New York Northern District Court
Judge:David N Hurd
Referred: Daniel J Stewart
Case #: 1:23-cv-01569
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2023
Terminated:Mar 14, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 11, 2024 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Victoria Storrs
Represented By
Catherine M. Hedgeman
Office Of Catherine M. Hedgeman
contact info
Defendant
PSE&G
Defendant
National Grid
Defendant
Jeanette M. Moy
Represented By
Meredith G. Lee-Clark
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Jody Monroe
Represented By
Thomas A. Shepardson
Whiteman, Osterman Law Firm - Albany
contact info
Anthony Bjelke
Whiteman, Osterman Law Firm - Albany
contact info
Defendant
James V. McDonald
Represented By
Meredith G. Lee-Clark
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Erik Kulleseid
Represented By
Meredith G. Lee-Clark
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
River Road Holding Co. II, LLC
Defendant
Robert J. Rodriguez
Represented By
Meredith G. Lee-Clark
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
George Kansas
Represented By
James T. Potter
Hinman, Straub Law Firm - Albany Office
contact info
Mark T. Sweeney
Sweeney Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Doreen Harris
Represented By
Meredith G. Lee-Clark
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Basil Seggos
Represented By
Meredith G. Lee-Clark
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Selkirk Fire District Board of Fire Commissioners
Represented By
Terence S. Hannigan
Hannigan Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Marie T. Dominguez
Represented By
Meredith G. Lee-Clark
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Town of Bethlehem
Represented By
James T. Potter
Hinman, Straub Law Firm - Albany Office
contact info
Mark T. Sweeney
Sweeney Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Albany Port District Commission
Represented By
Thomas A. Shepardson
Whiteman, Osterman Law Firm - Albany
contact info
Anthony Bjelke
Whiteman, Osterman Law Firm - Albany
contact info
Defendant
Town of Bethlehem Planning Board
Represented By
James T. Potter
Hinman, Straub Law Firm - Albany Office
contact info
Mark T. Sweeney
Sweeney Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Delmar-Bethlehem EMS
Defendant
Corning Hill Properties, LLC
Defendant
City of Rensselaer
Defendant
City of Albany
Represented By
Robert G. Magee
City Of Albany Corporation Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Rory M. Christian
Represented By
John J. Sipos
State Of New York Public Service Commission
contact info
Defendant
CSX Transportation, Inc.
Defendant
Town of Bethlehem Stormwater Manager
Represented By
James T. Potter
Hinman, Straub Law Firm - Albany Office
contact info
Mark T. Sweeney
Sweeney Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Town of East Greenbush
Defendant
Bethlehem Energy Center
Defendant
Town of Bethlehem Zoning Board of Appeals
Represented By
James T. Potter
Hinman, Straub Law Firm - Albany Office
contact info
Mark T. Sweeney
Sweeney Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Bethlehem Police Department
Represented By
James T. Potter
Hinman, Straub Law Firm - Albany Office
contact info
Mark T. Sweeney
Sweeney Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kirk Rhatigan
Represented By
Robert C. Dempf
Tobin And Dempf, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Barbara Riscavage
Represented By
Robert C. Dempf
Tobin And Dempf, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Angela Vanfonda
Represented By
Robert C. Dempf
Tobin And Dempf, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gertrude Prater
Represented By
Robert C. Dempf
Tobin And Dempf, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lorraine Thompson
Represented By
Robert C. Dempf
Tobin And Dempf, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dennis O'Leary
Represented By
Robert C. Dempf
Tobin And Dempf, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Amy Musiker
Represented By
Robert C. Dempf
Tobin And Dempf, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kerry McCarey
Represented By
Robert C. Dempf
Tobin And Dempf, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Valerian Masao
Represented By
Robert C. Dempf
Tobin And Dempf, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan Konas
Represented By
Robert C. Dempf
Tobin And Dempf, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Konas
Represented By
Robert C. Dempf
Tobin And Dempf, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy Gross
Represented By
Robert C. Dempf
Tobin And Dempf, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan Gross
Represented By
Robert C. Dempf
Tobin And Dempf, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nathaniel Gray
Represented By
Robert C. Dempf
Tobin And Dempf, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nick Esposito
Represented By
Robert C. Dempf
Tobin And Dempf, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lori Dempf
Represented By
Robert C. Dempf
Tobin And Dempf, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Christine Delsignore
Represented By
Robert C. Dempf
Tobin And Dempf, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kathleen Bohl
Represented By
Robert C. Dempf
Tobin And Dempf, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
John Bohl
Represented By
Robert C. Dempf
Tobin And Dempf, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rachel Apunte
Represented By
Robert C. Dempf
Tobin And Dempf, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Michael S. Regan
Terminated: 03/14/2024
Represented By
John D. Hoggan, Jr.
U.S. Department Of Justice - Albany Office
contact info
Defendant
Colonel Matthew W. Luzzatto
Terminated: 03/14/2024
Represented By
John D. Hoggan, Jr.
U.S. Department Of Justice - Albany Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, March 15, 2024
51 51 notice Notice - Other Fri 03/15 9:10 AM
COURT NOTICE to Albany County Supreme Court advising that the case has been remanded per this Court's Dkt. No. 50 Text Order Remanding Action to State Court. [Copy of Notice, along with certified copies of the Dkt. No. 50 Text Order Remanding Action to State Court and the Docket Sheet were mailed via regular mail to the Clerk of the Court, Albany County Supreme Court on 3/15/2024.](hmr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
50 50 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Letter Request Thu 03/14 4:26 PM
TEXT ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO STATE COURT: This state-court Article 78 petition was initially filed in Supreme Court, Albany County. As relevant here, the petition named as defendants Colonel Matthew W. Luzzatto, the New York District Commander for the Army Corps of Engineers and Michael S. Regan, the Administrator of the United States Environmental Protection Agency (collectively the "Federal Defendants"). The Federal Defendants removed the case to this forum using the federal officer removal statute. Dkt. No. 1. Thereafter, the Federal Defendants moved to dismiss. Dkt. No. 9. According to them, they were improperly served and are immune from the suit, but even assuming otherwise, the petition fails to state any plausible claims against them. Id. Petitioners' counsel filed several requests to extend the briefing deadlines. The Court granted two of those requests. Dkt. Nos. 24, 33. But petitioners have moved for a third. Dkt. No. 35. The Federal Defendants have opposed. Dkt. No. 36. Upon review, petitioners' third request for an extension of time is DENIED. Upon further review, the Federal Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to TERMINATE defendants Luzzatto and Regan from this action and REMAND the rest of this action to the originating jurisdiction. So Ordered by Judge David N. Hurd on 3/14/2024. (ptm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
49 49 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/13 12:57 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert G. Magee on behalf of City of Albany (Magee, Robert)
Related: [-]
misc Text Notice of Filing Deficiency Wed 03/13 9:21 AM
TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to City of Albany regarding the47 Notice of Appearance NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Other Deficiency - Dkt. No. 47 Notice of Appearance was dated 1/30/2024 and should have been dated 03/12/2024 the date the document was filed. Please file an Amended Notice of Appearance dated 03/12/2024. The correction(s) should be made within 3 days of this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 3/18/2024 (hmr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
47 47 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/12 12:05 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert G. Magee on behalf of City of Albany (Magee, Robert)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk Correction of Docket Entry Tue 03/12 12:48 PM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re40 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, Text Notice of Filing Deficiency,41 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,42 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,39 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion. Amended Documents have been added to Docket Entries39 ,40 ,41 and42 . (egr) Modified on 3/12/2024 to reflect that an Amended Document, rather than a Redacted Document, was added to Docket Entry42 (egr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
46 46 respm Response in Support of Motion Fri 03/08 4:57 PM
RESPONSE in Support re9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Matthew W. Luzzatto, Michael S. Regan. Motion returnable before Judge David N. Hurd,37 Letter Motion from Robert C. Dempf for Rachel Apunte, John Bohl, Kathleen Bohl, Christine Delsignore, Lori Dempf, Nick Esposito, Nathaniel Gray, Susan Gross, Timothy Gross, Steven Konas, Susan Konas, Valerian Masao, Kerry McCarey, Amy Musiker,35 Letter Motion from Robert C. Dempf for Rachel Apunte, John Bohl, Kathleen Bohl, Christine Delsignore, Lori Dempf, Nick Esposito, Nathaniel Gray, Susan Gross, Timothy Gross, Steven Konas, Susan Konas, Valerian Masao, Kerry McCarey, Amy Musiker filed by Matthew W. Luzzatto, Michael S. Regan. (Hoggan, John)
Related: [-]
45 45 10 pgs respm Memorandum of Law Fri 03/08 3:32 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW re34 Letter Request/Motion filed by Albany Port District Commission. (Shepardson, Thomas)
Related: [-]