New Jersey District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-01053
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 16, 2024 3:26 PM EDT
Defendant
BORUCH DRILLMAN (1)
Represented By
JEFFREY H. LICHTMAN
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
JEFFREY BENSON EINHORN
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
JEFFERY H. LICHTMAN
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
BABASIJIBOMI MOORE
contact info
MARTHA KATHLEEN NYE
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Dec 13 2023
BRADY ORDER as to BORUCH DRILLMAN. Signed by Judge Robert Kirsch on 12/13/2023. (pdm)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
1 1 14 pgs INFORMATION as to BORUCH DRILLMAN (1) count 1. (pdm)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by BORUCH DRILLMAN (pdm)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs BRADY ORDER as to BORUCH DRILLMAN. Signed by Judge Robert Kirsch on 12/13/2023. (pdm)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Kirsch: Initial Appearance and Plea Agreement Hearing as to BORUCH DRILLMAN held on 12/13/2023. Plea entered by BORUCH DRILLMAN (1) as to Count 1. Sentencing set for 4/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Robert Kirsch. (Court Reporter/Recorder Carol Farrell (856-318-6100).) (pdm)
Related: [-]
5 5 8 pgs APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of guilty as to BORUCH DRILLMAN. (pdm)
Related: [-]
6 6 9 pgs PLEA AGREEMENT as to BORUCH DRILLMAN. (pdm)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day:Bail Hearing as to BORUCH DRILLMAN held on 12/13/2023. All parties consent to bail conditions and release on own recognizance. Ordered defendant released. Order Setting Conditions of Release to follow. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (cry)
Related: [-]
11 11 3 pgs ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Ordered defendant released on own recognizance. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Brendan Day on 12/13/2023. (cry)
Related: [-]