Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Sarah D Morrison
Referred: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Case #: 2:23-cv-04184
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jun 16, 2024 5:56 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Daniel J Coley
Represented By
David Freeman Axelrod
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick LLC
contact info
Ali Walid Latif
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick LLC
contact info
Mark D Wagoner, Jr
Shumaker Loop & Kendrick
contact info
Counter Defendant
Hi-Vac Corporation
Represented By
Ellis Leslie Leon Bennett
Dunlap Bennett & Ludwig
contact info
Michael Arrick Shafer
Dunlap Bennett & Ludwig
contact info
Amy D Vogel
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
David Matthew Trinnes
Dunlap Bennett & Ludwig PLLC
contact info
David John Butler
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Daniel J Coley
Represented By
David Freeman Axelrod
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick LLC
contact info
Ali Walid Latif
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick LLC
contact info
Mark D Wagoner, Jr
Shumaker Loop & Kendrick
contact info
Counter Defendant
Alliance Industries, Inc.
Represented By
Amy D Vogel
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
David John Butler
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Defendant
Curtis R Coley
2673 Oak Park Boulevard
Cuyahoga Falls, OH 44221
Represented By
Gregory Scott Peterson
Peterson Conners LLP
contact info
Defendant
Daniel J Coley
3256 Aleah Court
Cuyahoga Falls, OH 44223
Represented By
David Freeman Axelrod
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick LLC
contact info
Ali Walid Latif
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick LLC
contact info
Mark D Wagoner, Jr
Shumaker Loop & Kendrick
contact info
Defendant
Randy J DePuy
45847 Cobb Road
Caldwell, OH 43724
Represented By
Todd Aaron Long
Eastman Smith Ltd.
contact info
Karl Herbert Schneider
Eastman & Smith Ltd.
contact info
Defendant
Karl M Dickinson
1358 Cedar Creek
Painesville, OH 44077
Defendant
G6 Environmental Equipment, LLC
4843 Crooked Stick Court
Brighton, MI 48116
Represented By
Justin C. Withrow
contact info
Kathlena Broughton
Flannery Georgalis, LLC
contact info
Matthew L. Jalandoni
Flannery Georgalis LLC
contact info
Defendant
Brian D Gensler
3111 Creekside Drive
Ponder, TX 76259
Represented By
Robert L. Chaiken
Chaiken & Chaiken, P.C.
contact info
John C Camillus
Law Offices Of John C. Camillus, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Matthew D Greenwold
3108 Hunter Road
Brighton, MI 47114
Represented By
Justin C. Withrow
contact info
Kathlena Broughton
Flannery Georgalis, LLC
contact info
Matthew L. Jalandoni
Flannery Georgalis LLC
contact info
Defendant
L-GEN Services
3111 Creekside Drive
Ponder, TX 76259
Represented By
Robert L. Chaiken
Chaiken & Chaiken, P.C.
contact info
John C Camillus
Law Offices Of John C. Camillus, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Lindsay N Lipscomb
20 Atkinson Ridge Road
Walker, WV 26180
Represented By
Connor A. Organ
Organ Law LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Hi-Vac Corporation
117 Industry Road
Marietta, OH 45750
Represented By
Cortland Christopher Putbrese
Dunlap Bennett & Ludwig PLLC
contact info
Amy Diane Vogel
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Ellis Leslie Leon Bennett
Dunlap Bennett & Ludwig
contact info
Michael Arrick Shafer
Dunlap Bennett & Ludwig
contact info
Amy D Vogel
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
David Matthew Trinnes
Dunlap Bennett & Ludwig PLLC
contact info
David John Butler
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alliance Industries, Inc.
Reno Business Park 27811 State Route 7
Marietta, OH 45750
Represented By
Cortland Christopher Putbrese
Dunlap Bennett & Ludwig PLLC
contact info
Amy Diane Vogel
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Amy D Vogel
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
David John Butler
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info

GPO Sep 23 2024
80] Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 95 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Chief District Judge Sarah Daggett Morrison on 9/23/2024. (merc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot 71 Motion to Dismiss; denying [

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
135 135 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 05/16 9:15 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting134 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ali Walid Latif terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 5/16/2025. (EPD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
134 134 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 05/15 1:27 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Daniel J Coley. (Latif, Ali)
Related: [-]