North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Max O Cogburn, Jr
Referred: W Carleton Metcalf
Case #: 1:23-cv-00350
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2601 Family & Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jun 14, 2024 6:45 AM EDT
Defendant
Gilkey Lumber Company, Inc.
Represented By
Stacy K. Wood
Parker, Poe, Adams & Bernstein
contact info
Zachary Scott Anstett
Parker Poe Adams & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Tory Ian Summey
Parker Poe Adams & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sherry Fowler
Represented By
T. Jonathan Adams
Strianese Huckert, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, July 18, 2024
10 10 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 07/18 9:03 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Gilkey Lumber Company, Inc. (All Claims Dismissed. Case to be Closed). (Anstett, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
9 9 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/18 12:40 PM
Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 2 - 3 Days. Discovery due by 12/2/2024. Motions due by 1/2/2025. Mediation deadline set for 12/19/2024. Ready Date for Jury Trial: for 6/2/2025 09:31 AM in Courtroom 1, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr. Signed by US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 3/18/2024. (cly)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference Mon 03/18 9:28 AM
Minute Entry: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held before U.S. Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Plaintiff's attorney: T. Jonathan Adams. Defendant's attorneys: Tory Ian Summey and Zachary Scott Anstett. An initial pretrial conference was held by telephone March 18, 2024 with T. Jonathan Adams participating on behalf of Plaintiff Sherry Fowler and Tory Ian Summey and Zachary Scott Anstett participating on behalf of Defendant Gilkey Lumber Company, Inc. A pretrial order will issue. (TNC)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 17, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Sun 03/17 8:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tory Ian Summey on behalf of Gilkey Lumber Company, Inc. (Summey, Tory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
7 7 discov Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan Tue 03/05 11:04 AM
Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Anstett, Zachary)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing Tue 03/05 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference (by video) set for 3/18/2024 09:00 AM in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Remote hearing link provided in separate correspondence. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. For matters conducted on the record: LCvR 7.1(i) requires that when a party knows in advance that a transcript will be required of a hearing before a Magistrate Judge or other judicial officer (before whom proceedings are digitally recorded), the party must, before the hearing, notify the Official Court Reporter serving such judicial officer of the need. Counsel are directed to satisfy this requirement by communicating directly with the Judges Courtroom Deputy in advance of the hearing. (kby)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
notice Notice to Conduct Initial Attorneys Conference Tue 02/27 3:44 PM
NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference] , and if applicable, the[LINK:Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge] , should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 3/19/2024. (ams)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
order Social Security Scheduling Order (NEW) Fri 02/23 9:38 AM
TEXT-ONLY Social Security Scheduling Order. It Appearing to the Court that the Defendant Commissioner has filed an answer and/or the administrative record herein, the issues are ripe for this Court's review. Pursuant to the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions and Local Civil Rule 7.2, the Plaintiff's Brief shall be due within 30 days. The Defendant Commissioner's Brief shall be due 30 days after service of the Plaintiff's SS Brief. The Plaintiff may file a Reply Brief within 14 days of the Defendant Commissioner's Brief. Plaintiff SS Brief due by 3/25/2024.. Entered by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 2/23/2024. (ams)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/20 3:27 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Gilkey Lumber Company, Inc..(Wood, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 01/25 11:46 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: 1 Complaint . Gilkey Lumber Company, Inc. answer due 2/20/2024. Text of Order: ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED, and the deadline for Defendant to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED through and including February 20, 2024. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 1/25/2023. (kkb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/24 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Scott Anstett on behalf of Gilkey Lumber Company, Inc. (Anstett, Zachary)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/24 10:31 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gilkey Lumber Company, Inc.. (Wood, Stacy)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Extension of Time Wed 01/24 10:30 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:1 Complaint by Gilkey Lumber Company, Inc.. (Wood, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 12/18 11:00 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Gilkey Lumber Company, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (cly)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 12/18 10:58 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (cly)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 17, 2023
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Sun 12/17 7:06 PM
COMPLAINT Sherry T. Fowler against Gilkey Lumber Company, Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6333546), filed by Sherry T Fowler.(Adams, T.)
Related: [-]