California Northern District Court
Judge:Beth Labson Freeman
Case #: 5:23-cv-06471
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause28:1338 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 12, 2024 3:43 AM PDT
Defendant
Genista Biosciences Inc.
Represented By
Stephen C. Holmes
Hansen Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Craig Alan Hansen
Hansen Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Institute for Environmental Health, Inc.
Represented By
Benjamin J. Byer
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
John Douglas Freed
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, August 05, 2024
41 41 2 pgs order Order Mon 08/05 2:32 PM
ORDER APPROVING 40 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/5/2024. (blflc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
40 40 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 08/05 1:18 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice by Institute for Environmental Health, Inc. (Freed, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
39 39 4 pgs order Order Mon 06/17 5:25 PM
ORDER EXTENDING STAY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/17/2024. (blflc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
38 38 misc Status Report Mon 06/17 3:29 PM
STATUS REPORT by Institute for Environmental Health, Inc.. (Freed, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
utility Set/Clear Flags Set/Reset Deadlines Set/Reset Hearings Fri 05/03 10:22 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VACATED re37 ORDER GRANTING36 STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION AND VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (tsh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
37 37 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 05/02 5:19 PM
ORDER GRANTING 36 STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION AND VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/2/2024. (blflc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 05/02 1:26 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Action and Vacate Case Management Conference filed by Institute for Environmental Health, Inc.. (Freed, John)
Related: [-]
35 35 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Thu 05/02 12:29 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONVERTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ZOOM WEBINAR CONFERENCE and NOTICE OF REQUIRED REGISTRATION. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2024 11:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at blfcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 5/7/2024, at 12:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
34 34 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 05/01 4:08 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification (ADR LR 3-5 b) of Discussion of ADR Options (Hansen, Craig)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
33 33 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Fri 04/26 4:07 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Byer, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 04/22 9:33 AM
Reset Deadlines: Defendant to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by May 1, 2024. (tsh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
32 32 adr ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance after 5/1/2018 Fri 04/19 10:26 AM
ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
31 31 3 pgs order Order Thu 04/18 6:03 PM
ORDER APPROVING 30 JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-1(a). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/18/2024. (blflc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Thu 04/18 4:50 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-1(a) filed by Genista Biosciences Inc.. (Holmes, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
29 29 3 pgs order Order Fri 03/22 11:10 AM
ORDER APPROVING 28 JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/22/2024. (blflc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
28 28 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Thu 03/21 2:07 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-1(a) filed by Genista Biosciences Inc.. (Hansen, Craig)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
27 27 3 pgs order Order Thu 03/07 5:19 PM
ORDER APPROVING 26 JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/7/2024. (blflc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Thu 03/07 10:29 AM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-1(a) filed by Genista Biosciences Inc.. (Holmes, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
25 25 3 pgs order Order Fri 02/23 4:53 PM
ORDER APPROVING 24 JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-1(a). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/23/2024. (blflc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Fri 02/23 1:55 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-1(a) filed by Genista Biosciences Inc.. (Holmes, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
23 23 3 pgs order Order Thu 02/08 4:51 PM
ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-1(a). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/8/2024. (blflc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
22 22 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Wed 02/07 6:09 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-1(a) filed by Genista Biosciences Inc.. (Holmes, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
21 21 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/22 9:28 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2024 11:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
20 20 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 01/19 2:58 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Genista Biosciences Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Padma Kastury, Other Affiliate Aparna Palaparthi for Genista Biosciences Inc.. and Genista Biosciences Inc.'s FRCP Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Holmes, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 01/17 2:32 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 1/17/2024.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
18 18 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Wed 01/17 10:07 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
4 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Institute for Environmental Health, Inc. (Freed, John)
Related: [-]
3 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Freed, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Freed, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 38 pgs COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Genista Biosciences Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-18944354.). Filed by Institute for Environmental Health, Inc..(Freed, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet