Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:David S Cercone
Case #: 2:23-cv-02124
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2023
Terminated:Dec 23, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jun 15, 2024 6:41 AM EDT
Defendant
CASTLE CO-PACKERS, LLC
Represented By
Vincent M. Roskovensky
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Andrew J. Ruxton
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN FOSTER
Represented By
Michael J. Bruzzese
Michael J. Bruzzese, Attorney At Law
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Evaluator
SALLY GRIFFITH CIMINI
Terminated: 06/13/2024
Represented By
Sally G. Cimini
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, December 23, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Mon 12/23 12:10 PM
ORDER granting25 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by JOHN FOSTER. Clerk is to mark CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 12/23/2024. (lyk)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
25 25 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty) Fri 12/20 11:13 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by JOHN FOSTER. (Bruzzese, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
24 24 order Case Management Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 08/19 4:03 PM
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER granting23 Joint MOTION to Extend Case Deadlines filed by CASTLE CO-PACKERS, LLC. Amended Pleadings, Joinder of Parties due by November 27, 2024; Discovery due by December 20, 2024; Plaintiff's Pretrial Statement due by January 28, 2025; Defendant's Pretrial Statement due by February 24, 2025; Pretrial Stipulation due by March 12, 2025; Dispositive Motions due by April 13, 2025. All other terms and conditions of the Case Management Order dated March 5, 2024, shall remain in full force and effect. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 8/19/2024. (lyk)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
23 23 motion Extend Time Fri 08/16 4:41 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time by CASTLE CO-PACKERS, LLC. (Roskovensky, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/19 10:25 AM
Amended ANSWER to1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by CASTLE CO-PACKERS, LLC. (Roskovensky, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
21 21 adr Report of Early Neutral Evaluation Thu 06/13 9:35 PM
REPORT of Early Neutral Evaluation Case has not resolved. SALLY GRIFFITH CIMINI terminated. Attorney Sally G. Cimini terminated. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and submit within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed [LINK:here] or at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. ENE session was held held on 6/13/2024. (Cimini, Sally)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
20 20 3 pgs order Order Referring Case to Early Neutral Evaluation Thu 05/02 3:50 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation. Sally Griffith Cimini, Esquire is appointed as an evaluator. ENE conference shall be conducted by 6/28/2024. The report of Evaluator shall be electronically filed within 7 days of the ENE conference. Michael J. Bruzzese, Esquire is designated as lead counsel. SALLY GRIFFITH CIMINI is added. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 5/2/2024. (kak)
Related: [-]
19 19 3 pgs order Order Thu 05/02 3:47 PM
ORDER implementing Rule 502(d) at the Joint Consent of Both Parties. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 5/2/2024. (kak)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Case Management Order Thu 05/02 3:27 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Post Discovery Status Conference to be scheduled upon motion of the parties. The parties shall move to amend pleadings or add new parties by 8/29/2024. Discovery ends 9/30/2024. Plaintiffs Pretrial Statement due by 10/30/2024. Defendants Pretrial Statement due by 12/2/2024. Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/12/2024. Motions for Summary Judgment due by 1/13/2025. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Cercone on 5/2/2024. (kak)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
17 17 minutes Initial Case Management Conference Mon 04/29 3:53 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David S. Cercone: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/29/2024. The Clerks met with counsel to explore appropriate measures for pretrial development and to assure the parties have completed all prerequisites for completion of the ADR process. The parties have selected early neutral evaluation to be conducted by the Sally Griffith Cimini, Esq. Costs to be split 50/50. The ADR session must be completed on or before June 28, 2024. Attorney Bruzzese designated liaison counsel for ADR purposes. The parties will request a post-discovery conference with the court if it appears at that time that such a conference will assist the parties in expeditiously resolving the case or completing final preparations for trial. A jury-trial CMO with fact discovery through September 30, 2024, a Rule 502(d) order, and an ADR referral order will follow. (Court Reporter: none) (kmk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/22 10:55 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by CASTLE CO-PACKERS, LLC. (Roskovensky, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
15 15 adr Notice of Early Neutral Evaluation Tue 04/02 8:38 AM
Notice of Early Neutral Evaluation by Sally Griffith Cimini. Early Neutral Evaluation Date June 13, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. (Cimini, Sally)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
14 14 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Mon 04/01 11:49 AM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by JOHN FOSTER. (Bruzzese, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
13 13 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 03/29 10:01 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Roskovensky, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
12 12 adr Notice of ADR Designation Wed 03/06 1:30 PM
NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
11 11 order Initial Local Rule 16.1 Scheduling Order Tue 03/05 10:24 AM
INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for April 29, 2024 at 1:00 PM by Video Conference before Judge David S. Cercone. A member of chambers staff will send a Zoom.gov invite (by email) to counsel of record prior to the hearing. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before March 18, 2024; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by April 1, 2024. Details more fully stated in Order. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 3/5/2024. (lyk)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
10 10 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Mon 03/04 10:20 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate by CASTLE CO-PACKERS, LLC. (Roskovensky, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/29 10:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Ruxton on behalf of CASTLE CO-PACKERS, LLC. (Ruxton, Andrew)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/29 9:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent M. Roskovensky on behalf of CASTLE CO-PACKERS, LLC. (Roskovensky, Vincent)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement pursuant to LR 7.1.A Thu 02/29 12:04 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re8 Notice of Appearance,9 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public as required pursuant to LR 7.1.A. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 3/7/2024. (kss)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order Tue 02/27 10:57 AM
ORDER granting6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer filed by CASTLE CO-PACKERS, LLC. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 2/27/2024. (lyk)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Attorney Signature Deficient Tue 02/27 8:35 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer. ERROR: Attorney signature missing required information (Pennsylvania or other state bar identification number). CORRECTION: Attorney directed to comply with requirements of LCvR 5.2(B) in all future filings. This message is for informational purposes only. (kss)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
6 6 misc Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 02/26 3:20 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by CASTLE CO-PACKERS, LLC Answer due from CASTLE CO-PACKERS, LLC on 4/22/2024. (Roskovensky, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
5 5 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Thu 02/15 9:09 AM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JOHN FOSTER. CASTLE CO-PACKERS, LLC served on 2/15/2024, answer due 3/7/2024. (Bruzzese, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 02/09 10:47 AM
Summons Issued as to CASTLE CO-PACKERS, LLC (kss)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Praecipe to Issue Summons Fri 02/09 9:36 AM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by JOHN FOSTER (Bruzzese, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
2 2 service Waiver of Service Unexecuted Fri 02/09 9:27 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Castle Co-Packers, filed by JOHN FOSTER. (Bruzzese, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, December 18, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Mon 12/18 2:09 PM
COMPLAINT against CASTLE CO-PACKERS, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8031640), filed by JOHN FOSTER. (kss)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet