Kansas District Court
Case #: 2:23-cr-20077
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2023
Last checked: Friday Dec 15, 2023 1:20 AM CST
Defendant
Jordan A. Escobar (1)
Represented By
David M. Magariel
Office Of Federal Public Defender - Kcks
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Donald Christopher Oakley
Office Of United States Attorney - Kcks
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/15/2023 2:05 AM CST
Thursday, December 07, 2023
1 1 10 pgs COMPLAINT as to Jordan A. Escobar (1). (ca) [2:23-mj-08244-TJJ]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
ARREST of Jordan A. Escobar. (kas) [2:23-mj-08244-TJJ]
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs ARREST WARRANT returned executed on 12/5/2023 as to Jordan A. Escobar. (nac) [2:23-mj-08244-TJJ]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORAL MOTION for Pretrial Detention by USA as to defendant Jordan A. Escobar. (msb) [2:23-mj-08244-TJJ]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORAL MOTION to Continue detention hearing by defendant Jordan A. Escobar. (msb) [2:23-mj-08244-TJJ]
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs MINUTE ENTRY of INITIAL APPEARANCE proceedings held 12/8/23 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell as to defendant Jordan A. Escobar (1): Attorney David Magariel present. 4 Motion to Continue detention hearing - GRANTED. Defendant remanded to custody. Detention Hearing set for 12/11/2023 at 02:00 PM and Status Conference set for 12/15/2023 at 01:30 PM both hearings in KC Courtroom 236 (TJJ) before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. (Tape #FTR Network @ 1:07 pm) (msb) [2:23-mj-08244-TJJ]
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by defendant Jordan A. Escobar. (msb) [2:23-mj-08244-TJJ]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
7 7 1 pgs MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: DETENTION HEARING as to Jordan A. Escobar held on 12/11/2023. Detention ordered - Oral motion (ECF No. 3 ) is GRANTED. Status Conference set for 12/15/2023 at 01:30 PM in KC Courtroom 236 (TJJ) before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Remanded to Custody pending trial. (Court Reporter Nancy Wiss) (ca) [2:23-mj-08244-TJJ]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Jordan A. Escobar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/11/2023. (ca) [2:23-mj-08244-TJJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
9 9 INDICTMENT as to Jordan A. Escobar (1) - counts 1-2. (mam)
Related: [-]