|
|
Arrest of Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon. (ap) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon (1). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy) (ap) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy: Initial Appearance as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon held on 10/20/2022. Detention Hearing as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon held on 10/20/2022. AUSA Kingdar Prussien for the Government. Rachel Martin for Defendant. BAIL DISPOSITION: $50,000.00 PRB; 2 FRP. TRAVEL RESTRICTED TO SDNY/EDNY; SURRENDER TRAVEL DOCUMENTS (& NO NEW APPLICATIONS); PRETRIAL SUPERVISION: REGULAR STRICT AS DIRECTED BY PRETRIAL SERVICES; DRUG TESTING/TREATMT AS DIRECTED BY PTS; CURFEW; ELECTRONIC MONITORING; DEF. NOT TO POSSESS FIREARM/DESTRUCTIVE DEVICE/OTHER WEAPON; DEF. TO BE RELEASED ON OWN SIGNATURE. ***COMPLAINT UNSEALED*** The defendant was advised of his rights and the charges against him. Public reading of the complaint waived. Financial affidavit approved. Rachel Martin was appointed to represent the defendant. Consular notification not requested. Bail arguments heard. Defendant released on bail. See appearance bond and order setting conditions of release. PRELIMINARY HEARING DATE: 11/16/22 ON DEFENDANT'S CONSENT. (Court Reporter Courtflow) (ap) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
UNSECURED PERSONAL RECOGNIZANCE BOND Entered as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon in amount of $50,000.00, Cosigned by 2 FRP, and his wife for moral suasion. All cosigners must sign by 10/27/22. The defendant must: submit to supervision by and report for supervision to the PRETRIAL SERVICES As Directed; surrender any passport to: PRETRIAL SERVICES; not obtain a passport or other international travel document; abide by the following restrictions on personal association, residence, or travel: SDNY/EDNY; avoid all contact, directly or indirectly, with any person who is or may be a victim or witness in the investigation or prosecution, including: co-conspirators unless in the presence of counsel; not possess a firearm, destructive device, or other weapon; not use or unlawfully possess a narcotic drug or other controlled substances defined in 21 U.S.C. § 802, unless prescribed by a licensed medical practitioner; submit to testing for a prohibited substance if required by the pretrial services office or supervising officer. Testing may be used with random frequency and may include urine testing, the wearing of a sweat patch, a remote alcohol testing system, and/or any form of prohibited substance screening or testing. The defendant must not obstruct, attempt to obstruct, or tamper with the efficiency and accuracy of prohibited substance screening or testing; participate in a program of inpatient or outpatient substance abuse therapy and counseling if directed by the pretrial services office or supervising officer; participate in one of the following location restriction programs and comply with its requirements as directed; Curfew. You are restricted to your residence every day as directed by the pretrial services office or supervising officer; submit to the following location monitoring technology and comply with its requirements as directed: Location monitoring technology as directed by the pretrial services or supervising officer. The defendant is permitted to self-install the location monitoring equipment. (ap) Modified on 10/24/2022 (ap). Modified on 10/24/2022 (ap). (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/1/2022) (jbo). [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon. APPROVED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy) (ap) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Telesforo Del Valle, Jr appearing for Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon. (ap) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon. Time excluded from 11/16/2022 until 12/14/2022. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 11/16/2022) (ap) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
2ND ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon. Time excluded from 12/14/2022 until 1/11/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 12/14/2022) (ap) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
AFFIRMATION of Kingdar Prussien in Support by USA as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon re:7 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
3RD ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon. Time excluded from 1/11/2023 until 2/8/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 1/11/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
AFFIRMATION of Kingdar Prussien in Support by USA as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon re:9 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
4TH ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon. Time excluded from 2/8/2023 until 3/8/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 2/8/2023)(lnl) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
AFFIRMATION of Kingdar Prussien in Support by USA as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon re:11 4TH Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
5TH ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon. Time excluded from 3/8/2023 until 4/5/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 3/8/2023) (lnl) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
AFFIRMATION of Kingdar Prussien in Support by USA as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon re:13 5TH Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (ap) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
6TH ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon. Time excluded from 4/5/2023 until 5/3/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 4/5/2023) (lnl) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
17
|
|
17
AFFIRMATION of Kingdar Prussien in Support by USA as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon re:16 6TH Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
18
|
|
18
STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 7TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon. Time excluded from 5/3/2023 until 5/31/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 5/3/2023) (lnl) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
19
|
|
19
STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 8TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 8TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon. Time excluded from 5/31/2023 until 6/28/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 5/31/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
20
|
|
20
STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7rn OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 9th ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon. Time excluded from 6/28/2023 until 7/26/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 6/28/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
21
|
|
21
STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 10TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon. Time excluded from 7/26/2023 until 8/23/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik on 7/26/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
22
|
|
22
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause: Attorney Appointment Hearing as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon held on 8/11/2023. AUSA Timothy Ly present for the Government. Defense Counsel Daniel Parker present with the Defendant. Defendant present with counsel. Defendant confirmed that he could no longer afford services ofTelesforo Del Valle, and sought appointment of counsel by the court. Financial circumstances confirmed with Defendant. Daniel Parker is appointed to represent the defendant. (Added attorney Daniel Steven Parker for Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon. Attorney Telesforo Del Valle, Jr terminated in case as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon.) (Court Reporter Courtflow) (lnl) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
23
|
|
23
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Daniel Steven Parker appearing for Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon. Appearance Type: CJA Appointment. (Parker, Daniel) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
24
|
|
24
STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 11TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon. Time excluded from 8/23/2023 until 9/20/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 8/23/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
25
|
|
25
STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 12TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon. Time excluded from 9/20/2023 until 10/18/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 9/20/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
26
|
|
26
STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 13TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon. Time excluded from 10/18/2023 until 11/15/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik on 10/18/2023) (lnl) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
27
|
|
27
STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 14TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon. Time excluded from 11/15/2023 until 12/13/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 11/15/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-08407-UA]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Case Designated ECF as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon. (lnl)
Related: [-]
|
28
|
|
28
INDICTMENT FILED as to Luis Bladimil Henriquez Rondon (1) count(s) 1. (lnl)
Related: [-]
|