Washington Western District Court
Judge:James L Robart
Case #: 2:23-cv-01945
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2023
Terminated:Nov 08, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jun 15, 2024 3:45 AM PDT
Defendant
Accessify LLC
Represented By
James F McDonough, III
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
Philip P Mann
Mann Law Group PLLC
contact info
C Matthew Rozier
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough Pllc (dc)
contact info
Defendant
Ascend IP LLC
Represented By
James F McDonough, III
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
Philip P Mann
Mann Law Group PLLC
contact info
C Matthew Rozier
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough Pllc (dc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Canva US Inc
Represented By
Alexander Samuel Krois
Turner Boyd Seraphine LLP
contact info
Marc David Peters
Turner Boyd Seraphine LLP
contact info
Michael J Ewart
Hillis Clark Martin & Peterson
contact info
Jacob Zweig
Turner Boyd Seraphine LLP
contact info
Jennifer Seraphine
Turner Boyd Seraphine LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, November 08, 2024
45 45 utility Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright Fri 11/08 1:21 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office. (MJV)
Related: [-]
44 44 4 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 11/08 1:14 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: All claims asserted by Plaintiff Canva US, Inc. against Defendants Accessify, LLC and Ascend IP, LLC are dismissed with prejudice and without fees or costs to any party. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (MJV)
Related: [-]
43 43 misc Stipulation Fri 11/08 11:43 AM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice by parties (Ewart, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
42 42 order 2 - Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 04/09 10:58 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The court STAYS this matter. The court ORDERS the parties to file a joint statement within five business days of the Western District of Texas's disposition of Canva Australia's motion to dismiss. The court DIRECTS the Clerk to terminate the pending motion at Docket No.20 . Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (SS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
41 41 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Mon 04/08 4:05 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by All Defendants re:39 Order to Show Cause, (Mann, Philip)
Related: [-]
40 40 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Mon 04/08 3:44 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Canva US Inc re:39 Order to Show Cause, (Ewart, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
39 39 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 04/03 9:14 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The court therefore ORDERS the parties to show cause why this matter should not be stayed pending the Western District of Texas's disposition of Canva Pty Ltd's motion to dismiss. Canva US and Defendants shall each file a response by no later than 4/8/2024. Failure to respond to this order will be construed as a consent to a stay. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
38 38 respm Response to Motion Fri 03/29 2:53 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendants Accessify LLC, Ascend IP LLC, to20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Oral Argument Requested.(Mann, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of C. Matthew Rozier
Friday, March 22, 2024
37 37 misc Brief Fri 03/22 5:05 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim In Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Canva US Inc (Ewart, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
36 36 misc Joint Status Report Fri 03/15 3:08 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 1-2 weeks. Filed by Plaintiff Canva US Inc.(Ewart, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
35 35 order 2 - Minute Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Noting Date ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/14 11:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER re Defendants'20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Court ORDERS Canva US to file a supplemental brief responding to Defendants' arguments about Canva US's status as a party to the Texas litigation. Canva US shall file its brief no later than 3/22/2024. Defendants are permitted to file an optional supplemental brief in response by no later than 3/29/2024. The Court further DIRECTS the Clerk to re-note Defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. #20 ) for 3/29/2024. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (SS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
34 34 respm Surreply Wed 03/13 12:14 PM
SURREPLY filed by Plaintiff Canva US Inc re20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (to strike material from Defendants' Reply) (Ewart, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
33 33 notice Notice-Other Tue 03/12 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Intent to File Surreply ; filed by Plaintiff Canva US Inc. (Ewart, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
32 32 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 03/08 3:42 PM
REPLY, filed by All Defendants, TO RESPONSE to20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Mann, Philip)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
31 31 respm Declaration Thu 03/07 8:46 AM
Supplemental DECLARATION of Sandra Parker filed by Plaintiff Canva US Inc re20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim(Ewart, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, March 04, 2024
30 30 respm Declaration Mon 03/04 5:37 PM
DECLARATION of Ian Lee filed by Plaintiff Canva US Inc re20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Ewart, Michael)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Declaration Mon 03/04 5:32 PM
DECLARATION of Sandra Parker filed by Plaintiff Canva US Inc re20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Ewart, Michael)
Related: [-]
28 28 respm Declaration Mon 03/04 5:30 PM
DECLARATION of Alexander S. Krois filed by Plaintiff Canva US Inc re20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim(Ewart, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
27 27 respm Response to Motion Mon 03/04 5:22 PM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Canva US Inc, to20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Oral Argument Requested.(Ewart, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
26 26 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/14 11:24 AM
ORDER re23 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Alexander Samuel Krois for PLAINTIFF Canva US Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (MG)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/14 11:20 AM
ORDER re24 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Marc David Peters for PLAINTIFF Canva US Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (MG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
utility Notice to PHV and Local Counsel Unable to Process Application Tue 02/13 12:08 PM
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice23 by attorney Alexander Samuel Krois will not be processed at this time. Attorney must first complete all requirements for PHV admission via PACER. Please contact Admissions Clerk Monique Guillebeau at 206-370-8433 or[LINK:WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov] with additional questions. (MG)
Related: [-]
utility Notice to PHV and Local Counsel Unable to Process Application Tue 02/13 12:11 PM
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice24 by attorney Marc David Peters will not be processed at this time. Attorney must first complete all requirements for PHV admission via PACER. Please contact Admissions Clerk Monique Guillebeau at 206-370-8433 or[LINK:WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov] with additional questions. (MG)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
24 24 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/12 3:27 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Marc David Peters FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Canva US Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8348820 (Ewart, Michael)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/12 3:21 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alexander Samuel Krois FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Canva US Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8348785 (Ewart, Michael)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/12 1:33 PM
ORDER re19 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney C Matthew Rozier for DEFENDANTS Accessify LLC and Ascend IP LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (MG)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 02/12 1:20 PM
ORDER re18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James F McDonough, III for DEFENDANTS Accessify LLC and Ascend IP LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (MG)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
20 20 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 02/09 4:21 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , filed by All Defendants. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 3/8/2024, (Mann, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
19 19 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/09 11:26 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY C. Matthew Rozier FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Defendants (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8346077 (Mann, Philip)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/09 11:24 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James F. McDonough, III FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Defendants (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8346059 (Mann, Philip)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Fri 02/09 9:19 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 3/15/2024, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/23/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/8/2024. (AD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 01/10 3:22 PM
ORDER granting Parties'15 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint . The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended to 2/9/2024. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SS)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Stipulated Motion Wed 01/10 12:42 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint , filed by All Defendants. Noting Date 1/10/2024, (Mann, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/10 12:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Philip P Mann on behalf of Defendants Accessify LLC, Ascend IP LLC. (Mann, Philip)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Wed 01/10 11:22 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Ascend IP LLC on 12/22/2023, filed by Plaintiff Canva US Inc. (Ewart, Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Wed 01/10 11:19 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Accessify LLC on 12/22/2023, filed by Plaintiff Canva US Inc. (Ewart, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
11 11 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Fri 12/22 1:58 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Ascend IP LLC on 12/20/2023, filed by Plaintiff Canva US Inc. (Ewart, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Fri 12/22 1:55 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Accessify LLC on 12/20/2023, filed by Plaintiff Canva US Inc. (Ewart, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
9 9 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/20 1:59 PM
ORDER re4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jacob Zweig for Plaintiff Canva US Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (CDA)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/20 1:55 PM
ORDER re5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jennifer Seraphine for Plaintiff Canva US Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (CDA)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 12/20 11:07 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Accessify LLC, Ascend IP LLC (CR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
6 6 utility Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright Wed 12/20 11:05 AM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (CR)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 12/20 11:01 AM
Judge James L. Robart added. (CR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
5 5 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/19 3:57 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jennifer Seraphine FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Canva US Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8285903 (Ewart, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/19 3:52 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jacob Zweig FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Canva US Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8285783 (Ewart, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Pendency of Other Action Mon 12/18 11:16 PM
NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, case number(s) in other court 23-cv-01289; filed by Plaintiff Canva US Inc. (Ewart, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 12/18 11:11 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Canva Inc for Canva US Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Canva US Inc. (Ewart, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 12/18 10:56 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND Related [+] Attorney Michael J Ewart added to party Canva US Inc(pty:pla) filed by Canva US Inc.(Ewart, Michael)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8284059
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-E,
Att: 3 Exhibit F-L,
Att: 4 Exhibit M-T,
Att: 5 Summons for Accessify LLC,
Att: 6 Summons for Ascend IP LLC,
Att: 7 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120)