Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Thomas M Rose
Referred: Peter B Silvain, Jr
Case #: 3:23-cv-00377
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2023
Terminated:Sep 05, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jun 15, 2024 6:38 AM EDT
Defendant
Antony Blinken
Represented By
William Bryan King, II
Atrium Two
contact info
Defendant
Scott M Oudkirk
Represented By
William Bryan King, II
Atrium Two
contact info
Plaintiff
Abtin Ataei
Represented By
Seth Benjamin Marks
Seth B. Marks, Esq.
contact info
Joshua L. Goldstein
Goldstein Immigration Lawyers
contact info


Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago
Thursday, September 05, 2024
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 09/05 10:52 AM
*** Pursuant to Notice of Dismissal filed 4/2/2024. Civil Case Terminated. (ep)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 04/02 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Abtin Ataei (Marks, Seth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 03/19 8:49 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by 4/17/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr. on 3/19/2024. (lk)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 03/18 3:52 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re6 Stipulation,1 Complaint, New date requested 4/17/2024. by Defendants Antony Blinken, Scott M Oudkirk. (King, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 03/01 7:21 AM
Reset Deadlines: Scott M Oudkirk answer due 3/18/2024. Antony Blinken answer due 3/18/2024. (srb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
6 6 misc Stipulation Mon 02/26 2:30 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Antony Blinken, Scott M Oudkirk. (King, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/08 12:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William Bryan King, II for Defendants Antony Blinken, Scott M Oudkirk (King, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 01/02 2:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Antony Blinken, Scott M Oudkirk. Antony Blinken served on 12/29/2023, answer due 2/27/2024; Scott M Oudkirk served on 12/29/2023, answer due 2/27/2024. (Marks, Seth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Summons Issued as to USA Wed 12/20 10:38 AM
Summons Issued as to Secretary of the U.S. Department of State; Deputy Chief of Mission, U.S. Embassy in Turkey; U.S. Attorney; and U.S. Attorney General (jmb)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/20 9:22 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9738165) of Joshua L. Goldstein by Plaintiff Abtin Ataei. (Marks, Seth)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/20 10:31 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joshua L. Goldstein as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr. on 12/20/2023. (jmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/18 11:10 AM
COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against Antony Blinken, Scott M Oudkirk ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9734192), filed by Abtin Ataei. (Marks, Seth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Form