Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:23-mc-00156
Nature of Suit111 Civil - Miscellaneous
CauseAttorney Discipline
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2023
Terminated:Dec 20, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order Wed 05/14 10:19 AM
ORDER THAT RESPONDENT FILE WITH THIS COURT, WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF SERVICE OF THIS ORDER, AN ANSWER INFORMING THIS COURT OF ANY CLAIM BY THE RESPONDENT, PREDICATED UPON THE GROUNDS SET FORTH IN LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.6 II D, THAT THE IMPOSITION OF IDENTICAL DISCIPLINE BY THIS COURT WOULD BE UNWARRANTED, AND THE REASONS THEREFORE. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/14/25. 5/14/25 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE. (go)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
4 4 misc Certified Copy of Order Thu 04/24 9:09 AM
Copy of Order from the Supreme Court of Pennsylvania dated April 21, 2025, upon consideration of the Verified Statement of Resignation, Daniel Liam Glennon is disbarred on consent from the Bar of this Commonwealth, retroactive to October 12, 2023. See Pa.R.D.E. 215. Respondent shall comply with the provisions of Pa.R.D.E. 217 and pay costs to the Disciplinary Board. See Pa.R.D.E. 208(g). (go)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
3 3 order Final Discipline Order Wed 02/21 11:44 AM
ORDER THAT RESPONDENT IS PLACED ON TEMPORARY SUSPENSION FROM THE PRACTICE OF LAW IN THIS COURT, EFFECTIVE THIRTY (30) DAYS FROM OCTOBER 12, 2023, AND UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 2/21/24. 2/21/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE. (go)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
2 2 1 pgs order Order Thu 12/21 11:23 AM
ORDER THAT RESPONDENT FILE WITH THIS COURT, WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF SERVICE OF THIS ORDER, AN ANSWER INFORMING THIS COURT OF ANY CLAIM BY THE RESPONDENT, PREDICATED UPON THE GROUNDS SET FORTH IN LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.6 II D, THAT THE IMPOSITION OF IDENTICAL DISCIPLINE BY THIS COURT WOULD BE UNWARRANTED, AND THE REASONS THEREFORE. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/21/23. 12/21/23 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE. (go)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
1 1 misc Certified Copy of Order Wed 12/20 10:06 AM
Copy of Order from the Supreme Court of Pennsylvania dated October 12, 2023, the Joint Petition for Emergency Temporary Suspension is granted, and Daniel Liam Glennon is placed on immediate temporary suspension until further definitive action by this Court. It is further provided that: 1. Respondent shall comply with the provisions of Pa.R.D.E. 217; 2. The President Judge of the Court of Common Pleas of Montgomery County shall enter such orders as may be necessary to protect the rights of Respondent's clients or fiduciary entities with which he is involved, see Pa.R.D.E. 217(g); and 3. All financial institutions in which Respondent holds fiduciary funds shall freeze such accounts pending further action by a court of appropriate jurisdiction. This Order constitutes an imposition of public discipline. See Pa.R.D.E. 402(c)(3) (providing an exception to the confidentiality requirement of Rule 402 when "an order of temporary suspension from the practice of law is entered by the Court pursuant to Enforcement Rule 208(f)"). (go)
Related: [-]