Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02738

New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:23-cv-23212
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jun 16, 2024 5:47 AM EDT
Defendant
JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By
SUSAN M. SHARKO
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC.
Defendant
KENVUE INC.
Defendant
LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC.
In Re
JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Plaintiff
DAWN MORGAN
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER R. LOPALO
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/21 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON (SHARKO, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 12/19 4:10 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC., KENVUE INC., LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/19 12:55 PM
COMPLAINT against JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC., KENVUE INC., LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-14951719) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DAWN MORGAN.(LOPALO, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
mdl MDL Direct File Tue 12/19 4:12 PM
Member Case Direct File on 12/19/2023, for MDL 2738.(jjc, )
Related: [-]