Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Paul L Maloney
Referred: Ray Kent
Case #: 1:23-cv-01313
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jun 15, 2024 6:18 AM EDT
defendant
Rockford Public School District
Represented By
Amy Elizabeth Murphy
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
Amanda Rauh-Bieri
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
Catherine A. Tracey
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
defendant
Rockford Public Schools' Board of Education
Represented By
Amy Elizabeth Murphy
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
Amanda Rauh-Bieri
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
Catherine A. Tracey
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
plaintiff
Dan Mead
Represented By
John J. Bursch
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Katherine L. Anderson
Alliance Defending Freedom (az)
contact info
David Andrew Cortman
Alliance Defending Freedom (ga)
contact info
Vincent M. Wagner
Alliance Defending Freedom (va)
contact info
plaintiff
Jennifer Mead
Represented By
John J. Bursch
Alliance Defending Freedom
contact info
Katherine L. Anderson
Alliance Defending Freedom (az)
contact info
David Andrew Cortman
Alliance Defending Freedom (ga)
contact info
Vincent M. Wagner
Alliance Defending Freedom (va)
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
35 35 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/11 3:29 PM
NOTICE re12 of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by plaintiffs Dan Mead, Jennifer Mead (Anderson, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
34 34 respoth Response (non-motion) Fri 03/21 7:25 PM
RESPONSE TO33 filed by plaintiffs Dan Mead, Jennifer Mead (Anderson, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
33 33 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/13 11:10 AM
NOTICE re12 of Supplemental Authority by defendants Rockford Public School District, Rockford Public Schools' Board of Education (Rauh-Bieri, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
32 32 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/30 4:54 PM
NOTICE re12 of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by plaintiffs Dan Mead, Jennifer Mead (Anderson, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
31 31 respoth Response (non-motion) Tue 11/05 4:51 PM
RESPONSE TO29 Supplemental Response to Rockford's Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by plaintiffs Dan Mead, Jennifer Mead (Anderson, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
30 30 respoth Response (non-motion) Tue 09/17 5:28 PM
RESPONSE TO29 filed by plaintiffs Dan Mead, Jennifer Mead (Anderson, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
29 29 notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/05 1:21 PM
NOTICE re12 of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by defendants Rockford Public School District, Rockford Public Schools' Board of Education (Rauh-Bieri, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
28 28 respoth Response (non-motion) Tue 07/09 3:49 PM
RESPONSE TO26 filed by defendants Rockford Public School District, Rockford Public Schools' Board of Education (Rauh-Bieri, Amanda)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 07/09 3:24 PM
(DISREGARD) REPLY to response to motion12 filed by Rockford Public School District, Rockford Public Schools' Board of Education (Rauh-Bieri, Amanda) Modified text on 7/9/2024; this entry replaced by28 per attorney's office (pjw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/25 2:53 PM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss re12 with certificate of service by plaintiffs Dan Mead, Jennifer Mead (Anderson, Katherine) Modified text on 6/25/2024 (pjw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
25 25 respm Certificate of Compliance Regarding Word Count Mon 04/29 9:44 PM
CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Reply to Response to Motion24 filed by Rockford Public School District, Rockford Public Schools' Board of Education (Murphy, Amy)
Related: [-]
24 24 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/29 9:42 PM
REPLY to response to motion12 filed by Rockford Public School District, Rockford Public Schools' Board of Education (Murphy, Amy)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
23 23 order Stipulation and Order Fri 04/12 1:21 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER; deadline for defendants to file reply brief extended to 4/29/2024; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
22 22 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Wed 04/10 1:32 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to extend defendants' deadline to file reply in support of motion to dismiss by defendants Rockford Public School District, Rockford Public Schools' Board of Education (Rauh-Bieri, Amanda) Modified text on 4/10/2024 (pjw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
21 21 respm Response in Opposition Mon 04/08 6:08 PM
RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim 12 filed by Dan Mead, Jennifer Mead (Anderson, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 03/04 11:28 AM
ORDER granting18 motion for extension of time for Rule 26 (f) conference and staying all discovery deadlines; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Stipulation and Order Mon 03/04 11:25 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER; deadline for defendants to file response to motion to dismiss extended to 4/8/2024; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time Fri 03/01 2:32 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to Hold Rule 26(f) Conference and Stay Discovery Deadlines Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss by plaintiffs Dan Mead, Jennifer Mead; (Wagner, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
17 17 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Fri 03/01 2:15 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by plaintiffs Dan Mead, Jennifer Mead (Wagner, Vincent)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/01 11:33 AM
REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT (NOTICE) re12 by defendants Rockford Public School District, Rockford Public Schools' Board of Education (Rauh-Bieri, Amanda) Modified text on 3/1/2024 (pjw)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order Fri 02/09 4:00 PM
ORDER regarding12 motion to dismiss; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
14 14 respm Certificate of Compliance Regarding Word Count Thu 02/08 5:27 PM
CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion13 filed by Rockford Public School District, Rockford Public Schools' Board of Education (Tracey, Catherine)
Related: [-]
13 13 respm Brief in Support of a Motion Thu 02/08 5:26 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim 12 filed by Rockford Public School District, Rockford Public Schools' Board of Education (Tracey, Catherine)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim Thu 02/08 5:24 PM
MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendants Rockford Public School District, Rockford Public Schools' Board of Education; (Tracey, Catherine)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Thu 02/08 2:52 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Amanda Rauh-Bieri on behalf of defendants Rockford Public School District, Rockford Public Schools' Board of Education (Rauh-Bieri, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
11 11 misc Notice Regarding Reassignment of Referral Judge After Recusal Wed 01/10 12:30 PM
NOTICE that this case is now referred to Magistrate Judge Ray Kent per order10 ; case is no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Berens (mlc)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Wed 01/10 10:43 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL: Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens recused from this case; case to be reassigned; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
9 9 order Stipulation and Order Tue 01/09 2:36 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER; deadline for defendants to respond to complaint extended to 2/8/2024; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Tue 01/09 11:34 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint by defendants Rockford Public School District, Rockford Public Schools' Board of Education (Murphy, Amy)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/09 11:31 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT for Rockford Public Schools' Board of Education by Rockford Public School District, Rockford Public Schools' Board of Education (Murphy, Amy)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/09 11:28 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Rockford Public School District by Rockford Public School District, Rockford Public Schools' Board of Education (Murphy, Amy)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Tue 01/09 11:19 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Amy Elizabeth Murphy on behalf of defendants Rockford Public School District, Rockford Public Schools' Board of Education (Murphy, Amy)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Tue 01/09 11:24 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Catherine A. Tracey on behalf of defendants Rockford Public School District, Rockford Public Schools' Board of Education (Tracey, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/21 5:53 PM
SUMMONS returned executed; Rockford Public School District served on 12/20/2023, answer due 1/10/2024; Rockford Public Schools' Board of Education served on 12/20/2023, answer due 1/10/2024 (Bursch, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 12/19 10:22 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Rockford Public School District, Rockford Public Schools' Board of Education (pjw)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Tue 12/19 10:18 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Paul L. Maloney (pjw)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
2 2 service Proposed Summons (to be issued) Mon 12/18 1:18 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Bursch, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/18 1:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Rockford Public School District, Rockford Public Schools' Board of Education filed by Dan Mead, Jennifer Mead (Bursch, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Mon 12/18 1:13 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiffs Dan Mead, Jennifer Mead in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7246366 (Bursch, John)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Mon 12/18 1:25 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Katherine L. Anderson on behalf of plaintiffs Dan Mead, Jennifer Mead (Anderson, Katherine)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Mon 12/18 1:27 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Vincent M. Wagner on behalf of plaintiffs Dan Mead, Jennifer Mead (Wagner, Vincent)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Mon 12/18 1:34 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of David Andrew Cortman on behalf of plaintiffs Dan Mead, Jennifer Mead (Cortman, David)
Related: [-]