Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Solomon Oliver, Jr
Case #: 1:23-cv-02397
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2023
Terminated:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Friday Jun 14, 2024 6:45 AM EDT
Defendant
Ken Kary
Represented By
Michael C. Lucas
City Of Willoughby
contact info
Edmond Z. Jaber
Mazanec Raskin Ryder
contact info
John T. McLandrich
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Solon
contact info
Defendant
Kirtland Country Club
Represented By
James M. Williams
Krugliak, Wilkins, Griffiths & Dougherty - Canton
contact info
Defendant
Gerry Merhar
Represented By
Michael C. Lucas
City Of Willoughby
contact info
Edmond Z. Jaber
Mazanec Raskin Ryder
contact info
John T. McLandrich
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Solon
contact info
Defendant
City of Willoughby, Ohio
Represented By
Michael C. Lucas
City Of Willoughby
contact info
Edmond Z. Jaber
Mazanec Raskin Ryder
contact info
John T. McLandrich
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Solon
contact info
Defendant
John Does
Defendant
Robert Fiala
Represented By
Michael C. Lucas
City Of Willoughby
contact info
Edmond Z. Jaber
Mazanec Raskin Ryder
contact info
John T. McLandrich
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Solon
contact info
Defendant
Kirtland Country Club Co.
Represented By
James M. Williams
Krugliak, Wilkins, Griffiths & Dougherty - Canton
contact info
Plaintiff
Michon Haymer
Represented By
Timothy P. Misny
Misny & Associates
contact info
Eric W. Henry
Henry Law
contact info
Daniel R. Karon
Law Office Of Daniel R. Karon
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott Haymer
Represented By
Timothy P. Misny
Misny & Associates
contact info
Eric W. Henry
Henry Law
contact info
Daniel R. Karon
Law Office Of Daniel R. Karon
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, March 31, 2025
79 79 order Judgment Mon 03/31 11:55 AM
Judgment Entry in favor of Defendants City of Willoughby, Ohio, Gerry Merhar, Ken Kary and Robert Fiala and against Plaintiffs Michon Haymer, Scott Haymer. Related document78 . Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 3/31/2025. (R,Sh)
Related: [-]
78 78 20 pgs order Order on Motion for judgment on the pleadings Order on Motion for summary judgment Mon 03/31 11:50 AM
Order. The court grants Defendants the City of Willoughby, Gerry Merhar, Robert Fiala and Kenn Kary's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (ECF No.48 ) in respect to all counts brought by Plaintiffs against them. Consequently, the court denies Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No.68 ) as moot. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 3/31/2025.(R,Sh)
Related: [-]
77 77 17 pgs order Order on Motion to dismiss case Order on Motion for leave Mon 03/31 11:41 AM
Order. The court grants Defendant Kirtland Country Club and Kirtland Country Club Company's (KCC) Motion to Dismiss (ECF No.40 ) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1). The court also declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. § 1367 over Plaintiffs' state-law claims because the court lacks original jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. § 1331. Lastly, KCC's pending Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No.69 ) is denied as moot. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 3/31/2025.(R,Sh)
Related: [-]
76 76 4 pgs order Order on Motion to dismiss Mon 03/31 11:31 AM
Order denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil PRocedure 41(A)(2). Related [+]. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 3/31/2025.(R,Sh)
Related: [-] 73