Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Sarah E Geraghty
Referred: John K Larkins, III
Case #: 1:23-cv-05748
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 et seq. Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2023
Terminated:Dec 03, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 11, 2024 4:44 AM EDT
Defendant
Accurate Neuromonitoring SE, LLC
Represented By
Ronald G. Polly, Jr.
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Alex Michael Barfield
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Matthew A. Boyd
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Afia Davis
Represented By
Matthew C. Billips
Barrett & Farahany
contact info


Docket last updated: 42 minutes ago
Friday, January 03, 2025
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Fri 01/03 9:05 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING24 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (ane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
24 24 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 01/02 3:56 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Afia Davis. (Billips, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Tue 12/03 4:13 PM
ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. The parties shall file the appropriate dismissal documents within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order. If the parties need additional time, they should move for such additional time to finalize the settlement. If the settlement fails, the parties should promptly move to reopen the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 12/3/2024. (tcc)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 12/03 2:32 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Afia Davis (Billips, Matthew)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 12/03 4:14 PM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III terminated from case. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 11/13 8:31 AM
ORDER GRANTING20 Joint Motion to Stay. The Court ORDERS that deadlines in the case be STAYED through the conclusion of the parties' upcoming mediation. The parties shall notify the Court by December 2, 2024, whether the mediation was successful. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 11/12/2024. (ane)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
20 20 motion Stay Mon 11/11 10:42 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Mediation by Afia Davis. (Billips, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
19 19 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 09/11 10:47 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Deadline for Dispositive Motions by Afia Davis. (Billips, Matthew)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 09/11 5:27 PM
ORDER by docket entry only granting19 Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery ends on 11/29/24. Any motions for summary judgment will be due no later than 12/30/2024. No further discovery extensions will be granted absent a showing of very good cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 9/11/24. (emm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 06/18 2:18 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Deadline for Dispositive Motions by Afia Davis. (Billips, Matthew)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 06/18 4:57 PM
ORDER by docket entry only granting18 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery ends on 9/30/24. Dispositive motions will be due no later than 10/29/24. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 6/18/24. (emm)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
17 17 discov Certificate of Service Mon 06/17 4:59 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery (Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants First Request for Production of Documents) by Afia Davis.(Billips, Matthew)
Related: [-]
16 16 discov Certificate of Service Mon 06/17 4:58 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery (Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants First Interrogatories) by Afia Davis.(Billips, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
15 15 discov Certificate of Service Thu 05/30 2:13 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery (Plaintiffs First Requests for Admissions, First Interrogatories, and First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant) by Afia Davis.(Billips, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
14 14 discov Certificate of Service Thu 05/16 5:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Accurate Neuromonitoring SE, LLC's First Interrogatories to Plaintiff and First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Accurate Neuromonitoring SE, LLC.(Barfield, Alex)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
13 13 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/11 11:17 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER AND INSTRUCTIONS REGARDING MANAGEMENT OF CIVIL CASES re:12 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 7/1/2024. Motions for summary judgment due by 7/31/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 3/11/2024. (ane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
12 12 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Wed 03/06 8:51 AM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Afia Davis. (Billips, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
11 11 discov Initial Disclosures Tue 03/05 10:56 AM
Initial Disclosures by Afia Davis.(Billips, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
10 10 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/31 6:41 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Accurate Neuromonitoring SE, LLC. (Barfield, Alex)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/31 6:40 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Accurate Neuromonitoring SE, LLC. Discovery ends on 7/1/2024.(Barfield, Alex)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/18 11:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Michael Barfield on behalf of Accurate Neuromonitoring SE, LLC (Barfield, Alex)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/18 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A. Boyd on behalf of Accurate Neuromonitoring SE, LLC (Boyd, Matthew)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/18 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald G. Polly, Jr on behalf of Accurate Neuromonitoring SE, LLC (Polly, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
5 5 misc Stipulation Thu 01/11 11:13 AM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, Extending Time to Answer by Accurate Neuromonitoring SE, LLC.(Boyd, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, December 21, 2023
4 4 service Return of Service Executed Thu 12/21 8:55 AM
Return of Service Executed by Afia Davis. Accurate Neuromonitoring SE, LLC served on 12/20/2023, answer due 1/10/2024. (Billips, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 12/18 12:33 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Afia Davis. (Billips, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 12/15 11:24 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Accurate Neuromonitoring SE, LLC. (jbu)
Related: [-]
1 1 27 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 12/15 11:23 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Afia Davis. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13098243)(jbu)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet