Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey J Helmick
Case #: 3:23-cv-02402
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2023
Terminated:Nov 04, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jun 15, 2024 6:24 AM EDT
Defendant
OhioHealth Corporation
3430 OhioHealth Pkwy. 3430 OhioHealth Pkwy.
Columbus, OH 43202
Represented By
Steven E Seasly
Hahn, Loeser & Parks - Cleveland
contact info
Mary E. Dennison
Hahn Loeser & Parks
contact info
Defendant
OhioHealth Foundation, Inc.
3430 OhioHealth Pkwy.
Columbus, OH 43202
Represented By
Steven E Seasly
Hahn, Loeser & Parks - Cleveland
contact info
Mary E. Dennison
Hahn Loeser & Parks
contact info
Defendant
Van Wert County Hospital
1250 South Washington Street
Van Wert, OH 45891
Represented By
Steven E Seasly
Hahn, Loeser & Parks - Cleveland
contact info
Mary E. Dennison
Hahn Loeser & Parks
contact info
Defendant
Van Wert Health Foundation, Inc.
1250 South Washington Street
Van Wert, OH 45891
Represented By
Steven E Seasly
Hahn, Loeser & Parks - Cleveland
contact info
Mary E. Dennison
Hahn Loeser & Parks
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Farmer
5480 Van Wert Mercer County Line Rd.
Rockford, OH 45882
Represented By
Sydney M. Braverman
Oliver Law - Columbus
contact info
Jami S. Oliver
Oliver Law
contact info
Rebecca C. Alexander
Oliver Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, November 04, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Stipulation & Order Mon 11/04 4:29 PM
Stipulation & Order of Case Dismissal with prejudice. re23 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 11/4/2024. (M,SM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Dismissal Thu 10/31 4:29 PM
Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) with Prejudice filed by All Defendants. (Seasly, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
order Order Mon 10/21 2:55 PM
Order [non-document] granting the parties' request for an extension of time until 10/31/2024 for them to file their stipulated dismissal entry. re22 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/21/2024. (M,SM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
22 22 notice Status Report (atty event) Thu 10/17 1:29 PM
Joint Status Report filed by All Defendants. (Seasly, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
minutes 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Terminate Referral Order Thu 09/19 4:54 PM
Order [non-document] The parties have indicated the case is settled. The Settlement Conference set for 9/23/2024 is vacated. The parties are instructed to file a dismissal entry within 30 days from today. The Court hereby reserves jurisdiction to interpret/enforce the terms of any Settlement Agreement. Referral Terminated. re18 . Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 9/19/2024. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
21 21 notice Notice (atty event) Thu 08/29 6:30 PM
Plaintiff, Farmer's, Notice of Service filed by Jennifer Farmer. (Braverman, Sydney)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
20 20 motion Excuse Appearance Thu 08/15 12:54 PM
Motion to excuse appearance in-person of Insurance Rep at Settlement Conference filed by OhioHealth Corporation, OhioHealth Foundation, Inc., Van Wert County Hospital, Van Wert Health Foundation, Inc.. (Seasly, Steven)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to excuse appearance Thu 08/15 2:51 PM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's20 Motion to excuse appearance in-person of Insurance Rep at Settlement Conference. Defendant's representative may appear and participate by video conference. Defense counsel is responsible for setting up a video conference and bringing a laptop, tablet, or other device to the settlement conference so that the representative can appear and participate. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 8/15/2024.(R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Tue 07/02 5:45 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Defendants The Van Wert County Hospital Association dab Van Wert Health and Van Wert Health Foundation, Inc. filed by Jennifer Farmer. (Braverman, Sydney)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
18 18 6 pgs order Order Wed 05/22 3:34 PM
Order. Settlement Conference set for 9/23/2024 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 403. Ex parte settlement statements shall be submitted by email to Clay_Chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov by 9/9/2024. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements prior to the mediation conference. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 5/22/2024. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Minute Order _ Case Management Conference Order of Referral to Judicial Officer for Mediation or Settlement Wed 05/22 9:37 AM
Order of Case Management Conference held on 5/21/2024. Time: 10 minutes. Case is assigned to the standard track. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 10/1/2024. Discovery due by 11/1/2024. Case is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay for an initial settlement conference or mediation to be held in person in August or September of 2024 at the convenience of the court and the parties. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 5/21/2024. (M,SM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Tue 05/14 9:29 AM
Notice [non-document]: Due to Plaintiff's counsel's failure to appear for the May 14, 2024 Case Management Conference, it is reset for May 21, 2024, at 02:00 PM. Counsel shall call the court's bridge line at 877-411-9748, access code 1231873. Related document(s)13 . (M,SM)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
16 16 notice Notice (atty event) Mon 05/13 6:51 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Jennifer Farmer. (Oliver, Jami)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Mon 05/13 6:44 PM
Notice of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Jennifer Farmer. (Oliver, Jami)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
14 14 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Fri 04/26 10:50 AM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Defendants. (Seasly, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
13 13 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Thu 04/11 12:12 PM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Notice : Case management conference to be held on 5/14/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick. Counsel to call the court's bridge line at 877-411-9748, and use access code 1231873.(M,SM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting
Monday, April 08, 2024
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/08 5:48 PM
Defendants' Answer to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses filed by OhioHealth Corporation, OhioHealth Foundation, Inc., Van Wert County Hospital, Van Wert Health Foundation, Inc.. (Seasly, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Thu 03/28 5:00 PM
Order [non-document] granting Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time until 4/8/2024 to Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. re11 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 3/28/2024.(M,SM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
11 11 motion Extension (answer complaint) Tue 03/26 1:10 PM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until April 8, 2024 to answer , plead or otherwise move filed by OhioHealth Corporation, OhioHealth Foundation, Inc., Van Wert County Hospital, Van Wert Health Foundation, Inc.. (Seasly, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
10 10 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Mon 03/04 2:51 PM
Attorney Appearance by Mary E. Dennison filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Dennison, Mary)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension (answer complaint) Mon 03/04 2:46 PM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until March 29, 2024 to answer filed by OhioHealth Corporation, OhioHealth Foundation, Inc., Van Wert County Hospital, Van Wert Health Foundation, Inc..(Seasly, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Mon 03/04 5:08 PM
Order [non-document] granting Defendants' unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time until 3/29/2024 to Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. re9 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 3/4/2024.(M,SM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
8 8 notice Notice (atty event) Thu 02/29 3:20 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Jennifer Farmer. (Alexander, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/01 3:01 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Jennifer Farmer. Van Wert Health Foundation, Inc. waiver sent on 1/8/2024, answer due 3/8/2024 filed on behalf of Jennifer Farmer (Alexander, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/01 3:00 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Jennifer Farmer. Van Wert County Hospital waiver sent on 1/8/2024, answer due 3/8/2024 filed on behalf of Jennifer Farmer (Alexander, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/01 10:10 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Jennifer Farmer. OhioHealth Foundation, Inc. waiver sent on 1/8/2024, answer due 3/8/2024 filed on behalf of Jennifer Farmer (Alexander, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/01 10:09 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Jennifer Farmer. OhioHealth Corporation waiver sent on 1/8/24, answer due 3/8/2024 filed on behalf of Jennifer Farmer (Alexander, Rebecca) Modified on 2/1/2024 (K,AR)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/01 10:07 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Jennifer Farmer. OhioHealth Corporation dba OhioHealth Van Wert Hospital waiver sent on 1/8/2024, answer due 3/8/2024 filed on behalf of Jennifer Farmer (Alexander, Rebecca) Modified on 2/1/2024 (K,AR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
oth_evt Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status Tue 12/19 11:16 AM
Notice to Attorney Rebecca Alexander. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Mon 12/18 3:01 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon OhioHealth Corporation, OhioHealth Foundation, Inc., Van Wert County Hospital, Van Wert Health Foundation, Inc.. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/18 1:19 PM
Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12321047. Filed by JENNIFER FARMER. (Oliver, Jami)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet C,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - OCRC LOD and RTS,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - EEOC RTS,
Att: 4 Summons ,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons,
Att: 8 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 12/18 2:48 PM
Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Mon 12/18 2:49 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice re Prompt Service Mon 12/18 3:02 PM
Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant. Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (K,AR)
Related: [-]