New Jersey District Court
Judge:Esther Salas
Referred: Stacey D Adams
Case #: 2:23-cv-23206
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jun 16, 2024 5:46 AM EDT
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
Defendant
RONALD EDWARDS
Represented By
GREGORY F. KOTCHICK
Durkin & Durkin, LLP
contact info
Defendant
HUDSON COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY
Represented By
EVAN H.C. CROOK
Malamut And Associates, LLC
contact info
Defendant
HUDSON COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION
Represented By
EVAN H.C. CROOK
Malamut And Associates, LLC
contact info
Defendant
HUDSON COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE
Represented By
PATRICIA MARIE NIGRO
Dept. Of Law And Public Safety, Division Of Law
contact info
MARVIN L. FREEMAN
State Of New Jersey
contact info
Defendant
JULIA MEDINA
Represented By
MARVIN L. FREEMAN
State Of New Jersey
contact info
Defendant
LESLIE MURPHY
Represented By
MARVIN L. FREEMAN
State Of New Jersey
contact info
Defendant
ASHLEY RUBEL
Represented By
MARVIN L. FREEMAN
State Of New Jersey
contact info
Defendant
ESTHER SUAREZ
Hudson County Prosecutor's Office 595 Newark Ave
Jersey City, NJ 07306
Represented By
MARVIN L. FREEMAN
State Of New Jersey
contact info
Defendant
JANE WEINER
Represented By
MARVIN L. FREEMAN
State Of New Jersey
contact info
Plaintiff
YURSIL KIDWAI
Represented By
KELLY A ZAMPINO
Hartmann Doherty Rosa Berman & Bulbulia, LLP
contact info
MARK A. BERMAN
Hartmann Doherty Rosa Berman & Bulbulia, LLP
contact info
ALEXANDRA MORGAN MACDONALD
Hartmann Doherty Rosa Berman & Bulbulia LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
56 56 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/28 11:15 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 4/25/2025. (mj)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Mon 04/28 12:44 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams: Status Conference held on 4/25/2025. Order to be filed. (JB)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
55 55 order Text Order Mon 04/21 3:29 PM
TEXT ORDER-- The court is in receipt of the parties letter dated 04/16/25 concerning the deposition of Prosecutor Suarez. (ECF No.54 ). The Court shall conduct a conference to discuss same on April 25, 2025 at 2:30 p.m. via video conference. Microsoft Teams login credentials will be provided. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 4/21/2025. (JB)
Related: [-]