Alabama Middle District Court
Judge:Myron H Thompson
Referred: Charles S Coody
Case #: 2:23-cv-00724
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, March 07, 2025
38 38 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 03/07 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Andrew Houston Watson. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
37 37 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 02/26 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Andrew Houston Watson. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
36 36 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/03 10:17 AM
NOTICE to the Court filed by Andrew Houston Watson. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
35 35 respoth Response in Opposition Fri 01/24 9:22 AM
RESPONSE re18 Special Report to Amended Inmate 1983 Complaint, filed by Andrew Houston Watson. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, January 06, 2025
34 34 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/07 9:11 AM
NOTICE (Letter) to the Court filed by Andrew Houston Watson. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
33 33 misc Mail Returned Fri 01/03 1:28 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re27 Order, mail sent to Andrew Houston Watson. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
32 32 1 pgs order Order Tue 12/31 1:28 PM
ORDER: the Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a copy of the 27 Order entered December 6, 2024. It is ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiff to file a response to Defendants' Answer and Special Report in accordance with the directives in the 22 Order of November 22, 2024, is EXTENDED to January 21, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/31/2024. (mailed to plaintiff w/ copy of 27 Order)(AM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
31 31 notice Notice (Other) Tue 12/17 10:06 AM
NOTICE by NaphCare, Inc., Billie Vaughan re27 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer, Second Notice of Compliance with Court Order (Adams, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Stamped Envelope to Andrew Watson
Monday, December 09, 2024
30 30 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 12/09 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Andrew Houston Watson. (LAB)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/09 2:11 PM
NOTICE re Address filed by Andrew Houston Watson. (LAB)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/09 9:39 AM
NOTICE of Compliance re27 Order by NaphCare, Inc., Billie Vaughan (Adams, Allison) Modified text on 12/9/2024 (LAB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Letter to Plaintiff and copy of envelope
Friday, December 06, 2024
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer Fri 12/06 2:44 PM
ORDER granting considered 25 Motion for Service of Documents. Defendants must send Plaintiff a copy Defendants' Answer and Special Report (Doc. 18 ) by December 16, 2024. Special Report & Answer deadline extended for NaphCare, Inc. and Billie Vaughan to 1/7/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/6/2024. (c/s) (LAB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
26 26 misc Filing Fee Received Tue 12/03 2:23 PM
Partial Filing fee: $24.60, receipt number 6603. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
25 25 respoth Response to Order Mon 12/02 3:37 PM
Response to Order re18 Special Report and22 Order filed by Andrew Houston Watson. (LAB) (UNDER SEAL Additional attachment(s) added on 12/2/2024: #1 Medical Records) (LAB)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
24 24 misc Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement Mon 11/25 8:41 AM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Billie Vaughan. (Adams, Allison)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement Mon 11/25 8:38 AM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by NaphCare, Inc.. (Adams, Allison)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
22 22 3 pgs order Order Fri 11/22 1:17 PM
ORDERED that by December 13, 2024, Plaintiff must file a response that addresses each argument and defense raised by Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/22/2024. (See Order for Further Details; c/s) (LAB)
Related: [-]
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Fri 11/22 1:14 PM
ORDER denying 17 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/22/2024. (c/s) (LAB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement Thu 11/21 1:52 PM
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to NaphCare, Inc. and Billie Vaughan. Corporate Disclosures due by 12/2/2024. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order and Sample Format
19 19 utility AO FORM 85 Thu 11/21 1:46 PM
AO FORM 85 sent to counsel for NaphCare, Inc. and Billie Vaughan. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: If the parties wish to consent to the jurisdiction of a US Magistrate Judge, counsel is required to print, sign and mail this form to all parties/counsel in this case. This form should not be returned to the Clerk's Office unless all parties have consented. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
18 18 answer Special Report to Amended Inmate 1983 Complaint Wed 11/20 12:06 PM
Special Report of NaphCare and NP Billie Vaughan Special Report to Amended Inmate 1983 Complaint with Jury Demand by NaphCare, Inc., Billie Vaughan. (Adams, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - NP Billie Vaughan's executed Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Relevant Medical Records of Andrew Watson - Watson 0001-0137,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Dr McLane's executed Affidavit,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - NP Lamarquis Singer's executed Affidavit
Thursday, November 07, 2024
17 17 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 11/08 9:38 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Andrew Houston Watson. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Thu 10/24 4:56 PM
NOTICE re service addresses for dfts by Andrew Houston Watson (BES) (Main Document 16 replaced on 10/24/2024 to correct orientation of first page within PDF) (BES). Modified on 10/24/2024 (BES)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Deadline Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer Fri 10/11 10:05 AM
ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension Time. Special Report & Answer due from NaphCare, Inc. and Billie Vaughan on 11/25/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/11/2024. (c/s) (LAB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Deadline Extension of Time to File Document Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer Thu 10/10 3:05 PM
MOTION for Extension of Deadline October 25, 2024 , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Special Report , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer by NAPH Care, Billie Vaughan. (Adams, Allison)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/27 4:02 PM
NOTICE to Inmate. (c/s) (LAB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Documents from Inmate
Friday, September 13, 2024
12 12 6 pgs order Order to File Special Report Fri 09/13 2:40 PM
ORDERED as follows: Defendants must review the allegations in the Amended Complaint to (a) ascertain the relevant facts and circumstances; (b) consider whether any action should be taken by jail or law enforcement officials to resolve the allegations of the Amended Complaint; and (c) determine if other similar complaints, whether pending in this Court or elsewhere, should be considered together. Defendants must file a Special Report with the Court and serve a copy on Plaintiff by October 25, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/13/2024. (c/s as directed)(LAB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 GC Receipt
Thursday, June 06, 2024
11 11 cmp Inmate 1983 Complaint, Amended Thu 06/06 3:39 PM
Amended Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against NAPH Care and Billie Vaughan, filed by Andrew Houston Watson. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Envelope
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
10 10 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 05/22 3:23 PM
ORDER: it is ORDERED that, on or before June 5, 2024, Plaintiff must file an amended complaint, as further set out in the Order. Plaintiff is advised that the amended complaint will supersede the original Complaint, and this case will proceed only on the claim(s) presented and against the defendant(s) named therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Coody on 05/22/24. (copy of 1983 Complaint form mailed as directed).(GGN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Deadline Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 01/24 3:04 PM
ORDER: it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's motions (Docs. 6 , 7 ) are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Coody on 01/24/2024. (GGN)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Filing Fee Received Wed 01/24 1:31 PM
Partial Filing fee Received: $18.31, receipt number 4103. (GGN)
Related: [-]
7 7 respoth Response to Order Wed 01/24 12:41 PM
Response to5 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, filed by Andrew Houston Watson. (DMN)
Related: [-]
motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 01/24 3:01 PM
MOTION for extension of time to submit his inmate account statement by Andrew Houston Watson. (NO PDF - see Doc.7 ) (GGN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Deadline Tue 01/16 2:53 PM
MOTION for Extension of Deadline re5 Order Directing Prisoner Payment by 01/24/2024 BY Andrew Houston Watson. (GGN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
5 5 4 pgs order Order Directing Prisoner Payment Wed 01/10 3:45 PM
ORDER: directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $18.31 be paid on or before 01/24/2024 ; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Coody on 01/10/2024. (Furnished: Cashier and a/c at Muscogee County Jail )(GGN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
4 4 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Wed 01/03 8:24 AM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Andrew Houston Watson. (GGN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order Thu 12/21 10:11 AM
ORDER: it is ORDERED that, on or before January 4, 2024, Plaintiff must file a prison account statement from the inmate account clerk, as further set out in order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to provide a copy of this Order to the inmate account clerk at the facility where Plaintiff is detained. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/21/2023. (copy mailed to MUSCOGEE COUNTY JAIL acct clerk as directed) (cwl, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
2 2 motion Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit Mon 12/18 11:20 AM
Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Andrew Houston Watson. (tps)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Inmate 1983 Complaint Mon 12/18 11:18 AM
Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Jerry McLane, Montgomery County Jail, NAPH Care, Lamarquis Singer, U.S. Marshals Service, Billie Vaughan, filed by Andrew Houston Watson.(tps)
Related: [-]