California Central District Court
Judge:Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr
Referred: Michael R Wilner
Case #: 2:23-cv-10618
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2023
Terminated:Jan 18, 2024
Case in other court:Los Angeles, 23STCV28207
Last checked: Sunday Jun 16, 2024 2:39 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Angel Last Name Unknown
Defendant
United Parcel Service Inc.
Represented By
Robert D Prine
Dinsmore And Shohl LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Itzel Mendez
Represented By
Levon Z. Derkalousdian
Shegerian Conniff LLP
contact info
Heather Conniff
Shegerian Conniff LLP
contact info
Cortney S. Shegerian
Shegerian Conniff LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, January 29, 2024
20 20 misc Receipt Tue 01/30 1:45 PM
Receipt of Letter of Transmittal- Remand to Superior Court (rolm)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Mon 01/22 2:05 PM
Notice Posting Jury Fees filed by Plaintiff Itzel Mendez. (Derkalousdian, Levon)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
18 18 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Fri 01/19 4:46 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Stanley Mosk Courthouse. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Stanley Mosk Courthouse. (gk)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 01/19 4:31 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or untimely. Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
17 17 order Remand Case to State Court Fri 01/19 4:44 PM
ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Plaintiff asserts in her motion to remand14 that this Court lacks jurisdiction because she and Chacon are both California citizens. In the parties Joint Rule 26 report, UPS stated that it "does not oppose remanding this matter to state court." UPS also stated that it intends to file a notice of non-opposition to Plaintiff's motion to remand. Id. Because it appears that this Court lacks jurisdiction, and in light of UPS's nonopposition, the Court hereby remands this case to the Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case No. 23STCV28207. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated. ) (gk)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 01/18 5:39 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day),,11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days). The 30-day docketing event is intended for Freedom of Information Act cases. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
14 14 motion Remand Case to State Court Wed 01/17 11:10 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Itzel Mendez. Motion set for hearing on 2/9/2024 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Derkalousdian, Levon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
13 13 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Tue 01/16 6:54 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7-10 days, filed by Plaintiff Itzel Mendez.. (Derkalousdian, Levon)
Related: [-]
12 12 stip Continue Tue 01/16 3:18 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Mandatory Scheduling Conference from January 26, 2024 to February 23, 2024 filed by Defendant United Parcel Service Inc..(Prine, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, January 15, 2024
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day) Mon 01/15 12:55 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed Itzel Mendez, upon Defendant Angel Last Name Unknown served on 1/12/2024, answer due 2/12/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Derkalousdian, Levon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Tue 12/26 4:58 PM
Notice filed by plaintiff Itzel Mendez. (Derkalousdian, Levon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
9 9 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Thu 12/21 7:57 AM
(In Chambers) Order re Lead Counsel Designation by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: As directed in the Court's Standing Order for Civil Cases, only one attorney for each party may be designated as lead counsel. Lead counsel must attend all proceedings set by this Court and must be prepared to address and resolve all matters within the scope of the proceeding. Plaintiff has multiple attorneys but has failed to designate lead counsel. Counsel for Plaintiff are directed to update the docket to comply with the Court's requirement by no later than noon on December 22, 2023. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 12/21 7:52 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court sets an in-person Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for hearing on January 26, 2024 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by January 16, 2024. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (jgr)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 12/21 7:49 AM
Civil standing order upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 12/20 2:29 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 12/20 2:28 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 12/20 2:28 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (sh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 12/19 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc., (Prine, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 12/19 3:43 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Prine, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 12/19 3:40 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 23STCV28207 Receipt No: ACACDC-36602510 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attorney Robert D Prine added to party United Parcel Service, Inc.(pty:dft))(Prine, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 12/20 2:21 PM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Angel Last Name Unknown, United Parcel Service Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Itzel Mendez.[FILED IN STATE COURT 11/17/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 EXHIBIT B TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Wed 12/20 2:23 PM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant United Parcel Service Inc.[FILED IN STATE COURT 12/19/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 4 EXHIBIT D TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](sh)
Related: [-]