California Central District Court
Judge:Pedro V Castillo
Referred: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Case #: 2:23-cv-10615
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2023
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 23STCV30257
Last checked: Sunday Jun 16, 2024 2:38 AM PDT
Defendant
City of Los Angeles
Represented By
Maurice Aaron Neishlos
Los Angeles City Attorneys Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Ismael Tamayo
Represented By
Gregory G Yacoubian
Law Offices Of Gregopry G.Yacoubian
contact info
Caleb E Mason
Werksman Jackson And Quinn LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
23 23 misc Status Report Mon 05/05 9:08 AM
STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING PENDING STATE COURT ACTION filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Neishlos, Maurice)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
22 22 misc Status Report Tue 03/04 9:22 AM
STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING PENDING STATE COURT ACTION filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Neishlos, Maurice)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
21 21 misc Status Report Fri 01/03 9:59 AM
STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING PENDING STATE COURT ACTION filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Neishlos, Maurice)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
20 20 misc Status Report Mon 11/04 11:26 AM
STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING PENDING STATE COURT ACTION filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Neishlos, Maurice)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
19 19 misc Status Report Tue 09/03 10:53 AM
STATUS REPORT REGARDING PENDING STATE COURT ACTION filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Neishlos, Maurice)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
18 18 misc Status Report Tue 07/02 8:57 AM
STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING PENDING STATE COURT ACTION filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Neishlos, Maurice)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
17 17 misc Status Report Fri 05/03 9:19 AM
STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING PENDING STATE COURT ACTION filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Neishlos, Maurice)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
16 16 misc Status Report Mon 03/04 9:32 AM
STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING PENDING STATE COURT ACTION filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Neishlos, Maurice)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
15 15 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 01/19 2:47 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number incomplete; incorrect initials of Judge. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 01/16 5:17 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gregory G Yacoubian counsel for Plaintiff Ismael Tamayo. Adding Gregory G. Yacoubian as counsel of record for Ismael Tamayo for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Ismael Tamayo. (Attorney Gregory G Yacoubian added to party Ismael Tamayo(pty:pla))(Yacoubian, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Hearings Wed 01/03 11:50 AM
ORDER GRANTING STAY by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo, re Stipulation to Stay Case12 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is stayed until a judgment has been issued by the Superior Court on Plaintiff's pending Writ Petition. All dates scheduled in the Court's Mandatory Scheduling Conference (MSC) Order (Dkt. No. 9) are vacated. The Parties will file a Joint Status Report every sixty (60) days from the date of this Order, informing the Court of the status of the pending Writ Petition. (et)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
12 12 stip Stay Case Tue 01/02 10:31 AM
STIPULATION to Stay Case pending RESOLUTION OF PLAINTIFFS STATE COURT PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles.(Neishlos, Maurice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, December 28, 2023
11 11 misc Consent to Proceed (CV-11D) before US Magistrate Judge Voluntary Program Thu 12/28 5:08 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before United States Magistrate Judge by all parties pursuant to GO 18-11 is approved by District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. This case is hereby reassigned to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo for all further proceedings. Case number will now read 2:23-cv-10615 PVC. (rn)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Lodging Thu 12/28 9:25 AM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form7(Neishlos, Maurice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Consent to Proceed
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
9 9 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 12/20 5:36 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court sets an in-person Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for hearing on January 26, 2024 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by January 16, 2024. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (jgr)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 12/20 5:35 PM
Civil Standing Order upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 12/20 5:04 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 12/20 5:03 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 12/20 5:03 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (car)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 12/19 5:07 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant CITY OF LOS ANGELES. (Neishlos, Maurice)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 12/19 4:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 23STCV30257 with filing fee previously paid ($405 paid on 12/19/2023, receipt number 36601575), filed by Defendant CITY OF LOS ANGELES.(Neishlos, Maurice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
2 2 misc Errata Tue 12/19 4:00 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant CITY OF LOS ANGELES. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 (Neishlos, Maurice)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 12/19 3:04 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36601575 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant CITY OF LOS ANGELES. (Attorney Maurice Aaron Neishlos added to party CITY OF LOS ANGELES(pty:dft))(Neishlos, Maurice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 12/20 5:07 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Los Angeles Police Department. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Ismael Tamayo. Filed in State Court on 12/11/2023 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal3 (car)
Related: [-]