Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Aleta A Trauger
Case #: 3:23-cv-01335
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2023
Terminated:Oct 07, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jun 16, 2024 4:57 AM CDT
Defendant
William Lee
Represented By
Nicholas S. Bolduc
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Tyler S. Sanders
Office Of Tennessee Attorney General
contact info
Elizabeth Helen Evan
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Rachel A. Newton
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
David Rausch
Represented By
Nicholas S. Bolduc
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Tyler S. Sanders
Office Of Tennessee Attorney General
contact info
Rachel A. Newton
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
John Doe 1335
Represented By
Kyle F. Mothershead
Relentless Advocacy, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, October 07, 2024
37 37 1 pgs order Order Administratively Closing Case Mon 10/07 3:33 PM
ORDER: This case shall be or remain ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED, pending a final order in Does #1-8 v. Rausch, et al., Case No. 3:21-cv-00590. The Clerk is directed to TERMINATE ALL PENDING MOTIONS WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refiling upon any reopening of this case. Any order entered herein after August 21, 2024 that set a briefing schedule is hereby VACATED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/7/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ab)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
36 36 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 09/30 2:05 PM
ORDER: Motion35 for Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 09/30/24. (ad)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 09/30 10:10 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym by William Lee, David Rausch. (Newton, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
34 34 1 pgs order Order Tue 09/24 4:55 PM
ORDER: The briefing schedule set out in the Joint Status Report filed on September 23, 2024 (Doc. No. 33) is acceptable to the court and is hereby ORDERED. The status conference scheduled for today, September 24, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/24/2024. (ds)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
33 33 misc Status Report Mon 09/23 3:30 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint by William Lee, David Rausch. (Newton, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
32 32 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/20 2:05 PM
NOTICE by William Lee, David Rausch Withdrawal of Counsel (Bolduc, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
31 31 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal Wed 09/18 8:34 AM
ORDER: Motion29 for Leave to File Document Under Seal GRANTED. Plaintiff will disclose copies of both exhibits to Counsels for Defendants contemporaneously with the filing of this motion. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 09/17/24. (ad)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Sealed Document Tue 09/17 12:19 PM
Sealed Document filed by John Doe 1335.(Mothershead, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A_Doe Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit C_Judgment
29 29 motion Leave to File Document under Seal Tue 09/17 12:18 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by John Doe 1335. (Mothershead, Kyle)
Related: [-]
28 28 20 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Tue 09/17 12:17 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of27 MOTION to Stay EXTEND STAY INDEFINITELY filed by John Doe 1335 . (Mothershead, Kyle)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Stay Tue 09/17 12:16 PM
MOTION to Stay EXTEND STAY INDEFINITELY by John Doe 1335.(Mothershead, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B_Trauger Does 1 - 9 Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit D_TBI Recidivism Study,
Att: 3 Exhibit E_Sample TBI Offense Data Error
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 09/17 9:57 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Aaron Kiefer Rothbaum admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 09/16 3:42 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a status conference will be held in this case on Tuesday, September 24, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. in Judge Trauger's chambers. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/16/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ch)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/16 3:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Kiefer Rothbaum on behalf of John Doe 1335 (Rothbaum, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
24 24 misc Status Report Fri 09/13 9:34 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint by William Lee, David Rausch. (Newton, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/05 1:34 PM
NOTICE by William Lee, David Rausch of Withdrawal of Counsel (Evan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/03 5:03 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym and for Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/3/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 04/02 10:09 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Rachel A. Newton, Tyler S. Sanders admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Tue 04/02 10:06 AM
ORDER: Motion20 to Substitute Attorney GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 04/01/24. (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
20 20 motion Substitute Attorney Tue 03/26 10:57 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by William Lee, David Rausch. (Newton, Rachel)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Deficiency Notice Tue 03/26 10:00 AM
NOTICE TO FILER re DE#19 : The wrong event was used. The correct event should be Motion to Substitute Attorney. Counsel shall re-file the document. (ad)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Mon 03/25 3:16 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Rachel A. Newton on behalf of William Lee, David Rausch. (Newton, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 03/07 7:04 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Kyle F. Mothershead (Mothershead, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Staying Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 01/10 12:36 PM
ORDER: Joint Motion16 to Stay Administratively Pending Ruling in Sixth Circuit Appeal GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 01/10/24. (ad)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Wed 01/10 9:45 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Elizabeth Helen Evan, Nicholas S. Bolduc admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
16 16 motion Stay Tue 01/09 2:51 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Administratively Pending Ruling in Sixth Circuit Appeal by William Lee, David Rausch. (Evan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/09 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas S. Bolduc on behalf of William Lee, David Rausch (Bolduc, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/09 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Helen Evan on behalf of William Lee, David Rausch (Evan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal Mon 01/08 1:27 PM
ORDER: Motion8 for Leave to File Document Under Seal GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 01/08/24. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Preliminary Injunction ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 01/08 1:24 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's6 unopposed motion for a preliminary injunction supported by a memorandum. Based on the record as a whole and for good cause shown, including Defendants' lack of opposition, the Plaintiff's Motion will be GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 01/08/24. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
11 11 5 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Fri 01/05 4:30 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of10 MOTION PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by John Doe . (Mothershead, Kyle)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 01/05 4:29 PM
MOTION PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by John Doe. (Mothershead, Kyle)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Sealed Document Fri 01/05 4:24 PM
Sealed Document filed by John Doe.(Mothershead, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit B
8 8 motion Leave to File Document under Seal Fri 01/05 4:22 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by John Doe. (Mothershead, Kyle)
Related: [-]
7 7 17 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Fri 01/05 4:21 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction UNOPPOSED filed by John Doe . (Mothershead, Kyle)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Preliminary Injunction Fri 01/05 4:20 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction UNOPPOSED by John Doe.(Mothershead, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order
5 5 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Fri 01/05 12:10 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2024 at 01:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 12/19 2:24 PM
Summons issued as to William Lee, David Rausch. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Tue 12/19 2:19 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Tue 12/19 2:19 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/19 2:18 PM
COMPLAINT against William Lee, David Rausch (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-3976501), filed by John Doe.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 12/19 2:28 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Kyle F. Mothershead admitted to this court . (mg)
Related: [-]