Vermont District Court
Case #: 2:23-cr-00148
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2023
Last checked: Friday Dec 15, 2023 2:21 AM EST
Defendant
Theodore Bland (1)
Represented By
David C. Sleigh, Esq.
Sleigh Law PC
contact info
Jessica L. Burke, Esq.
Burke Law, P.C.
contact info
FPD
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Steven L Barth, AFPD
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Barbara A. Masterson, AUSA
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/15/2023 3:03 AM EST
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Theodore Bland (1). Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 10/24/2023. (drg) [2:23-mj-00147-kjd]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Affidavit of Samuel Brown
3 3 MOTION to Seal1 Complaint and Arrest Warrant by USA as to Theodore Bland. (drg) [2:23-mj-00147-kjd]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal1 Complaint and Arrest Warrant as to Theodore Bland (1).1 Complaint, Arrest Warrant,3 Motion and this Order to remain sealed until the arrest of the defendant. Signed by Judge Christina Reiss on 10/24/2023. (drg) [2:23-mj-00147-kjd]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
5 5 RULE 5(c)(3) Documents received from Eastern District of Tennessee (Knoxville) as to Theodore Bland.(law) [2:23-mj-00147-kjd]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Minute Entry for proceedings held 10/30/2023 (Doc 2),
Att: 2 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit (document is sealed) (Doc 3),
Att: 3 Waiver of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearings (Doc 5),
Att: 4 Commitment to Another District (Doc 6),
Att: 5 Due Process Protections Act Order (Doc 7)
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
CJA 20: Appointment of Jessica L. Burke, Esq. (lead from training panel) for Theodore Bland. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/1/2023. (law) [2:23-mj-00147-kjd]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER Appointing FPD for Theodore Bland. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/1/2023. (hbc) [2:23-mj-00147-kjd]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven L Barth, AFPD appearing for Theodore Bland .(Barth, Steven) [2:23-mj-00147-kjd]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
8 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David C. Sleigh, Esq appearing for Theodore Bland .(Sleigh, David) [2:23-mj-00147-kjd]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
9 9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Theodore Bland. (Sleigh, David) [2:23-mj-00147-kjd]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
10 10 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Theodore Bland re:9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2023 at 3:30 PM in Burlington Courtroom 410 before Judge Kevin J. Doyle. (hbc) [2:23-mj-00147-kjd]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
11 11 INDICTMENT as to Theodore Bland (1) count(s) 1. (sjl)
Related: [-]
12 12 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Theodore Bland. (Masterson, Barbara)
Related: [-]
13 13 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Kevin J. Doyle: Motion Hearing as to Theodore Bland held on 12/13/2023 re9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Arraignment held on 12/13/2023. Present are AUSA Barbara Masterson for the gov't, Atty David Sleigh w/ deft, and E. Clifford for the USPO. Deft confirms Atty Sleigh has been retained. Arguments by counsel. Statements re whether the Motion should be considered by the District Judge now that an indictment has been entered. Deft sworn and Court makes inquiries. Court reads Indictment and deft enters plea of not guilty. Gov't reports on nature and extent of discovery. Statements by counsel re time required for filing pretrial motions and does not agree to an exclusion of time under the Speedy Trial Act. Gov't moves for detention and requests a continuance. ORAL ORDER: Consistent with Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f), Court confirms disclosure obligation of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland and possible consequences of violating such Order. ORDERED: Parties shall submit further briefing re9 Motion to Dismiss, and agree the Motion should be considered by the District Judge. Pretrial Motions to be filed by 12/27/2023 with no exclusions. Deft remains detained pending Detention Hearing set for 12/14/2023 at 2:00 PM in Burlington Courtroom 410 before Judge Kevin J. Doyle. (Court Reporter: Recorded) (hbc)
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING as to Theodore Bland. Detention Hearing set for 12/14/2023 at 2:00 PM in Burlington Courtroom 410 before Judge Kevin J. Doyle. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 12/13/2023. (hbc)
Related: [-]