Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Michael L Brown
Case #: 1:23-cv-05805
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:216(b) Labor - Minimum wage or overtime compensation
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2023
Terminated:Dec 05, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 12, 2024 7:02 AM EDT
Defendant
Nanolumens, Inc.
Represented By
Grace M Goodheart
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
Ashley Zeiler Hager
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders Llp - Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
Warren Martin
Represented By
Kurt G. Kastorf
Kastorf Law, LLC
contact info
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 31, 2025
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Mon 03/31 9:05 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING36 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (pdt)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
36 36 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 03/28 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Nanolumens, Inc. (Fisher, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
35 35 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment Wed 02/19 2:20 PM
ORDER granting33 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. The parties' Settlement Agreement is incorporated herein and APPROVED. The parties are ORDERED to file a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice within five days of receipt of settlement funds. Furthermore, this Court elects to retain jurisdiction over this matter until the terms of the Settlement Agreement have been complied with. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on this 19th day of February, 2025. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
34 34 respm Response in Support of Motion Wed 02/05 10:11 PM
RESPONSE in Support re33 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by Warren Martin. (Johnston, Rod)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Wed 01/29 4:17 PM
ORDER (by docket entry only): The Court DIRECTS the parties to file supplemental evidence demonstrating the reasonableness of attorneys' fees within one week of the entry of this Order. The Court does not accept representations that the attorneys' fees were negotiated separately from the amount owed to Plaintiff. See Flood v. First Fam. Ins., Inc. , 514 F. Supp. 3d 1384, 1390 (M.D. Fla. 2021) ("[T]he Court cannot say whether the attorney's fees to which the parties agreed are reasonable under the circumstances. Fulfillment of its role in approving FLSA settlements requires the Court to do more than merely accept at face value the parties' representation that attorney's fees were negotiated 'separately.'") Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/29/2025. (jpk)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Fri 01/17 2:39 PM
Submission of33 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jpk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
33 33 motion Approve Consent Judgment Thu 01/16 6:43 PM
MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Nanolumens, Inc..(Fisher, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Settlement Agreement,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, January 02, 2025
order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Thu 01/02 3:35 PM
ORDER (by docket entry only): The parties failed to comply with the Court's Order (Dkt. 32) by the required deadline. The Court ORDERS the parties, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, to file either (1) a motion that complies with the Court's Notice regarding FLSA Cases (Dkt. 31), or (2) a motion to reopen the case. Failure to comply may result in sanctions, including dismissal without prejudice. ( See LR 41.3(A)(2), NDGa.) Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/2/2025. (jpk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
32 32 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 12/05 2:17 PM
ORDER. Before the Court is the parties' Notice of Settlement30 . The parties request a stay of this action to finalize the settlement agreement. The Court GRANTS the parties' request and DIRECTS the Clerk to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. The Court ORDERS the parties to file a motion that complies with the Court's Notice regarding FLSA Cases31 within twenty days from the date of this Order. If settlement negotiations fail, the parties shall promptly move to reopen the case. The Court DENIES AS MOOT the parties'29 Motion for Additional Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on this 5th day of December, 2024. (pdt)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 12/05 2:20 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
31 31 2 pgs order Order Wed 12/04 5:00 PM
NOTICE regarding FLSA Cases. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (jpk)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 12/04 12:06 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Nanolumens, Inc.(Fisher, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
29 29 motion Extension of Time Tue 12/03 8:38 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by Nanolumens, Inc..(Fisher, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 11/27 10:30 AM
ORDER granting27 Final MOTION for Extension of Time. The parties will file motions for summary decision, a joint prehearing submission, or a notice of settlement by December 3, 2024. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on this 27th day of November, 2024. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
27 27 motion Extension of Time Tue 11/26 2:37 PM
Final MOTION for Extension of Time by Nanolumens, Inc..(Fisher, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, November 14, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 11/14 8:33 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. The parties have jointly moved to extend the deadline to file dispositive motions or a joint prehearing submission until November 26, 2024. (Doc.25 ). Having found good cause shown, the Court hereby GRANTS this extension. The parties will file motions for summary decision or a joint prehearing submission by November 26, 2024. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/14/2024. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
25 25 motion Extension of Time Tue 11/12 11:00 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time by Nanolumens, Inc..(Fisher, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 10/15 9:42 AM
Set Deadlines: Motions for Summary Judgment are due by 11/11/2024. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 10/11 12:13 PM
ORDER granting23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time. The parties have jointly moved to extend the deadline to file dispositive motions or a joint prehearing submission until November 11, 2024. The parties will file motions for summary decision or a joint prehearing submission by November 11, 2024. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on this 11th day of October, 2024. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
23 23 motion Extension of Time Thu 10/10 3:56 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by Nanolumens, Inc..(Fisher, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 08/13 9:51 AM
ORDER granting21 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Discovery. Discovery shall be completed by September 10, 2024. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on this 13th day of August, 2024. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
21 21 motion Extension of Time Mon 08/12 4:24 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Discovery by Nanolumens, Inc..(Fisher, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
order Order Wed 07/10 10:57 AM
ORDER (by docket entry only): In the light of the parties' Status Report (Dkt. 20), the Court LIFTS the stay of discovery and all pending deadlines in this matter. Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 7/10/2024. (jpk)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
20 20 misc Status Report Mon 07/01 7:22 PM
STATUS REPORT by Nanolumens, Inc.. (Fisher, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Substitute Attorney Mon 07/01 6:57 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney Jeremy Kyle Fisherby Nanolumens, Inc.. (Fisher, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 05/29 12:36 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Stay. It is hereby ORDERED that discovery and all pending deadlines are stayed until June 30, 2024. The parties shall report the status of this matter, and of their negotiations, to the Court no later than June 30, 2024 and, absent further Order of the Court, the stay expires on June 30, 2024. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on this 29th day of May, 2024. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
17 17 motion Stay Tue 05/28 11:04 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay Extend Stay by Nanolumens, Inc..(Goodheart, Grace)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, April 29, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 04/29 9:52 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Stay. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that discovery and all pending deadlines are stayed until May 31, 2024. The parties shall report the status of this matter, and of their negotiations, to the Court no later than May 31, 2024 and, absent further Order of the Court, the stay expires on May 31, 2024. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on this 29th day of April, 2024. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
15 15 misc Proposed Order Fri 04/26 3:47 PM
PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Stay re:14 Joint MOTION to Stay . (Goodheart, Grace)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Stay Fri 04/26 1:31 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay by Nanolumens, Inc.. (Goodheart, Grace)
Related: [-]
order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Fri 04/26 2:30 PM
ORDER (by docket entry only): This Court's Standing Order provides that, for all consent, unopposed, or joint motions, the filing party shall include a proposed order granting the motion. (Dkt. 10 at 10.) Accordingly, the Court ORDERS the parties to file, no later than April 29, 2024, a proposed order granting their Motion to Stay (Dkt. 14). Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 4/26/2024. (jpk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
13 13 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/15 4:26 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:12 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 6/10/2024. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 4/15/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
12 12 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Fri 04/12 2:00 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Nanolumens, Inc.. (Hager, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Mon 04/01 4:29 PM
ORDER: The Court ORDERS the parties to file, on or before 4/15/2024, their joint preliminary report and discovery plan. The Court may sanction the parties, including dismissing this matter or entering default, for failure to comply with this order. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to submit this matter if the parties fail to comply with this order. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 4/1/2024. (kng)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
10 10 14 pgs order Order Tue 01/16 2:16 PM
STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Tue 01/16 10:38 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Mark H. Cohen recused. Case reassigned to Judge Michael L. Brown for all further proceedings NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:23-cv-05805-MLB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 1/16/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/12 5:57 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Nanolumens, Inc.. Discovery ends on 6/10/2024.(Goodheart, Grace)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/12 5:55 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nanolumens, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nanolumens Holdings, LLC for Nanolumens, Inc.. (Goodheart, Grace)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/02 1:54 PM
MINUTE ORDER Granting6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rod M. Johnston by CRD at the direction of the Clerk. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 01/02/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lme)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
utility Docket Correction Fri 12/29 8:48 AM
Notification of Docket Correction re5 Return of Service Executed. Serve date filed incorrectly. Clerk made necessary changes to reset deadlines. (dob)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Fri 12/29 9:44 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:6 APPLICATION for Admission of Rod M. Johnston Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13124834).. Attorney Rod M. Johnston added appearing on behalf of Warren Martin. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
6 6 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/28 3:59 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Rod M. Johnston Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13124834).by Warren Martin. (Kastorf, Kurt)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Return of Service Executed Thu 12/28 3:51 PM
Return of Service Executed by Warren Martin. Nanolumens, Inc. served on 12/19/2023, answer due 1/9/2024. (Kastorf, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
4 4 misc Letter re:83.1 Tue 12/19 4:16 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Rod M. Johnston. Clerk to follow-up by 12/29/2023. (rvb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Mon 12/18 3:38 PM
STANDING ORDER re: Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 12/18/2023. (lme)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 12/18 12:16 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Nanolumens, Inc. (jbu)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/18 12:15 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Warren Martin. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13102456)(jbu)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet