District Of Columbia District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00444
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 20, 2023 2:20 AM EST
Defendant
GENE DIGIOVANNI, JR. (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Katherine Elizabeth Boyles
Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/20/2023 2:40 AM EST
Monday, August 14, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT as to GENE DIGIOVANNI (1). (zltp) [1:23-mj-00204-MAU]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Facts
3 3 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to GENE DIGIOVANNI.(zltp) [1:23-mj-00204-MAU]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal Case as to GENE DIGIOVANNI (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya on 8/14/2023. (zltp) [1:23-mj-00204-MAU]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
Arrest of GENE DIGIOVANNI, JR in Connecticut. (zltp) [1:23-mj-00204-MAU]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to GENE DIGIOVANNI, JR (zltp) [1:23-mj-00204-MAU]
Related: [-]
5 5 Arrest Warrant, dated 8/14/2023, Returned Executed on 8/15/2023 as to GENE DIGIOVANNI, JR. (zltp) [1:23-mj-00204-MAU]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
MINUTE ORDER as to GENE DIGIOVANNI, JR.: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant appear for an initial appearance on 8/29/2023 at 12:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui. The hearing will be conducted by video teleconference; call-in instructions will be provided to counsel prior to the hearing. Counsel for the United States is directed to ensure that counsel for Defendant has received this Order and will provide the information to Defendant. If Defendant does not have counsel, counsel for the United States is directed to contact the Office of the Federal Public Defender for the District of Columbia and provide their office with the information contained in this Order. If the parties have questions about this Order or the scheduled hearing, please contact the Courtroom Deputy at 202-354-3173. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 8/23/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 8/23/2023. (znjb) [1:23-mj-00204-MAU]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
6 6 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by USA as to GENE DIGIOVANNI, JR.(Boyles, Katherine) [1:23-mj-00204-MAU]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
7 7 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Disclose Rule 6(e) and Sealed Materials by USA as to GENE DIGIOVANNI, JR.(Boyles, Katherine) [1:23-mj-00204-MAU]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
8 8 PROTECTIVE ORDER setting forth procedures for handling confidential material; allowing designated material to be filed under seal as to GENE DIGIOVANNI, JR. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 8/24/2023. (zcll) [1:23-mj-00204-MAU]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
MINUTE ORDER as to GENE DIGIOVANNI JR. (1), GRANTING the government's unopposed7 Motion for an Order to Disclose Items Protected by Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 6(e) and Sealed Materials and AUTHORIZING the government, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 6(e)(3)(E)(i) and the previously entered8 Protective Order governing discovery in this case, to provide to defendant, and any co-defendant who may later be joined, materials protected by Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 6(e), insofar as such disclosure is necessary for the government to comply with its discovery and disclosure obligations. So ORDERED, by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/28/2023. (nbn) [1:23-mj-00204-MAU]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
ORAL MOTION for Speedy Trial by USA as to GENE DIGIOVANNI, JR. (znjb) [1:23-mj-00204-MAU]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui: First Appearance in the District as to GENE DIGIOVANNI, JR held on 8/29/2023. Defendant present by video. The Court advised the Government of its Due Process Obligations under Rule 5(f). Defendant has retained Counsel. Oral Motion by the Government for Speedy Trial as to GENE DIGIOVANNI JR.; heard and granted. Speedy Trial Excluded between 8/29/2023 to 11/9/2023 in the Interest of Justice (XT). Defendant waives right to Preliminary Hearing. Status Hearing set for 11/9/2023 at 1:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant released on Personal Recognizance; Court Reporter: FTR- GOLD; FTR Time Frame: CRTM 4: [1:31:57-1:37:13]; Defense Attorney: Martin Minella; US Attorney: Frederick Yette and Katherine Boyles; Pretrial Officer: Katrina Stanford. (znjb) [1:23-mj-00204-MAU]
Related: [-]
MINUTE ORDER as to GENE DIGIOVANNI, JR.: As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges and contempt proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 8/29/2023. (znjb) [1:23-mj-00204-MAU]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to GENE DIGIOVANNI JR. (1) Personal Recognizance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 8/29/2023. (Attachment: # 1 Appearance Bond) (znjb) [1:23-mj-00204-MAU]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
11 11 Joint MOTION to Continue November 9 Status Conference , Joint MOTION to Exclude Time under the Speedy Trial Act by USA as to GENE DIGIOVANNI, JR.(Boyles, Katherine) [1:23-mj-00204-MAU]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, November 13, 2023
12 12 ORDER granting11 Motion to Continue Status Hearing and Exclude Time as to GENE DIGIOVANNI JR. Status Hearing continued to 12/12/2023 at 1:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 11/13/2023. (znjb) [1:23-mj-00204-MAU]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
13 13 Joint MOTION to Continue December 12, 2023 Status Conference , Joint MOTION to Exclude Time under the Speedy Trial Act by USA as to GENE DIGIOVANNI, JR.(Boyles, Katherine) [1:23-mj-00204-MAU]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
14 14 ORDER granting13 Motion to Continue Status Hearing and Exclude Time as to GENE DIGIOVANNI JR. Status Conference set for 1/16/2024 at 1:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 12/6/2023. (zcll) [1:23-mj-00204-MAU]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
MINUTE ORDER as to GENE DIGIOVANNI, JR (1): Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court ORDERS that all government counsel shall review their disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, as set forth in Local Criminal Rule 5.1, and comply with those provisions. The failure to comply could result in dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, continuances, Bar discipline, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/18/2023. (nbn)
Related: [-]
MINUTE ORDER as to GENE DIGIOVANNI, JR (1): After discussions with the parties, the Court ORDERS an Arraignment/Plea Agreement Hearing set for 1/3/2024 at 09:30 AM via Zoom before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/18/2023. (nbn)
Related: [-]
15 15 INFORMATION as to GENE DIGIOVANNI, JR (1) count(s) 1. (zstd)
Related: [-]