California Southern District Court
Judge:Robert S Huie
Referred: Allison H Goddard
Case #: 3:23-cv-02297
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2023
Terminated:May 15, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jun 15, 2024 3:17 AM PDT
Defendant
Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC
Represented By
Avanti D Bakane
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Avanti D. Bakane
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ricardo A. Puentes
2807 Elrose Dr.
San Diego, CA 92154


Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
21 21 order Judgment Wed 05/15 12:47 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: Defendant Portfolio Recover Associates, LLC's motion for judgment on the pleadings is granted, and the Complaint is dismissed without leave to amend. Judgment is in Defendant's favor and the case is hereby closed. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(alns) (alns)
Related: [-]
20 20 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Order on Motion to Strike Wed 05/15 12:27 PM
ORDER: (1) Granting Defendants Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings WithoutLeave To Amend (2) Denying As Moot Plaintiffs Motion ToStrike (ECF Nos.8 ,10 ). Signed by District Judge Robert S. Huie on 5/15/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(alns)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
19 19 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/11 10:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER Denying18 Plaintiff's Motion for Further Judicial Intervention Following Meet and Confer Conference. The Court notes that there is no Local Rule 5.8.1.e in this district. Plaintiff's motion is denied without prejudice to refiling so Plaintiff can specifically state what he wants the Court to intervene regarding. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 3/11/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (hmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
18 18 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/05 8:57 AM
Motion For Further Judicial Intervention Following Meet And Confer Conference by Ricardo A. Puentes. (alns)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 03/05 8:56 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Ricardo A. Puentes. (alns)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
16 16 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 02/29 3:47 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. (Bakane, Avanti) (alns)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
15 15 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 02/22 3:45 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION to Strike filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. (Bakane, Avanti)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/22 3:32 PM
Amended ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC.(Bakane, Avanti)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
13 13 service Certificate of Service Wed 02/21 4:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Bakane, Avanti)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Lodgment Tue 02/20 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Lodgment by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Bakane, Avanti)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Allow the Non-Electronic Filing of Exhibits Wed 02/14 11:31 AM
ORDER Granting Defendants Motion To File Under Seal (ECF No.9 ). Signed by District Judge Robert S. Huie on 2/14/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(alns)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
10 10 motion Strike Mon 02/12 3:19 PM
MOTION to Strike by Ricardo A. Puentes. (alns)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
9 9 motion Leave to Allow the Non-Electronic Filing of Exhibits Thu 02/01 3:14 PM
MOTION for Leave to Allow the Non-Electronic Filing of Exhibits Under Seal by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. (Bakane, Avanti)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Thu 02/01 3:10 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC.(Bakane, Avanti)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Of Law
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/01 3:06 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC.(Bakane, Avanti)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, January 11, 2024
6 6 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 01/11 1:21 PM
MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert S. Huie: For good cause, the Court GRANTS Defendant's5 opposed motion for extension of time. The deadline for Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC to respond to1 the Complaint is extended until 2/01/2024. Signed by District Judge Robert S. Huie on 1/11/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (no document attached) (hnn)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 01/11 11:16 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. (Bakane, Avanti)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/11 11:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Avanti D Bakane on behalf of Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Bakane, Avanti)Attorney Avanti D Bakane added to party Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 12/27 1:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricardo A. Puentes. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC served. (alns)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 12/19 11:59 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (stn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/19 11:56 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 150213.), filed by Ricardo A. Puentes. The new case number is 3:23-cv-2297-RSH-AHG. Judge Robert S. Huie and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case.(stn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Receipt