling number 877-336-1828, using the access code 2529544. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 6/18/2024.(ve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Management Calendar
Friday, April 26, 2024
17 17 10 pgs order Order Fri 04/26 11:18 AM
CIVIL PRACTICE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 4/26/2024. (ve)
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs order Order Fri 04/26 11:17 AM
ORDER re Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 4/26/2024. (ve)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Letter Fri 04/26 11:17 AM
Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson (ve)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
order Verbal Order Reassigning Case Wed 04/17 2:51 PM
VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson for all further proceedings. (jkc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/22 3:54 PM
Amended ANSWER to1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by George Kaldes, Photini Kaldes, Kaldes, Inc..(Dagle, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/07 4:30 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by George Kaldes, Photini Kaldes, Kaldes, Inc..(Dagle, David)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Thu 03/07 2:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Dagle on behalf of All Defendants (Dagle, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
11 11 misc Consent Form Sent (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) Thu 02/22 9:06 AM
CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Golden Bear Insurance Company, George Kaldes, Photini Kaldes, Kaldes, Inc. YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 3/25/2024 (kjn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 02/14 1:36 PM
ORDER - AND NOW, this 14th day of February 2024, upon consideration of the Stipulation of the Parties filed on February 12, 2024 (Doc.9 ), the defendants shall file their Answer to the complaint on or before March 7, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daryl F. Bloom on 2/14/2024. (ae)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
9 9 misc Stipulation Mon 02/12 4:32 PM
STIPULATION of the Parties by George Kaldes, Photini Kaldes, Kaldes, Inc.. (Russo, Peter)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Mon 02/12 4:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Russo on behalf of George Kaldes, Photini Kaldes, Kaldes, Inc.. (Russo, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
7 7 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Wed 01/24 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cecil J. Jones on behalf of Golden Bear Insurance Company (Jones, Cecil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/02 2:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Golden Bear Insurance Company. Kaldes, Inc. served on 12/27/2023, answer due 1/17/2024. (Abel, Kristie)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/02 2:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Golden Bear Insurance Company. Photini Kaldes served on 12/27/2023, answer due 1/17/2024. (Abel, Kristie)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/02 2:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Golden Bear Insurance Company. George Kaldes served on 12/27/2023, answer due 1/17/2024. (Abel, Kristie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement Pursuant To FRCP 7.1 (Parent Corporations) Thu 12/14 4:56 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Golden Bear Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hall Holdings, Inc. for Golden Bear Insurance Company. (Abel, Kristie)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 12/14 4:43 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 12/14 4:42 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405, Receipt Number APAMDC-6491031), filed by Golden Bear Insurance Company.(sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D