Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Mary S Scriven
Referred: Sean P Flynn
Case #: 8:23-cv-02901
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause38:775 Recovery of Servicemens Group Life Insurance
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2023
Terminated:Jun 26, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jun 16, 2024 5:37 AM EDT
Cross Claimant
Teri Mckee
Represented By
Jason Turchin
Law Offices Of Jason Turchin
contact info
Whitney Page
Law Offices Of Jason Turchin
contact info
Cross Defendant
Joanna McPherson
Represented By
Brice Zoecklein
Zoecklin Law, PA
contact info
Defendant
Joanna McPherson
Represented By
Brice Zoecklein
Zoecklin Law, PA
contact info
Defendant
Teri Mckee
Represented By
Jason Turchin
Law Offices Of Jason Turchin
contact info
Whitney Page
Law Offices Of Jason Turchin
contact info
Plaintiff
The Prudential Insurance Company of America
201 Alhambra Circle Suite 1205
Coral Gables, FL 33134
Represented By
Emilia A. Quesada
Sanchez-Medina, Gonzalez, Quesada, Et Al. (smgq Law)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
25 25 order Order Dismissing Case Tue 08/13 10:18 AM
ENDORSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is ORDERED that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 and upon review of 24 the Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of all Claims and Action, this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs associated with this matter. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot. This case shall remain CLOSED. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/13/2024. (DEJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
24 24 2 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 08/08 9:18 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of all Claims and Action Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Quesada, Emilia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
23 23 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 06/27 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JDR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
22 22 order Order Dismissing Case Wed 06/26 3:35 PM
ENDORSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is ORDERED that pursuant to Rule 3.09(b) of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida and upon review of 20 the Mediator's Notice of Settlement, this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Parties may, within sixty (60) calendar days from the date of this Order, submit a final stipulation of dismissal or any party may seek to reopen the case, upon good cause shown. After the sixty (60)-day period, the dismissal shall be with prejudice. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/26/2024. (DEJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
21 21 3 pgs misc Settlement Agreement Fri 06/21 1:30 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Joint Stipulation for Distribution by Joanna McPherson. (Zoecklein, Brice)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
20 20 1 pgs adr Mediation report Tue 06/18 4:04 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on June 18, 2024. Hearing outcome: Settled.. (Betts, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
19 19 2 pgs notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Mon 03/18 9:35 AM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on June 18, 2024, at 9:30 A.M. before James R. Betts, Esq. (Page, Whitney) Modified docket text on 3/18/2024 (JOS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
18 18 order Case Management Scheduling Order Thu 02/29 11:14 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/8/2024 Discovery due by 10/18/2024 Dispositive motions due by 11/15/2024 Pretrial statement due by 3/21/2025 All other motions due by 3/28/2025 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 8/9/2024 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 9/6/2024 Jury Trial set for 5/5/2025 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 7 A before Judge Mary S. Scriven. Conduct mediation hearing by 8/1/2024. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/29/2024. (BCH)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
17 17 6 pgs misc Case Management Report Mon 02/12 2:01 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Page, Whitney)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
16 16 4 pgs misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/06 3:33 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Joanna McPherson. (Zoecklein, Brice)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
15 15 service Waiver of service executed Wed 01/31 11:04 AM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 01/18/2024 by The Prudential Insurance Company of America as to Joanna McPherson. (Quesada, Emilia)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Waiver of service executed Wed 01/31 11:02 AM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 01/04/2024 by The Prudential Insurance Company of America as to Teri Mckee. (Quesada, Emilia)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of appearance Fri 01/19 11:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brice Zoecklein on behalf of Joanna McPherson (Zoecklein, Brice)
Related: [-]
12 12 4 pgs answer Answer to Crossclaim Fri 01/19 11:21 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to 8 Crossclaim by McKee by Joanna McPherson. Related document: 8 Answer to Complaint Crossclaimfiled by Teri Mckee.(Zoecklein, Brice)
Related: [-]
11 11 4 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/19 11:18 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to 1 Complaint for Interpleader by Joanna McPherson.(Zoecklein, Brice)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
10 10 service Summons issued Tue 01/09 12:47 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Joanna McPherson. (AJS)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
9 9 service Proposed summons Mon 01/08 3:38 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Teri Mckee. (Page, Whitney)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
8 8 8 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Thu 01/04 3:16 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Joanna McPherson by Teri Mckee.(Page, Whitney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 57 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 1 pgs Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F,
Att: 7 1 pgs Exhibit Exhibit G
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 01/04 11:14 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Teri Mckee. (Page, Whitney)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 01/04 11:12 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Teri Mckee. Related case(s): No (Page, Whitney)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 01/04 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Whitney Page on behalf of Teri Mckee. Lead Counsel: Whitney Page, Esq.. (Page, Whitney)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of appearance Thu 01/04 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Whitney Page on behalf of Teri Mckee (Page, Whitney)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 12/27 9:40 AM
NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BCH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 12/19 3:55 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:23-cv-2901-MSS-SPF. (RLK)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 12/19 12:18 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21578638) filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Quesada, Emilia) Modified to edit docket text on 12/19/2023 (RLK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 58 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 3 1 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 4 1 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 5 1 pgs Exhibit D,
Att: 6 1 pgs Exhibit E,
Att: 7 1 pgs Exhibit F,
Att: 8 3 pgs Exhibit G,
Att: 9 1 pgs Exhibit H