JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS RESEARCH UK LIMITED (f/k/a GW RESEARCH LIMITED) v. APOTEX INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Michael E Farbiarz |
Referred: | Andre M Espinosa |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-23141 |
Nature of Suit | 835 Property Rights - Patent – Abbreviated New Drug Application |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Dec 15, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 12:15 AM EDT |
Defendant
API PHARMA TECH LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
APOTEX INC.
|
|
Defendant
ASCENT PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
BIOPHORE PHARMA, INC.
|
|
Defendant
CIPLA LTD.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CIPLA USA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
INVAGEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LUPIN LTD.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MSN LABORATORIES PRIVATE LTD.
|
|
Defendant
MSN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
TARO PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.
|
|
Defendant
ZENARA PHARMA PRIVATE LTD.
|
|
Plaintiff
JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS RESEARCH UK LIMITED (f/k/a GW RESEARCH LIMITED)
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 08, 2024 | ||
56 | 56
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Wed 05/08 12:33 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim Jazz Pharmaceuticals Research UK Limited's Answer to MSN Laboratories Private Limited and MSN Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Counterclaims by JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS RESEARCH UK LIMITED (f/k/a GW RESEARCH LIMITED).(LIZZA, CHARLES) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
55 | 55
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Fri 05/03 1:04 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Jazz's time to answer, move, or otherwise reply to InvaGen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cipla Ltd., Cipla USA, Inc., and API Pharma Tech LLC's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement (D.I. 47).. (CALLO, ALEXANDER) |
|
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Fri 05/03 3:52 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document55 submitted by JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS RESEARCH UK LIMITED (f/k/a GW RESEARCH LIMITED) has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/24/2024. (sm) |