Texas Southern District Court
Judge:George C Hanks, Jr
Case #: 4:23-cv-04680
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2023
Case in other court:Louisiana Eastern, 2:23-cv-02217
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 12, 2024 5:58 AM CDT
Conflict Check Party
Apure Capital Partners, LLC
Conflict Check Party
Kinsale Capital Group, Inc.
Conflict Check Party
Markel International Insurance Co./JH Blades
Conflict Check Party
Oakridge Energy Partners, LLC
Conflict Check Party
Stockbridge Natural Resources, LLC
Counter Claimant
Sanare Energy Partners LLC
Represented By
Constance C Waguespack
Pusateri, Johnston, Guillot & Greenbaum
contact info
Courtney Crowell
Pusateri, Johnston, Guillot & Greenbaum
contact info
Michael Matthew Jett
Hall Maines Lugrin
contact info
Robert R Johnston
Pusateri, Johnston, Guillot & Greenbaum
contact info
Wade B Hammett
Pusateri, Johnston, Guillot & Greenbaum
contact info
Andrew J Wondolowski
Pusateri, Johnston, Guillot & Greenbaum, LLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Kinsale Insurance Company
Represented By
Luke Gerard LaHaye
Adams And Reese LLP
contact info
Matthew C. Guy
Adams & Reese, Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Jeffrey E. Richardson
Adams & Reese
contact info
Collin Michael Weyand
Adams Reese LLP
contact info
Matthew Charles Guy
Adams And Reese LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sanare Energy Partners LLC
Represented By
Constance C Waguespack
Pusateri, Johnston, Guillot & Greenbaum
contact info
Courtney Crowell
Pusateri, Johnston, Guillot & Greenbaum
contact info
Michael Matthew Jett
Hall Maines Lugrin
contact info
Robert R Johnston
Pusateri, Johnston, Guillot & Greenbaum
contact info
Wade B Hammett
Pusateri, Johnston, Guillot & Greenbaum
contact info
Andrew J Wondolowski
Pusateri, Johnston, Guillot & Greenbaum, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kinsale Insurance Company
Represented By
Luke Gerard LaHaye
Adams And Reese LLP
contact info
Matthew C. Guy
Adams & Reese, Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Jeffrey E. Richardson
Adams & Reese
contact info
Collin Michael Weyand
Adams Reese LLP
contact info
Matthew Charles Guy
Adams And Reese LLP
contact info
Third Party Defendant
SBS Energy Services, LLC
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Sanare Energy Partners LLC
Represented By
Constance C Waguespack
Pusateri, Johnston, Guillot & Greenbaum
contact info
Courtney Crowell
Pusateri, Johnston, Guillot & Greenbaum
contact info
Michael Matthew Jett
Hall Maines Lugrin
contact info
Robert R Johnston
Pusateri, Johnston, Guillot & Greenbaum
contact info
Wade B Hammett
Pusateri, Johnston, Guillot & Greenbaum
contact info
Andrew J Wondolowski
Pusateri, Johnston, Guillot & Greenbaum, LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Movant
LACI N. BLANCHARD
Terminated: 11/28/2023
Represented By
Adam D. Lewis
Arnold & Itkin, LLP
contact info
Roland T. Christensen
Arnold & Itkin, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/08/2024 5:40 AM CDT
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
1 1 9 pgs COMPLAINT against Sanare Energy Partners, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10002036) filed by Kinsale Insurance Company.Attorney Luke Gerard LaHaye added to party Kinsale Insurance Company(pty:pla).(LaHaye, Luke)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Summons
2 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (mb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
3 3 Summons Issued as to Sanare Energy Partners, LLC. (lag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
4 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Sanare Energy Partners, LLC served on 7/20/2023, answer due 8/10/2023. (LaHaye, Luke)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
5 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, by Sanare Energy Partners, LLC.Attorney Courtney Crowell added to party Sanare Energy Partners, LLC(pty:dft).(Crowell, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer1 Complaint, as to Sanare Energy Partners, LLC answer due 8/31/2023. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/10/2023. (lag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
7 7 Sanare Energy Partners, LLC's ANSWER to1 Complaint, for Declaratory Relief , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against SBS Energy Services, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Judgment and Breach of Contract against Kinsale Insurance Company by Sanare Energy Partners, LLC.(Waguespack, Constance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H
8 8 Request of Summons Issued as to SBS Energy Services, LLC filed by Sanare Energy Partners, LLC re7 Third Party Complaint. (Waguespack, Constance) Modified on 9/6/2023 (lag).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
9 9 Summons Issued as to SBS Energy Services, LLC. (lag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
10 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re7 Counterclaim, by Kinsale Insurance Company.(LaHaye, Luke) Modified on 9/21/2023 (lag).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, September 25, 2023
11 11 ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer7 Counterclaim, as to Kinsale Insurance Company answer due 10/17/2023. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/21/2023. (lag)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
12 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear as Counsel of Record by Kinsale Insurance Company.(Richardson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
13 13 MOTION to Strike7 Third Party Complaint by Kinsale Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/8/2023.(Richardson, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/18/2023 (lag).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Notice of Submission
14 14 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim for Failure to State a Claim by Kinsale Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/8/2023.(Richardson, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/18/2023 (lag).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Notice of Submission
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
15 15 ORDER granting12 Motion to Appear for Attorney Matthew C. Guy for Kinsale Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/17/2023. (lag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
16 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date of Kinsale's Motion to Strike Related [+] and Motion to Dismiss by Sanare Energy Partners, LLC.(Waguespack, Constance)
Related: [-] c. Doc. 13c. Doc. 14
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, October 27, 2023
17 17 ORDER granting16 MOTION to Continue, Resetting Submission on13 MOTION to Strike,14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/29/2023. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/26/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
18 18 MOTION to Intervene Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 24 by Laci N. Blanchard. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/29/2023.Attorney Roland T. Christensen added to party Laci N. Blanchard(pty:intvp).(Christensen, Roland)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Notice of Submission
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
19 19 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Kinsale Insurance Company re18 MOTION to Intervene Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 24 . (LaHaye, Luke)
Related: [-]
20 20 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Sanare Energy Partners, LLC re13 MOTION to Strike7 Third Party Complaint .(Waguespack, Constance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
21 21 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Sanare Energy Partners, LLC re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim .(Waguespack, Constance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
22 22 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Sanare Energy Partners, LLC regarding13 MOTION to Strike7 Third Party Complaint .(Waguespack, Constance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
23 23 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Sanare Energy Partners, LLC regarding14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim .(Waguespack, Constance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
24 24 ORDER Setting Hearing on13 MOTION to Strike7 Third Party Complaint,14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Motion Hearing with Oral Argument set for 12/20/2023 09:00 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/21/23.(lag)
Related: [-]
25 25 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandums by Kinsale Insurance Company.(LaHaye, Luke)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, November 27, 2023
26 26 ORDER granting25 Motion for Leave to File reply memorandums in support of its motions by 12/11/2023. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/27/2023. (lag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
27 27 ORDER denying18 Motion to Intervene. As a threshold matter, Movant failed to file a memorandum in support, in violation of Local Rule 7.4 Motions Must Be Accompanied by Memorandum. Notwithstanding this technical deficit, the motion is not well-founded on the merits. Movant's efforts to inject complicated tort claims into this straightforward declaratory action centered on insurance coverage do not satisfy Rule 24's requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 11/28/23. (cg)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
28 28 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Kinsale Insurance Company re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (LaHaye, Luke)
Related: [-]
29 29 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Kinsale Insurance Company re13 MOTION to Strike7 Third Party Complaint . (LaHaye, Luke)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
30 30 ORDER that Case transferred to Southern District of Texas, Houston Division; FURTHER ORDERED that the Oral Argument is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/12/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
31 31 Case transferred in from Louisiana Eastern. Case Number 2:23-cv-02217; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
Related: [-]
32 32 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/10/2024 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison( Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(BrendaLacy, 4)
Related: [-]