Utah District Court
Judge:Ann Marie Mciff Allen
Case #: 2:23-cv-00902
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 12, 2024 5:01 AM MDT
Defendant
Sykes Enterprises
Represented By
Benton Matthew Eskelsen
Jackson Lewis
contact info
M. Christopher Moon
Jackson Lewis
contact info
Plaintiff
Christabel Atebata
Represented By
David J. Holdsworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
33 33 minutes Settlement Conference Thu 05/01 2:09 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero: Settlement Conference held on 4/30/2025. All parties present via Zoom. Plaintiff Christabel Atebata and Douglas Atebata are present. The matter has been resolved. The court set a deadline for dismissal documents to be filed. Given this resolution, the court will vacate the settlement conference set for 5/6/2025 at 10:00 AM. Written Order to follow: No. Attorney for Plaintiff: Douglas J. Holdsworth. Attorneys for Defendant: M. Christopher Moon and Michael Rusie. Court Reporter: Electronic/Zoom. (Time Start: 10:01 AM, Time End: 10:53 AM, Room: Zoom.) Related [+]
Related: [-] b
32 32 order Order Vacating Hearing or Trial Wed 04/30 12:26 PM
ORDER VACATING Settlement Conference set for 5/6/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. The conference set for May 6, 2025, is no longer necessary as the parties have reached a settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 4/30/2025. (jed)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
31 31 order Order Setting Hearing or Trial Mon 04/28 4:29 PM
ORDER SETTING HEARING: Pre-Settlement Conference set for 4/30/2025 at 10:00 AM in US District Court-SLCU *virtual Court Via Zoom Conference* before Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 4/28/2025. (jed)
Related: [-]
30 30 order Order Vacating Hearing or Trial Mon 04/28 2:31 PM
ORDER VACATING Pre-Settlement Conference set for 4/29/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. After being contacted by the parties indicating that a conflict had arisen as to the previously set pre-settlement conference date and time, the court finds it appropriate to vacate the conference. The court is coordinating with the parties to reschedule the pre-settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 4/28/2025. (jed)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
29 29 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Thu 04/10 3:53 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Benton M. Eskelsen filed by Benton Matthew Eskelsen on behalf of Sykes Enterprises (Eskelsen, Benton)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
28 28 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 03/27 3:55 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Pre-Settlement Conference Call set for 4/29/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Settlement Conference set for 5/6/2025 at 10:00 AM in US District Court-SLCU *virtual Court Via Zoom Conference* before Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 3/27/2025. (alf)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
27 27 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 03/10 12:35 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1) for Settlement. Within seven days, counsel shall contact Judge Romero's chambers to schedule the settlement conference. No attached document. Signed by District Judge Ann Marie McIff Allen on 3/10/2025. (eat)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Order on Motion for Judicial Settlement Conference Mon 03/10 9:50 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 25 Motion for Judicial Settlement Conference. The case will be referred to a magistrate judge for a judicial settlement conference. Within seven days of the referral, counsel shall contact the referred judge's chambers to schedule the settlement conference. This case is stayed pending the outcome of the settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 3/10/2025. No attached document. (med)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
25 25 motion Judicial Settlement Conference Fri 03/07 1:10 PM
Joint MOTION for Judicial Settlement Conference and Stay of Proceedings filed by Defendant Sykes Enterprises. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Moon, M.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, February 21, 2025
24 24 order Order Fri 02/21 9:43 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER: The parties are ordered to comply with paragraph 3 of the 5 Order to Propose Schedule by March 7, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 2/21/2025. No attached document.(gdr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
23 23 misc Rule 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Atty) Tue 01/14 12:10 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Sykes Enterprises identifying Foundever Worldwide Corporation. as Corporate Parent. (Moon, M.)
Related: [-]
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/14 11:50 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to4 Complaint filed by Sykes Enterprises.(Moon, M.)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 01/06 5:30 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendant to respond to the complaint is extended to January 14, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 1/6/2025. No attached document. (gdr)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Extension of Time Mon 01/06 5:12 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Defendant Sykes Enterprises. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Moon, M.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
19 19 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 12/17 10:19 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss. Ms. Atebata's First and Fifth Causes of Action are dismissed. The remaining requests in Sykes' Motion are denied. Signed by District Judge Ann Marie McIff Allen on 12/17/2024. (mh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
18 18 respm Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion Thu 06/20 11:10 AM
Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re14 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint filed by Defendant Sykes Enterprises. (Moon, M.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
17 17 10 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Wed 06/05 9:16 PM
Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re14 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint filed by Plaintiff Christabel Atebata. (Holdsworth, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
utility Reassignment to District Judge Thu 05/16 11:59 AM
NOTICE OF NON-CONSENT Consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge under DUCivR 72-4 has not been obtained. Case randomly assigned to Judge Ann Marie McIff Allen and Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Magistrate Judge is automatically referred under 28 U.S.C636(b)(1)(A). Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned as the presiding judge to the case. (mh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
notice Notice of Availability of Judicial Settlement Conference Wed 05/08 10:04 AM
NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. For the benefit of the public and the bar, the District of Utah offers judicial settlement conference as an alternative for dispute resolution assistance in all civil cases and bankruptcy adversary proceedings. The court offers this alternative because, when compared with litigation, it can resolve a dispute faster, at less expense, and with solutions that are better able to meet the parties' needs and interests. Parties may file a stipulated motion for judicial settlement conference. A form[LINK:motion] is available on the court's website. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Christabel Atebata, Defendant Sykes Enterprises. (alf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
14 14 motion Dismiss Tue 05/07 2:02 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint filed by Defendant Sykes Enterprises. (Moon, M.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment Wed 04/24 10:05 AM
NOTICE OF PRESIDING MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail to the address on the form. Please do not e-file the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Christabel Atebata, Defendant Sykes Enterprises. Form due by 5/15/2024. (mh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
12 12 misc Clerks Order ~Util - Update Answer Deadline Tue 04/23 3:40 PM
CLERKS ORDER granting Extension of Time to File Answer re4 Complaint signed by Tiffany Brown for Gary Serdar, Clerk of Court. Answer deadline updated for Sykes Enterprises to 5/7/2024. (alf)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 04/23 11:50 AM
Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re4 Complaint filed by Defendant Sykes Enterprises. Attorney M. Christopher Moon added to party Sykes Enterprises(pty:dft)(Moon, M.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/09 11:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christabel Atebata. Summons served on Sykes Enterprises, Inc. on 04/02/2024. (Holdsworth, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Electronically Fri 03/29 8:17 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Sykes Enterprises. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 03/22 10:28 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time. For good cause shown, the deadline to serve the complaint is extended to April 22, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 3/22/2024. No attached document. (gdr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time Thu 03/21 11:03 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Effect Service of Process and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Christabel Atebata.(Holdsworth, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Effect Service of Process
Friday, March 01, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Electronically Fri 03/01 12:02 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Sykes Enterprises. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
5 5 5 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Tue 12/19 11:58 AM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 12/19/2023. (haa)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint (Court) Tue 12/19 9:41 AM
COMPLAINT against Sykes Enterprises (Originally received by the court on 12/15/2023). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Christabel Atebata. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (sg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 12/19 9:35 AM
ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 12/19/2023. (sg)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
2 2 utility Lodged Document Fri 12/15 8:42 AM
DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court.(sg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 12/15 8:41 AM
**SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Christabel Atebata. (sg)
Related: [-] ceived by the court on: 12/15/2023