Member Case
Lead case is: 2:23-bk-08998

Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Madeleine C Wanslee
Case #: 2:23-bk-08999
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2023
Terminated:Aug 27, 2024

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
SPORTS AND FITNESS EXCHANGE LEGACY, LLC
5609 W Latham St Ste 105
Phoenix, AZ 85043-1600
Represented By
JASON D. CURRY
Quarles & Brady LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE SUITE 204
PHOENIX, AZ 85003


Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
48 48 2 pgs order oFinal Decree (Closes Case) Tue 08/27 3:57 PM
Final Decree (Case Closed) signed on 8/27/2024 . (SJF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
47 47 other Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/22 5:09 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 2:23-bk-08999For March 2024 filed by ANTHONY F. PUSATERI of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SPORTS AND FITNESS EXCHANGE LEGACY, LLC. (PUSATERI, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
46 46 claims Withdrawal of Claim Mon 04/15 1:37 PM
Withdrawal of Claim 10 filed by ANDREW MICHAEL FOWLER of Fowler St. Clair, PLLC on behalf of Justin Humpal. (FOWLER, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
45 45 claims Withdrawal of Claim Mon 04/15 1:36 PM
Withdrawal of Claim 9 filed by ANDREW MICHAEL FOWLER of Fowler St. Clair, PLLC on behalf of Michael Wales. (FOWLER, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
44 44 claims Withdrawal of Claim Mon 04/15 1:33 PM
Withdrawal of Claim 8 filed by ANDREW MICHAEL FOWLER of Fowler St. Clair, PLLC on behalf of Sports & Fitness Exchange LLC. (FOWLER, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
43 43 other Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Thu 03/21 11:26 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 2:23-bk-08999-MCWFor February 2024 filed by JASON D. CURRY of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SPORTS AND FITNESS EXCHANGE LEGACY, LLC. (CURRY, JASON)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
42 42 notice Withdrawal (Notice of) Mon 02/26 12:40 PM
First Notice of Withdrawal OF PROOF OF CLAIM No. 6 filed by Mathew Holm of IBC Law Firm on behalf of Jobsite Sentry LLC.(Holm, Mathew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
41 41 other Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 02/21 3:50 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-8999For January 2024 filed by ANTHONY F. PUSATERI of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SPORTS AND FITNESS EXCHANGE LEGACY, LLC. (PUSATERI, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
40 40 32 pgs other Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Tue 02/13 5:05 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 2:23-bk-08999For December 2023 filed by ANTHONY F. PUSATERI of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SPORTS AND FITNESS EXCHANGE LEGACY, LLC. (PUSATERI, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
39 39 other Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/34.00 Fee) Tue 02/13 3:52 PM
Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/34.00 Fee) filed by ANTHONY F. PUSATERI of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SPORTS AND FITNESS EXCHANGE LEGACY, LLC. Related [+] (PUSATERI, ANTHONY)
Related: [-] 35 Schedules
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment Tue 02/13 3:52 PM
Receipt of Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/34.00 Fee)([LINK:2:23-bk-08999-MCW] ) [other,1229] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A36308841. Fee amount 34.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
38 38 1 pgs trustee Minutes of 341 Meeting Tue 01/23 2:06 PM
First Minutes of 341 Meeting Held 1/23/24 @ 9:45 a.m. filed by EDWARD K. BERNATAVICIUS of UNITED STATES TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE.(Griffiths, Dale)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
37 37 court Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Wed 01/10 8:50 AM
Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (SAL)
Related: [-]
36 36 18 pgs other Statement of Financial Affairs Tue 01/09 1:50 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual filed by JASON D. CURRY of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SPORTS AND FITNESS EXCHANGE LEGACY, LLC. Electronic Filing Declaration due by 01/16/2024, (CURRY, JASON)
Related: [-]
35 35 other Schedules Tue 01/09 1:37 PM
Schedules for Non-Individual filed by JASON D. CURRY of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SPORTS AND FITNESS EXCHANGE LEGACY, LLC. Electronic Filing Declaration due by 01/16/2024, (CURRY, JASON)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
33 33 claims Request for Notice Fri 01/05 6:02 AM
Request for Notice filed by ALAN C. HOCHHEISER of Maurice Wutscher LLP on behalf of AmTrust North America, Inc. on behalf of Sequoia Insurance Company. (HOCHHEISER, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
32 32 court zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE) Sat 12/30 10:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31 BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Corp/Part
31 31 court BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Corp/Part Thu 12/28 1:20 PM
Chapter 11 Corp/Part Notice of Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/23/2024 at 10:30 AM as a Telephonic Hearing (341) Proof of Claims due by 2/23/2024, (SAL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
28 28 notice Appearance (Notice of) Thu 12/21 12:12 PM
Notice of Appearance as SubChapter V Trustee filed by Joseph E. Cotterman on behalf of JOSEPH ELDON COTTERMAN.(Cotterman, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
34 34 order oGranting Fri 01/05 3:10 PM
ORDER Granting Ex Parte Motion - Granting the Debtors an Extension of Time to File Statement of Financial Affairs and Schedules of Assets and Liabilities - signed on 12/20/2023 . (SJF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
30 30 vCal Minute Entry Wed 12/27 4:55 PM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 12/19/2023 Subject: EMERGENCY MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING AND DIRECTING (1) JOINT ADMINISTRATION, AND (2) USE OF A CONSOLIDATED CAPTION AND EMERGENCY APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER UNDER 11 U.S.C. § 327(a) AUTHORIZING THE RETENTION OF QUARLES & BRADY LLP AS BANKRUPTCY AND RESTRUCTURING COUNSEL AND EMERGENCY APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER UNDER 11 U.S.C. § 327(A) AUTHORIZING THE RETENTION OF MCA FINANCIAL GROUP, LTD. AS A FINANCIAL AND EMERGENCY MOTION FOR INTERIM AND FINAL ORDERS UNDER 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) AND 363(a)-(c) AUTHORIZING THE APPLICABLE DEBTOR'S USE OF CASH COLLATERAL AND EMERGENCY MOTION FOR INTERIM AND FINAL ORDERS UNDER 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a), 345, AND 363: (a) AUTHORIZING MAINTENANCE AND USE OF THE APPLICABLE DEBTOR'S EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND CASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM; AND (b) WAIVING INVESTMENT AND DEPOSIT REQUIREMENTS AND EMERGENCY MOTION FOR ENTRY OF INTERIM AND FINAL ORDERS UNDER 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 363, AND 507 AUTHORIZING THE APPLICABLE DEBTOR TO CONTINUE TO PAY PRE-PETITION WAGES, COMPENSATION, AND HONOR EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLANS AND PROGRAMS AND EMERGENCY MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER AUTHORIZING AND APPROVING THE REJECTION OF CERTAIN EXECUTORY CONTRACTS AND UNEXPIRED LEASES, EFFECTIVE AS OF THE PETITION DATE, PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. § 365 (vCal Hearing ID (1606637)). Related [+](TAC)
Related: [-] 8 ,14 ,15 ,10 ,12 ,11 ,13
29 29 audio audio Fri 12/22 7:17 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/19/2023 11:00 AM ]. File Size [ 22,586 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:48:11 ]. (vCal Hearing ID (1606637)).(MRS, )
Related: [-]
26 26 order oApproving Wed 12/20 9:29 AM
Amended ORDER Authorizing and Directing (1) Joint Administrative, and (2) Use of a Consolidated Caption signed on 12/19/2023 Related [+] . (SJF)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Joint Administration,25 Order for Joint Administration
25 25 order oJoint Administration Tue 12/19 3:27 PM
ORDER for Joint Administration signed on 12/19/2023 Related [+] . (SJF)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Joint Administration
24 24 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Tue 12/19 2:59 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Authorizing And Directing (1) Joint Administration, And (2) Use Of A Consolidated Caption filed by JASON D. CURRY of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SPORTS AND FITNESS EXCHANGE LEGACY, LLC Related [+].(CURRY, JASON)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Joint Administration
Monday, December 18, 2023
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 12/20 10:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)
23 23 notice Notice of Filing Mon 12/18 5:38 PM
Notice of Filing Proposed Agenda for First Day Hearing filed by JASON D. CURRY of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SPORTS AND FITNESS EXCHANGE LEGACY, LLC Related [+].(CURRY, JASON)
Related: [-] 7 Declaration,8 Motion for Joint Administration,10 Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral,11 Motion for Wage Order,12 Motion to Authorize,13 Motion to Reject,14 Application to Employ,15 Application to Employ
22 22 other Certificate of Service Mon 12/18 4:59 PM
Certificate of Service of Order Setting Emergency Hearing on First Day Motions filed by JASON D. CURRY of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SPORTS AND FITNESS EXCHANGE LEGACY, LLC. Related [+] (CURRY, JASON)
Related: [-] 21 Order Setting Hearing
21 21 order oSetting Hearing Mon 12/18 3:21 PM
ORDER Setting Emergency Hearing on First Day Motions signed on 12/18/2023 Related [+] Hearing set for 12/19/2023 at 11:00 AM at Videoconference Hearing . (SJF)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Joint Administration,10 Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral,11 Motion for Wage Order,12 Motion to Authorize,13 Motion to Reject,14 Application to Employ,15 Application to Employ,16 Motion to Accelerate/Expedite
20 20 notice Appearance (Notice of) Mon 12/18 3:13 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by J. HENK TAYLOR of Warner Angle Hallam Jackson & Formanek, PLC on behalf of Fund-Ex Solutions Group, LLC.(TAYLOR, J.)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Appearance (Notice of) Mon 12/18 11:27 AM
Notice of Appearance // Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice and Service of Papers filed by WESLEY DENTON RAY of SACKS TIERNEY P.A. on behalf of Olivia Tilley, Joshua Petrawski.(RAY, WESLEY)
Related: [-]
18 18 court Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form) Mon 12/18 7:33 AM
Deficiency Notice to Debtor and Attorney for Debtor That All Required Documents Were Not Filed. (RIV)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
17 17 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Fri 12/15 6:10 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Setting Emergency Hearing on First Day Motions filed by JASON D. CURRY of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SPORTS AND FITNESS EXCHANGE LEGACY, LLC Related [+].(CURRY, JASON)
Related: [-] 16 Motion to Accelerate/Expedite
16 16 motion Accelerate/Expedite (Motion to) Fri 12/15 6:01 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Accelerate/Expedite / Motion for Emergency Hearing on First Day Motions filed by JASON D. CURRY of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SPORTS AND FITNESS EXCHANGE LEGACY, LLC Related [+]. (CURRY, JASON)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Joint Administration,10 Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral,11 Motion for Wage Order,12 Motion to Authorize,13 Motion to Reject,14 Application to Employ,15 Application to Employ
Att: 1 Exhibit A
15 15 8 pgs motion Employ (Application to) Fri 12/15 5:40 PM
Application to Employ / Application For Entry Of An Order Under 11 U.S.C. § 327(a) Authorizing The Retention Of MCA Financial Group, Ltd. As Financial Advisor filed by JASON D. CURRY of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SPORTS AND FITNESS EXCHANGE LEGACY, LLC. (CURRY, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
14 14 11 pgs motion Employ (Application to) Fri 12/15 5:36 PM
Application to Employ / Application For Entry Of An Order Under 11 U.S.C. § 327(a) Authorizing The Retention Of Quarles & Brady LLP As Bankruptcy And Restructuring Counsel filed by JASON D. CURRY of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SPORTS AND FITNESS EXCHANGE LEGACY, LLC. (CURRY, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
13 13 motion Reject (Motion to) Fri 12/15 4:51 PM
Motion to Reject Certain Executory Contracts And Unexpired Leases, Effective As Of The Petition Date, Pursuant To Bankruptcy Code § 365 filed by JASON D. CURRY of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SPORTS AND FITNESS EXCHANGE LEGACY, LLC. (CURRY, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Schedule 1
Att: 2 Exhibit A
12 12 motion Authorize (Motion to) Fri 12/15 4:36 PM
Motion to Authorize Maintenance And Use Of The Applicable Debtors Existing Bank Accounts And Cash Management System filed by JASON D. CURRY of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SPORTS AND FITNESS EXCHANGE LEGACY, LLC. (CURRY, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
11 11 motion Wage Order (Motion for) Fri 12/15 4:26 PM
Motion for Wage Order filed by JASON D. CURRY of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SPORTS AND FITNESS EXCHANGE LEGACY, LLC. (CURRY, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
10 10 7 pgs motion Approve Use of Cash Collateral (Motion to) Fri 12/15 4:21 PM
Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral filed by JASON D. CURRY of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SPORTS AND FITNESS EXCHANGE LEGACY, LLC. (CURRY, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
9 9 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Fri 12/15 4:13 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Authorizing And Directing (1) Joint Administration, And (2) Use Of A Consolidated Caption filed by JASON D. CURRY of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SPORTS AND FITNESS EXCHANGE LEGACY, LLC Related [+].(CURRY, JASON)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Joint Administration
8 8 motion Joint Administration (Motion for) Fri 12/15 4:11 PM
Emergency Motion for Joint Administration filed by JASON D. CURRY of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SPORTS AND FITNESS EXCHANGE LEGACY, LLC. (CURRY, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
7 7 other Declaration Fri 12/15 4:10 PM
Declaration of Joshua Petrawski in Support of First Day Motions filed by JASON D. CURRY of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SPORTS AND FITNESS EXCHANGE LEGACY, LLC. (CURRY, JASON)
Related: [-]
6 6 other List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors Fri 12/15 2:59 PM
List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors filed by JASON D. CURRY of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SPORTS AND FITNESS EXCHANGE LEGACY, LLC. (CURRY, JASON)
Related: [-]
5 5 other List of Equity Security Holders Fri 12/15 2:51 PM
List of Equity Security Holders filed by JASON D. CURRY of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SPORTS AND FITNESS EXCHANGE LEGACY, LLC. (CURRY, JASON)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Appearance (Notice of) Fri 12/15 2:36 PM
Notice of Appearance & Request for Notices filed by EDWARD K. BERNATAVICIUS of UNITED STATES TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE.(BERNATAVICIUS, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors 11 (Business) Fri 12/15 2:03 PM
Meeting of Creditors scheduled for 1/16/2024 at 10:30 AM as a Telephonic Hearing (341). (CURRY, JASON)
Related: [-]
2 2 15 pgs other Initial Mailing List Fri 12/15 1:15 PM
Master Mailing List filed by JASON D. CURRY of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SPORTS AND FITNESS EXCHANGE LEGACY, LLC. (CURRY, JASON)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs other 2Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (1738.00 fee) Fri 12/15 12:40 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual, Schedules and Statements (except for those listed below). Failure to timely upload the list of creditors, may result in dismissal of the case without further notice. Electronic Filing Declaration due 01/5/2024, Master Mailing due 12/22/2023, Schedules A/B-J due 12/29/2023. Statement of Financial Affairs due 12/29/2023, Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 03/14/2024. filed by JASON D. CURRY of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SPORTS AND FITNESS EXCHANGE LEGACY, LLC (CURRY, JASON)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment Fri 12/15 12:41 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:2:23-bk-08999] ) [other,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A36178267. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]