New York Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00519
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Dec 16, 2023 2:22 AM EST
Defendant
LEONARDO PETROSILLO (2)
Represented By
Donna R. Newman
Law Office Of Donna R. Newman
contact info
Defendant
EDWIN SPEARS (1)
Represented By
Nora K. Hirozawa
Federal Defenders Of New York
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Michael Wallace Gibaldi
Doj-Usao
contact info
Sean Michael Sherman
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/16/2023 3:28 AM EST
Friday, November 24, 2023
1 1 9 pgs COMPLAINT and affidavit in support of arrest warrants as to EDWIN SPEARS (1), LEONARDO PETROSILLO (2). Signed by Peggy Kuo dtd 11/25/2023. (SY) [1:23-mj-01049-PK]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak: For an Arraignment as to EDWIN SPEARS (1) Count Complaint held on 11/30/2023, Attorney Appointment Hearing as to EDWIN SPEARS held on 11/30/2023, Initial Appearance as to EDWIN SPEARS held on 11/30/2023. AUSA Michael Gibaldi and Sean SHerman; Defense counsel Nora Hirozawa. Preliminary hearing is waived. Brady order entered on the record. Defense presented a bail application as stated on the record; The Government opposed the package as stated on the record. The Court granted bond in the amount of $500,000.00 with property to be posted before his release. An order of detention entered until the bond is satisfied. (FTR Log #5:05-5:43.) (MS) [1:23-mj-01049-PK]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak: For an Arraignment as to LEONARDO PETROSILLO (2) Count Complaint held on 11/30/2023, Attorney Appointment Hearing as to LEONARDO PETROSILLO held on 11/30/2023, Initial Appearance as to LEONARDO PETROSILLO held on 11/30/2023; AUSA Sean Sherman and Michael Gibaldi. Defense counsel Donna Newman. Preliminary hearing is waived. Brady Act ordered on the record. Defense did not present a bail package at this time. A Temporary order of detention entered until 12 5-2023 @ 11am when a bail application will be presented. (FTR Log #5:05-5:43.) (MS) [1:23-mj-01049-PK]
Related: [-]
3 3 9 pgs Letter in Support of Detention as to EDWIN SPEARS, LEONARDO PETROSILLO (Sherman, Sean) [1:23-mj-01049-PK]
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by EDWIN SPEARS (MS) [1:23-mj-01049-PK]
Related: [-]
8 8 3 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION as to EDWIN SPEARS. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/30/2023. (MS) [1:23-mj-01049-PK]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER: This order is entered pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) to confirm the prosecution's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and to summarize the possible consequences of violating those obligations. as to EDWIN SPEARS, LEONARDO PETROSILLO. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/30/2023. (MS) [1:23-mj-01049-PK]
Related: [-]
10 10 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by LEONARDO PETROSILLO (MS) [1:23-mj-01049-PK]
Related: [-]
11 11 CJA 20 as to LEONARDO PETROSILLO: Appointment of Attorney Donna R. Newman for LEONARDO PETROSILLO.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/30/2023. (MS) [1:23-mj-01049-PK]
Related: [-]
12 12 TEMPORARY COMMITMENT Issued as to LEONARDO PETROSILLO (MS) [1:23-mj-01049-PK]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
4 4 MOTION for Reconsideration regarding bail by USA as to EDWIN SPEARS. (Gibaldi, Michael) [1:23-mj-01049-PK]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by EDWIN SPEARS. (Hirozawa, Nora) [1:23-mj-01049-PK]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
6 6 MOTION for Bond by EDWIN SPEARS. (Hirozawa, Nora) [1:23-mj-01049-PK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho: For a contested bail Hearing as to LEONARDO PETROSILLO held on 12/5/2023. Defense presented a bail package as stated on the record; The Government opposed. The Court denied the bail application for reasons stated on the record. An order of detention entered. (FTR Log #12:14-12:50.) (MS) [1:23-mj-01049-PK]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER endorsed on letter dtd 12/4/23 as to EDWIN SPEARS : "Counsel is directed to contact the Magistrate Clericals to schedule an appearance beforethe Duty Magistrate Judge to consider the proposed bond. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 12/5/2023." (SY) [1:23-mj-01049-PK]
Related: [-]
14 14 3 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION as to LEONARDO PETROSILLO. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 12/5/2023. (MS) [1:23-mj-01049-PK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
15 15 9 pgs Letter in Further Support of Detention as to EDWIN SPEARS (Sherman, Sean) [1:23-mj-01049-PK]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara:Status Conference as to EDWIN SPEARS held on 12/8/2023. AUSA Michael Gibaldi present. Defendant present w counsel nora Hirozawa. Dft not prepare to make a bail application. Order of detention w/o prejudice continues. (FTR Log #11;41-11;47.) (SY) [1:23-mj-01049-PK]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
18 18 7 pgs INDICTMENT as to EDWIN SPEARS (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, LEONARDO PETROSILLO (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5. (IH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Information Sheet