New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul G Gardephe
Referred: Andrew J Peck
Case #: 1:14-cv-08927
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 10, 2014
Terminated:Apr 19, 2016

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 57 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 19, 2016
47 47 order Stipulation and Order of Dismissal Tue 04/19 12:00 PM
STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the respective parties to the above-captioned action, as follows: Defendant City of New York shall pay to plaintiff's counsel, Stecklow & Thompson, PLLC, the sum total of THIRTY-FIVE THOUSAND DOLLARS ($35.000) in full satisfaction of plaintiff's attorneys' fees, expense and costs. Counsel for plaintiff hereby agrees and represents that plaintiff has assigned his rights to attorneys' fees to him, and that no other claims for attorneys' fees, costs and expenses arising out of this action shall be made by or on behalf of plaintiff in any application for attorneys' fees, costs and expenses at any time. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/18/2016) (kl)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Transcript Deadlines Tue 04/19 12:04 PM
Terminate Transcript Deadlines (kl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2016
46 46 misc Letter Thu 04/14 4:48 PM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Ben Kuruvilla dated April 14, 2016 re: advising Court of settlement. Document filed by Adw Margarito, Massey, The City Of New York,.(Kuruvilla, Ben)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2016
45 45 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 03/02 9:51 AM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the pre-trial conference presently scheduled for March 3, 2016 is adjourned to April 13, 2016 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Pretrial Conference set for 4/13/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/1/2016) (spo)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 29, 2016
44 44 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Mon 02/29 3:59 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/11/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
43 43 misc Transcript Mon 02/29 3:58 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/11/2016 before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/24/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2016
42 42 order Order Thu 02/18 11:46 AM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: AMKC shall make plaintiff Vernon Jones, B&C # 8951500241, available for a deposition in this matter, Vernon Jones v. The City of New York, et al., 14-cv-8927-PGG-AJP, at AMKC, located at 18-18 Hazen Street, East Elmhurst, New York 11370, on February 25, 2016, from 10:00 a.m. until 5:00 p.m., and that the deposition will be recorded in person by a stenographer. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 2/18/2016) (cf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 16, 2016
41 41 misc Letter Tue 02/16 5:56 PM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from Ben Kuruvilla dated February 16, 2016 re: Plaintiff's Deposition. Document filed by Adw Margarito, Massey, The City Of New York,.(Kuruvilla, Ben)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, February 15, 2016
40 40 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 02/15 12:44 PM
ANSWER to19 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Adw Margarito, Massey, The City Of New York,.(Kuruvilla, Ben)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2016
minutes Discovery Hearing Thu 02/11 4:14 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck: Discovery Hearing held on 2/11/2016. Disc cutoff 2/29, SJ letter due 3/1.Disc. disputes raised in Dkts 34-37 resolved - see transcript. Depositions set for 2/25 for plaintiff, 2/18 and 2/29 for the 4 defendants (2 per day). (Gray, Diane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 10, 2016
39 39 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 02/10 1:01 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING DISCOVERY CONFERENCE: Discovery Hearing set for 2/11/2016 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 2/10/2016) (tn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 09, 2016
38 38 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 02/09 2:47 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute:* Discovery Dispute (Dkt. No. 34-37). Referred to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. SO ORDERED. Motions referred to Andrew J. Peck. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/09/2016) (ama)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 04, 2016
37 37 respm Response in Support of Motion Thu 02/04 2:30 PM
LETTER RESPONSE in Support of Motion addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Ben Kuruvilla dated February 4, 2016 re:35 LETTER MOTION for Discovery to take plaintiff's deposition, to compel plaintiff to cooperate with scheduling defendants' depositions, to compel plaintiff to cooperate with completing and filing a discovery stipulation and to compel plaint LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery in light of delays plaintiff has caused in discovery addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Ben Kuruvilla dated February 3, 2016. . Document filed by Adw Margarito, Massey, The City Of New York,. (Kuruvilla, Ben)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Letter Thu 02/04 1:04 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David A. Thompson dated February 4, 2016 re: Response to Defendants' February 3, 2016 Letter. Document filed by Vernon Jones.(Thompson, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Aug. 6, 2015 Response to Defendants' Document Demands and Interrogatories
Wednesday, February 03, 2016
35 35 motion Discovery Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 02/03 7:04 PM
LETTER MOTION for Discovery to take plaintiff's deposition, to compel plaintiff to cooperate with scheduling defendants' depositions, to compel plaintiff to cooperate with completing and filing a discovery stipulation and to compel plaintiff to respond to defendants' discovery demands addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Ben Kuruvilla dated February 3, 2016., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery in light of delays plaintiff has caused in discovery addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Ben Kuruvilla dated February 3, 2016. Document filed by Adw Margarito, Massey, The City Of New York,.(Kuruvilla, Ben)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Monday, January 25, 2016
34 34 motion Discovery Mon 01/25 8:55 PM
LETTER MOTION for Discovery seeking to so-order a proposed stipulation addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David A. Thompson dated January 25, 2015. Document filed by Vernon Jones.(Thompson, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulation,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Oct. 22, 2015 Letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Defendants Oct. 22, 2015 email agreeing with letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's Dec. 23, 2015 email proposing stipulation
Thursday, January 14, 2016
33 33 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 01/15 11:31 AM
ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for discovery is extended to February 16, 2016. It is further ORDERED that parties seeking to make post-discovery dispositive motions should submit a letter to the Court in accordance with Rule 4(A) of the Court's Individual Practices by February 16, 2016. Responses, if any, are due February 22, 2016. It is further ORDERED that a conference in this matter will take place on March 3, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Discovery due by 2/16/2016.) (Status Conference set for 3/3/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/14/2016) (adc)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 01/14 11:21 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 1/14/2016, ( Status Conference set for 3/3/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.). (Court Reporter Kelly Surina) (mr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2016
32 32 misc Status Report Wed 01/13 6:37 PM
STATUS REPORT. regarding production of video Document filed by Adw Margarito, Massey, The City Of New York,.(Kuruvilla, Ben)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2016
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 01/05 11:54 AM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pre-Motion Letter and Response to Plaintiff's Letter, dated December 23, 2015 addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Ben Kuruvilla dated January 5, 2016. Document filed by Adw Margarito, Massey, The City Of New York,.(Kuruvilla, Ben)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2015
30 30 misc Letter Wed 12/23 11:13 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David A. Thompson, Esq. dated December 23, 2015 re: Pre-motion letter re video. Document filed by Vernon Jones.(Thompson, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2015
29 29 order Memo Endorsement Tue 11/17 10:25 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:24 Letter, filed by Vernon Jones re: The Court's request to the plaintiff to identify discovery issues. ENDORSEMENT: The parties will submit a stipulation reflecting the agreements they have reached on discovery matters. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/16/2015) (kko)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2015
28 28 misc Status Report Fri 11/13 8:19 PM
STATUS REPORT. regarding defendants' efforts to provide software for video Document filed by Adw Margarito, Massey, The City Of New York,.(Kuruvilla, Ben)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Letter Fri 11/13 6:37 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David A. Thompson, Esq. dated November 13, 2015 re: Requested update concerning discovery issues. Document filed by Vernon Jones.(Thompson, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 06, 2015
26 26 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 11/06 12:51 PM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Ben Kuruvilla dated November 6, 2015 re:25 LETTER MOTION to Compel The City of New York, et al. to Produce video in legible format addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David A. Thompson, Esq. dated November 3, 2015. . Document filed by Adw Margarito, Massey, The City Of New York,. (Kuruvilla, Ben)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2015
25 25 motion Compel Tue 11/03 11:43 PM
LETTER MOTION to Compel The City of New York, et al. to Produce video in legible format addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David A. Thompson, Esq. dated November 3, 2015. Document filed by Vernon Jones.(Thompson, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - The Result of Opening the Defendants Video With the Defendants Recommended Software,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - The Computer Used to View the Files Now Has an Unwanted Yahoo Toolbar and Other Malware On It
Thursday, October 22, 2015
24 24 misc Letter Thu 10/22 8:31 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David A. Thompson, Esq. dated October 22, 2015 re: The Court's request to the plaintiff to identify discovery issues. Document filed by Vernon Jones.(Thompson, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Defendants' Discovery Responses
Thursday, October 15, 2015
23 23 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 10/15 6:39 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:22 Letter filed by Vernon Jones. ENDORSEMENT: The case management plan amended to include the dates set forth in this letter. The next conference in this matter will take place on Jan. 14, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel will advise the Court by Oct. 22, 2016 whether there any remaining discovery disputes. SO ORDERED., ( Expert Discovery due by 12/28/2015., Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/15/2015) (ama)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2015
22 22 misc Letter Thu 09/03 10:00 PM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David A. Thompson, Esq. dated September 3, 2015 re: Request for 37.2 pre-motion conference. Document filed by Vernon Jones.(Thompson, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 07, 2015
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 07/07 12:41 PM
ORDER granting20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Application is Granted. The Conference is adjourned to October 1, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/07/2015) (ama)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Set/Reset Hearings Tue 07/07 12:44 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Expert Discovery due by 10/28/2015., Fact Discovery due by 9/14/2015.), Set/Reset Hearings:( Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (ama)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2015
20 20 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 07/02 10:00 AM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Ben Kuruvilla dated July 2, 2015. Document filed by Adw Margarito, Massey, The City Of New York,.(Kuruvilla, Ben)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 27, 2015
misc Notice Regarding Deleted Document Mon 04/27 2:26 PM
***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. NOTE FOR RULE 15 NON COMPLIANCE. (laq)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2015
19 19 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 04/24 4:50 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against "John Does 1-5", Adw Margarito, Massey, Rose Moore, Shawn Smith II, The City Of New York, with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Vernon Jones. Related document:1 Complaint filed by Vernon Jones.(Thompson, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2015
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 04/23 3:39 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against "John Does 1-5", Adw Margarito, Massey, The City Of New York,, Shawn Smith II, Rose Moore with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Vernon Jones. Related document:1 Complaint filed by Vernon Jones.(Thompson, David)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Fri 04/24 10:35 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT AMENDED COMPLAINT. Notice to Attorney David Thompson RE: Document No. 18 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): PDF Errorthe wrong party was selected for FILED AGAINST Re-file the document and attach the correct PDF.Re-file the document and select the correct party you are filing against. The caption on the complaint must be in correlation with the docket. (jom)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 17, 2015
17 17 order Case Management Plan Fri 04/17 12:21 PM
ORDER: After consultation with counsel for the parties, the Court adopts the following Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, in accordance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16 and 26(f). All parties do not consent to conducting further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 4/23/2015. Motions due by 7/15/2015. Responses due by 7/29/2015 Deposition due by 7/15/2015. Fact Discovery due by 7/15/2015. Expert Discovery due by 8/29/2015. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is: 3-5 days. Next Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/17/2015) (ama)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 16, 2015
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/16 10:09 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Adw Margarito, Massey, The City Of New York,.(Kuruvilla, Ben)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 04/16 11:41 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/16/2015, ( Status Conference set for 7/16/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.). (mr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 13, 2015
15 15 misc Letter Mon 04/13 7:56 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David A. Thompson, Esq. dated April 13, 2015 re: Joint Letter Regarding Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by Vernon Jones.(Thompson, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order
Friday, April 03, 2015
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 04/03 10:18 AM
ORDER granting13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Application is Granted. The Clerk will terminate Dkt. #13. SO ORDERED. The City Of New York, answer due 4/15/2015. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/03/2015) (ama)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 27, 2015
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 03/27 1:33 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Ben Kuruvilla dated March 27, 2015. Document filed by The City Of New York,.(Kuruvilla, Ben)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/27 1:25 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ben Ninan Kuruvilla on behalf of The City Of New York,. (Kuruvilla, Ben)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 13, 2015
11 11 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Fri 03/13 1:19 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Adw Margarito served on 2/27/2015, answer due 3/20/2015. Service was accepted by Captain Small. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Vernon Jones. (Thompson, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 12, 2015
10 10 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/12 12:22 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:9 Letter filed by Vernon Jones. I respectfully suggest that it would be appropriate to extend the plaintiff's time to serve these officers until April 17, 2015, which is the day after the April 16th initial conference. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/12/2015) (ama)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 09, 2015
9 9 misc Letter Mon 03/09 8:51 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David A. Thompson, Esq. dated March 9, 2015 re: extension of time in which to serve process. Document filed by Vernon Jones.(Thompson, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Mon 03/09 8:47 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Massey served on 2/27/2015, answer due 3/20/2015. Service was accepted by Captain Small. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Vernon Jones. (Thompson, David)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/09 3:29 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:6 Letter filed by Vernon Jones. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is Granted. The Conference is adjourned to April 16, 2015 at 10:30 a.m. SO ORDERED., ( Initial Conference set for 4/16/2015 at 10:30 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/09/2015) (ama)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 06, 2015
6 6 misc Letter Fri 03/06 1:51 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from David A. Thompson, Esq. dated March 6, 2015 re: adjournment of the conference scheduled for March 12, 2015. Document filed by Vernon Jones.(Thompson, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Fri 03/06 12:31 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The City Of New York, served on 2/19/2015, answer due 3/12/2015. Service was accepted by Ms. Minz. Document filed by The City Of New York,. (Thompson, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 28, 2015
4 4 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 01/28 12:43 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial pre-trial conference presently scheduled for January 29, 2015 is adjourned to March 12, 2015 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. In accordance with this Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint letter and proposed Case Management Plan by 5:00p.m. on Thursday, March 5, 2015. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 3/12/2015 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/28/2015) (ama)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 18, 2014
3 3 order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 11/18 1:19 PM
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the Court for an initial pretrial conference in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on Thursday, January 29, 2015 at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 1/29/2015 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/18/2014) (ama)
Related: [-]
misc Note to Attorney to E-Mail PDF Tue 11/18 11:44 AM
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney David Allen Thompson for noncompliance with Section 14.2 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document 1 Complaint to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (moh)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit PDF of Civil Cover Sheet Tue 11/18 11:44 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT PDF OF CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney David Allen Thompson, to submit PDF of the Civil Cover Sheet. Email a copy of Civil Cover Sheet to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (moh)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Deleted Document Tue 11/18 1:22 PM
***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 4 Letter. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ama)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 10, 2014
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 11/12 2:20 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/12 2:18 PM
COMPLAINT against "John Does 1-5", Adw Margarito, Massey, More, John Smith, II, The City Of New York,. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401109547)Document filed by Vernon Jones.(moh)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Wed 11/12 2:19 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to "John Does 1-5", Adw Margarito, Massey, More, John Smith, II, The City Of New York,. (moh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 11/12 2:20 PM
Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. (moh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 11/12 2:20 PM
Case Designated ECF. (moh)
Related: [-]