Member Case
Lead case is: 1:23-bk-12113

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Janet E Bostwick
Case #: 1:23-bk-12114
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
BB Commercial Holdings, LLC
27 Park St
Beverly, MA 01915-4216
Represented By
John F. Sommerstein
Law Offices Of John F. Sommerstein
contact info
Last checked: never
Assistant U.S. Trustee
Richard King - B
Office of the US Trustee J.W. McCormack Post Office & Courthouse 5 Post Office Sq., 10th Fl, Suite 1000
Boston, MA 02109


Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago
Thursday, February 15, 2024
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 02/16 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 02/15/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Order
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 02/15 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 02/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Order
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 02/15 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 02/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Supplemental Order Re: Trial/Evid Hearing by Video
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 02/13 3:22 PM
Proceeding Memorandum and Order dated 02/13/2024 Re:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition SubchapterV Non-Individual. See Order for full text. (nc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Mon 02/12 12:02 PM
Order dated 02/12/2024 Re:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition SubchapterV Non-Individual. See order for full text. (nc)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Supplemental Order Re: Trial/Evid Hearing by Video Mon 02/12 11:18 AM
Supplemental Order dated 02/12/2024 Regarding Procedures for Appearances by Video at Hearings Re:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition SubchapterV Non-Individual. See Order for full text. (nc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
trustee Meeting of Creditors Held Fri 01/19 3:34 PM
Meeting of Creditors Held and Examination of Debtor on Friday, January 19, 2024 and concluded. (Bradford, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
20 20 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Tue 01/16 6:29 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders filed by Debtor BB Commercial Holdings, LLC (Sommerstein, John)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Tue 01/16 6:17 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney John F. Sommerstein in the amount of $0.00. Plus $0.00 paid to debtor`s counsel for court filing fees filed by Debtor BB Commercial Holdings, LLC (Sommerstein, John)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Schedules (Original) Tue 01/16 6:16 PM
Schedules A-H and all Statements. filed by Debtor BB Commercial Holdings, LLC (Sommerstein, John)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 06, 2024
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 01/07 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 01/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Motion to Extend
Thursday, January 04, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Thu 01/04 12:54 PM
Order dated 1/4/2024 Re:15 Motion filed by Debtor BB Commercial Holdings, LLC to Extend Time to File Documents [Re:4 Order to Update]. GRANTED. See Order for Full Text. (nc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
15 15 motion Extend Time Tue 01/02 1:39 PM
Motion filed by Debtor BB Commercial Holdings, LLC to Extend Time to File Documents [Re:4 Order to Update] with certificate of service. (Sommerstein, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Application to Employ Fri 12/29 7:37 AM
Endorsed Order dated 12/28/2023 Re:7 Application filed by Debtor BB Commercial Holdings, LLC to Employ John F. Sommerstein as Counsel. THIS APPLICATION IS MOOT SINCE THE DEBTORS HAVE FILED AN AMENDED APPLICATION IN THE LEAD CASE 23-12113 (jreg)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 24, 2023
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 12/25 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/24/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order
Friday, December 22, 2023
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sat 12/23 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+] Notice Date 12/22/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Court's Notice of 341 sent - 11 Corporation
11 11 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 12/22 12:08 PM
Order dated 12/22/2023 Re:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition SubchapterV Non-Individual. See Order for complete text. (nc)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Scheduled/Continued/Rescheduled (No Forms Attached) Fri 12/22 12:09 PM
Status Conference to be held on 2/13/2024 at 10:30 AM at Boston Courtroom 3, 12th Floor, 5 Post Office Square, Boston, MA 02109 Re:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition SubchapterV Non-Individual. (nc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
10 10 crt_gen Court's Notice of 341 Sent 11 Corporation Wed 12/20 3:45 PM
Court's Notice of 341 sent. (sl)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Court's Order of Deficiency Wed 12/20 8:48 AM
Court's Order of Deficiency: Re:7 Application filed by Debtor BB Commercial Holdings, LLC to Employ John F. Sommerstein as Counsel. Application appears to be missing a page between pages 4 and 5. The deadline to cure the deficiency is 12/27/2023. (jreg)
Related: [-]
court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12 Wed 12/20 3:45 PM
Meeting of Creditors scheduled on 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/19/2024 at 02:30 PM as Telephonic Meeting. Proofs of Claims due by 2/26/2024. (sl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
8 8 court Entry Tue 12/19 4:31 PM
Order Granting Debtors' Motion for Joint Administration entered on 12/19/23 in Lead Case No. 23-12113 All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in, and all further docket entries shall be made in Backbeat Brewing Company, LLC, Case No. 23-12113 and that case alone, except for: (i) the schedules, statement of financial affairs, list of equity security holders, and matrix for each debtor, (ii) any amendments to the foregoing documents, which shall be filed 2 in the respective debtors case, and (iii) proofs of claim which shall be filed by creditors in the chapter 11 case of the particular debtor that is indebted to such creditor. (nc)
Related: [-]
7 7 9 pgs motion Employ Tue 12/19 1:48 PM
Application filed by Debtor BB Commercial Holdings, LLC to Employ John F. Sommerstein as Counsel filed with Affidavit along with certificate of service. (Sommerstein, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
6 6 misc Equity Security Holders Tue 12/19 11:44 AM
Equity Security Holders Related [+] filed by Debtor BB Commercial Holdings, LLC (Sommerstein, John)
Related: [-] 4 Order to Update
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 12/19 10:55 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice for William K. Harrington, United States Trustee, Region 1 by Eric K. Bradford with certificate of service filed by Assistant U.S. Trustee Richard King - B (Bradford, Eric)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Order to Update Tue 12/19 10:30 AM
Order to Update Related [+]. Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Balance Sheet Date: 12/26/2023 Cash Flow Statement Due 12/26/2023. Statement of Operations Due 12/26/2023 Small Business Tax Return Date: 12/26/2023. Atty Disclosure Statement due 1/2/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 1/2/2024. Schedules A-H due 1/2/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 1/2/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 1/2/2024. (jreg)
Related: [-] 1
3 3 misc Certificate of Vote Tue 12/19 9:19 AM
Certificate of Vote filed by Debtor BB Commercial Holdings, LLC (Sommerstein, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
2 2 misc Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Mon 12/18 6:13 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing filed by Debtor BB Commercial Holdings, LLC (Sommerstein, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 12/18 6:12 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition SubchapterV Non-Individual. with deficiencies. Filing Fee in the Amount of $1738 Filed by BB Commercial Holdings, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V due by 03/18/2024. (Sommerstein, John)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Mon 12/18 6:16 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-12114 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Receipt Number A20285672, amount $1738.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1