Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Mark H Cohen
Referred: Walter E Johnson
Case #: 1:23-cv-05817
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2023
Terminated:Jan 17, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jun 15, 2024 6:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Candice Carvalho
109 Donegal Way
Dallas, GA 30132
Defendant
Carlton Carvalho
109 Donegal Way
Dallas, GA 30132
Defendant
Nancy Salvador
109 Donegal Way
Dallas, GA 30132
Defendant
Pedro Salvador
And All Others 109 Donegal Way
Dallas, GA 30132
Plaintiff
Excalibur Homes
2855 Marconi Dr. Ste 310
Alpharetta, GA 30005


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Final Report and Recommendation Wed 01/17 1:58 PM
ORDER adopting3 Final Report and Recommendation. The action is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Paulding County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 1/17/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 01/17 2:00 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (dgr)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 01/17 2:01 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Candice Carvalho, Carlton Carvalho, Excalibur Homes, Nancy Salvador, and Pedro Salvador re5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (dgr)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 01/17 2:10 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Paulding County Magistrate Court re5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation and Remand Letter. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 01/09 2:03 PM
Submission of3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re2 Notice of Removal, filed by Carlton Carvalho to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
4 4 3 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Thu 12/21 2:46 PM
ORDER for Service of3 Order and Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 12/21/23. (klb)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Report and Recommendation - Final Thu 12/21 2:44 PM
ORDER AND FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re2 Notice of Removal, filed by Carlton Carvalho. Because defendant has failed to demonstrate any lawful basis for removal of the action, the undersigned RECOMMENDS that this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Paulding County pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1447(c). The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 12/21/23. (klb)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 12/21 2:43 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Carlton Carvalho.(klb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
order Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 12/21 2:40 PM
ORDER granting1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis for the limited purpose of remand (found in text of Order and Final Report & Recommendation). Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 12/21/23. c:Financial Office(klb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/21 2:47 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Carlton Carvalho re4 Order for Service of Order and Final Report and Recommendation and3 ORDER AND FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (klb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 12/19 12:04 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 12/19 11:56 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carlton Carvalho. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet