Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey J Helmick
Case #: 3:23-cv-02408
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2023
Terminated:Apr 23, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jun 15, 2024 6:25 AM EDT
Defendant
City of Toledo
Plaintiff
Joshua Bell
Represented By
Sean L. Walton
Walton + Brown
contact info
Plaintiff
Marquitta Bey
Represented By
Sean L. Walton
Walton + Brown
contact info
Plaintiff
Jay Elmore
Represented By
Sean L. Walton
Walton + Brown
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Furr
Represented By
Sean L. Walton
Walton + Brown
contact info
Plaintiff
Anita Madison
Represented By
Sean L. Walton
Walton + Brown
contact info

GPO Mar 20 2024
Order: By April 18, 2024, Plaintiffs shall either show service has been perfected or show cause for the failure to do so. If Plaintiffs fail to do so, this action will be dismissed without prejudice under Rule 4(m). re 1. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 3/20/2024. (M,SM)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 04/23 10:57 AM
Order of Case Dismissal under Rule 4(m). re3 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 4/23/2024. (M,SM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Wed 03/20 1:20 PM
Order : By April 18, 2024, Plaintiffs shall either show service has been perfected or show cause for the failure to do so. If Plaintiffs fail to do so, this action will be dismissed without prejudice under Rule 4(m). re1 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 3/20/2024. (M,SM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
2 2 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Tue 12/19 9:43 AM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. No Summons issued, none were provided. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judge Tue 12/19 9:39 AM
Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Tue 12/19 9:41 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (K,AR)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice re Prompt Service Tue 12/19 9:44 AM
Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant. Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (K,AR)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/18 11:40 PM
Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12322117.. Filed by Anita Madison, Jay Elmore, Marquitta Bey, Joshua Bell, Robert Furr. (Walton, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Right to Sue Letter