Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Sunil R Harjani
Referred: Keri L Holleb Hotaling
Case #: 1:23-cv-16948
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2023
Case in other court:Texas Southern, 4:23-cv-02685
Last checked: Monday Jun 17, 2024 3:38 AM CDT
Defendant
Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation
Defendant
Jennie-O Turkey Store, Inc.
Represented By
Emily Elizabeth Chow
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Daniel Alexander Harrell
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Craig Stuart Coleman
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Defendant
House of Raeford Farms, Inc.
Represented By
Henry W. Jones, Junio
Jordan Price
contact info
Gregory Gene Wrobel
Vedder Price P.C.
contact info
H. Weldon Jones, III
Jordan Price
contact info
Alexander D Burch
Baker Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Defendant
Hormel Foods Corporation
Represented By
Emily Elizabeth Chow
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Daniel Alexander Harrell
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Craig Stuart Coleman
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Defendant
Foster Poultry Farms
Represented By
Kathryne Marie Gray
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Carmine R. Zarlenga
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Oral Pottinger
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Defendant
Perdue Farms Inc.
Represented By
Danielle R Foley
Venable LLP
contact info
Lisa Jose Fales
Venable LLP
contact info
Paul Feinstein
Venable LLP
contact info
Andrew Thomas Hernacki
Venable LLP
contact info
Kristin M. Koger
Venable LLP
contact info
Defendant
Foster Farms, LLC
Represented By
Kathryne Marie Gray
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Carmine R. Zarlenga
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Oral Pottinger
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Defendant
Farbest Foods, Inc.
Represented By
Gaspare Joseph Bono
Washington, Dc
contact info
Adam Joseph Wallstein
Dentons Us, LLP
contact info
Leslie A. Barry
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Perdue Foods LLC
Represented By
Danielle R Foley
Venable LLP
contact info
Lisa Jose Fales
Venable LLP
contact info
Paul Feinstein
Venable LLP
contact info
Andrew Thomas Hernacki
Venable LLP
contact info
Kristin M. Koger
Venable LLP
contact info
Defendant
Prestage Farms of South Carolina, LLC
Represented By
Daniel Patrick Johnston
Clausen Miller P.C.
contact info
Ilene M. Korey
Clausen Miller P.C.
contact info
William S. Cherry, III
Manning, Fulton & Skinner, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Express Markets Inc.
Represented By
Bruce D. Oakley
Hogan & Hartzon
contact info
Defendant
Prestage Farms, Inc.
Represented By
Daniel Patrick Johnston
Clausen Miller P.C.
contact info
Ilene M. Korey
Clausen Miller P.C.
contact info
William S. Cherry, III
Manning, Fulton & Skinner, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Prestage Foods, Inc.
Represented By
Daniel Patrick Johnston
Clausen Miller P.C.
contact info
Ilene M. Korey
Clausen Miller P.C.
contact info
William S. Cherry, III
Manning, Fulton & Skinner, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Cooper Farms, Inc.
Represented By
Jill Rogers Spiker
Carpenter Lipps LLP
contact info
Joshua Goldberg
Carpenter Lipps LLP
contact info
Defendant
Cargill Protein North America
Represented By
Matthew David Provance
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Britt Marie Miller
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Defendant
Cargill Inc
Represented By
Matthew David Provance
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Britt Marie Miller
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Defendant
Butterball LLC
Represented By
Christopher E Ondeck
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Todd J. Ohlms
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Colin R. Kass
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Defendant
Agri Stats Inc.
Represented By
William L Monts, III
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Bruce D. Oakley
Hogan & Hartzon
contact info
Defendant
The Hillshire Brands Company
Represented By
Rachel Johanna Adcox
Axinn
contact info
Tiffany Rider Rohrbaugh
Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider LLP
contact info
Jarod G Tyalor
Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider LLP
contact info
Allison Marie Vissichelli
Axinn, Veltrop, And Harkrider LLP
contact info
Jordan Tank
Lipe Lyons Murphy Nahrstadt & Pontikis
contact info
Lindsey Strang Aberg
Axinn Veltrop & Harkrider LLP
contact info
Kenina J Lee
Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tyson Foods Inc
Represented By
Rachel Johanna Adcox
Axinn
contact info
Tiffany Rider Rohrbaugh
Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider LLP
contact info
Jarod G Tyalor
Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider LLP
contact info
Allison Marie Vissichelli
Axinn, Veltrop, And Harkrider LLP
contact info
Jordan Tank
Lipe Lyons Murphy Nahrstadt & Pontikis
contact info
Lindsey Strang Aberg
Axinn Veltrop & Harkrider LLP
contact info
Kenina J Lee
Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
Represented By
Rachel Johanna Adcox
Axinn
contact info
Tiffany Rider Rohrbaugh
Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider LLP
contact info
Jarod G Tyalor
Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider LLP
contact info
Allison Marie Vissichelli
Axinn, Veltrop, And Harkrider LLP
contact info
Jordan Tank
Lipe Lyons Murphy Nahrstadt & Pontikis
contact info
Lindsey Strang Aberg
Axinn Veltrop & Harkrider LLP
contact info
Kenina J Lee
Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.
Represented By
Rachel Johanna Adcox
Axinn
contact info
Tiffany Rider Rohrbaugh
Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider LLP
contact info
Jarod G Tyalor
Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider LLP
contact info
Allison Marie Vissichelli
Axinn, Veltrop, And Harkrider LLP
contact info
Jordan Tank
Lipe Lyons Murphy Nahrstadt & Pontikis
contact info
Lindsey Strang Aberg
Axinn Veltrop & Harkrider LLP
contact info
Kenina J Lee
Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mayer Brown LLP
Plaintiff
Lipe, Lyons, Murphy, Nahrstadt & Pontikis
Plaintiff
Maxwell Farms, LLC
Plaintiff
Maxwell Farms of Indiana, Inc.
Plaintiff
Marsha K. Prestage
Plaintiff
Markel American Insurance Company
Plaintiff
Manning Fulton & Skinner, PA
Plaintiff
House of Raeford
Plaintiff
Vinson & Elkins LLP
Plaintiff
Miller, Canfield, Paddock & Stone, PLC
Plaintiff
Venable LLP
Plaintiff
Vedder Price, P.C.
222 N. LaSalle Street
Chicago, IL 60601
Plaintiff
Seeger & Weiss LLP
Plaintiff
Proskauer & Rose LLP
Plaintiff
Seaboard Corporation
Plaintiff
RSUI Indemnity Company
Plaintiff
Ron Prestage Family Trust
Plaintiff
Ronald W. Prestage
Plaintiff
Scott J. Prestage
Plaintiff
Scott Prestage Family Trust
Plaintiff
Clausen Miller P.C.
Ten South LaSalle Street
Chicago, IL 60603
Plaintiff
ACR Foster Intermediate Group LLC
Plaintiff
ACR Group Foster Holdings LLC
Plaintiff
ACR III Foster Holdings LLC
Plaintiff
ACR IV Foster Holdings LLC
Plaintiff
ANV Global Services, Inc.
Plaintiff
Agri Stats Omega Holding Co. LP
Plaintiff
Axinn Veltrop & Harkrider, L.L.P.
Plaintiff
Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider
Plaintiff
Axinn, Veltrop, & Harkrider LLP
Plaintiff
BB Kansas Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff
Baker & McKenzie LLP
Plaintiff
Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP
Plaintiff
Burford Capital Ltd.
Plaintiff
Carina Ventures LLC
Represented By
Colleen Ann Harrison
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Collin R. White
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Jennifer R. Scullion
Proskauer Rose Llp (new York)
contact info
Travis G. Edwards
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Sarah Lauren Jones
Boies Schiller & Flexner LLP
contact info
Michael Scott Mitchell
Demarco-Mitchell, PLLC
contact info
Scott E. Gant
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Dustin G. Graber
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Derek T. Ho
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Michael Thomas Layden
Croke Fairchild Duarte & Beres LLC
contact info
Christopher A Seeger
Seeger Weiss LLP
contact info
Mark C. Hansen
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Richard J. Prendergast
Croke, Fairchild, Duarte & Beres, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Carpenter Lipps LLP
Plaintiff
Foster Group Parent LLC
Plaintiff
John L. Prestage
Plaintiff
JOTS
Plaintiff
Houston Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff
Hormel Foods
Plaintiff
Hogan Lovells US LLP
Plaintiff
Greene Espel PLLP
Plaintiff
Freedom Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff
Jordan, Price, Wall, Gray, Jones & Carlton, PLLC
Plaintiff
Foster Group Acquisition LLC
Plaintiff
Falkenberg Ives LLP
Plaintiff
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
Plaintiff
Everest National Insurance Company
Plaintiff
Eimer Stahl LLP
Plaintiff
Dentons US LLP
Plaintiff
Colin R. Kass


Docket last updated: 02/03/2024 7:11 AM CST
Friday, July 21, 2023
1 1 61 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-30240540) filed by Carina Ventures LLC.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet re:1 Complaint by Carina Ventures LLC, filed. (Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION for Michael S. Mitchell to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carina Ventures LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/11/2023. (Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION for Scott E. Gant to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carina Ventures LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/11/2023. (Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION for Colleen A. Harrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carina Ventures LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/11/2023. (Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION for Christopher A. Seeger to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carina Ventures LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/11/2023. (Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
7 7 MOTION for Jennifer R. Scullion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carina Ventures LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/11/2023. (Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
8 8 MOTION for Sarah L. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carina Ventures LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/11/2023. (Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
9 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carina Ventures LLC, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
10 10 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/29/2023 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(AkeitaMichael, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
11 11 ORDER granting3 Motion for Michael S. Mitchell to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] .(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JacquelineMata, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER granting7 Motion for Jennifer R. Scullion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] .(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JacquelineMata, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER granting8 Motion for Sarah L. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] .(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JacquelineMata, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER granting5 Motion for Colleen A. Harrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] .(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JacquelineMata, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER granting6 Motion for Christopher A. Seeger to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] .(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JacquelineMata, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER granting4 Motion for Scott E. Gant to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] .(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JacquelineMata, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
17 17 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Carina Ventures LLC, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
18 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Emily S. Chow (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30340919) by Hormel Foods Corporation, Jennie-O Turkey Store, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/31/2023. (Chow, Emily) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
19 19 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed.(Harrell, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
20 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jill Rogers Spiker (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30341542) by Cooper Farms, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/1/2023. (Spiker, Jill) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
21 21 STIPULATION re: Stipulation and Agreement among the parties by Agri Stats, Inc., Butterball, LLC, Cargill Protein North America, Cargill, Inc., Carpenter Lipps LLP, Clausen Miller PC, Cooper Farms, Inc., Dentons US LLP, Eimer Stahl LLP, Express Markets Inc., Farbest Foods, Inc., Foster Farms LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Greene Espel PLLP, Hormel Foods Corporation, House of Raeford Farms, Inc., Jennie-O Turkey Store, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Prestage Farms of South Carolina, LLC, Prestage Farms, Inc., Prestage Foods, Inc., The Hillshire Brands Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., filed.(Harrell, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
22 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Adam J. Wallstein (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number CTXSDC-30343846) by Farbest Foods, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/1/2023. (Wallstein, Adam) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
23 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gaspare J. Bono (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30344105) by Farbest Foods, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/1/2023. (Bono, Gaspare) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
24 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Leslie A. Barry (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30344134) by Farbest Foods, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/1/2023. (Barry, Leslie) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
25 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jennie-O Turkey Store, Inc., filed.(Harrell, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
26 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hormel Foods Corporation, filed.(Harrell, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
27 27 ORDER Regarding21 Stipulation and Agreement. (1) Defendants shall file their motion to transfer venue on or before August 18, 2023; (2) Plaintiff will file any response to Defendants motion to transfer venue on or before September 15, 2023; (3) Defendants will file their reply in support of their motion to transfer venue on or before September 29, 2023; (4) Defendants deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is hereby stayed and extended until thirty (30) days after the Court has issued its decision on Defendants motion to transfer venue. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) Text Modified on 8/14/2023 (bthomas, 4). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
28 28 ORDER granting20 Motion for Jill Spiker to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] .(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
29 29 ORDER granting18 Motion for Emily Chow to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] .(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
30 30 ORDER granting24 Motion for Leslie Barry to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] .(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
31 31 ORDER granting23 Motion for Gaspare Bono to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] .(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
32 32 ORDER granting22 Motion for Adam Wallstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] .(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
33 33 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Britt M. Miller (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30347112) by Cargill Protein North America, Cargill, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/1/2023. (Miller, Britt) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
34 34 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kristin M. Koger (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number CTXSDC-30349998) by Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/5/2023. (Koger, Kristin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
35 35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew T. Hernacki (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30350228) by Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/5/2023. (Koger, Kristin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
36 36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Danielle R. Foley (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30350400) by Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/5/2023. (Koger, Kristin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
37 37 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lisa Jose Fales (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30350459) by Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/5/2023. (Koger, Kristin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
38 38 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul Feinstein (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30350510) by Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/5/2023. (Koger, Kristin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
39 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Craig S. Coleman (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30351652) by Hormel Foods Corporation, Jennie-O Turkey Store, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/5/2023. (Coleman, Craig) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
40 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cooper Farms, Inc., filed.(Spiker, Jill) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
41 41 ORDER granting33 Motion for Britt M. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] . (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr.) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
42 42 ORDER granting34 Motion for Kristin M. Koger to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] . (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr.) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
43 43 ORDER granting35 Motion for Andrew T. Hernacki to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] . (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr.) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
44 44 ORDER granting36 Motion for Danielle R. Foley to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] . (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr.) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
45 45 ORDER granting37 Motion for Lisa Jose Fales to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] . (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr.) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
46 46 ORDER granting38 Motion for Paul Feinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] . (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr.) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
47 47 ORDER granting39 Motion for Craig S. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] . (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr.) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
The above entitled action is assigned to United States District Judge George C. Hanks, Jr. Attorneys and Pro Se individuals are responsible for complying with this Court's rules and procedures, specifically, under Rule 6. Motion Practice. B. Pre-Motion Conferences Required for Particular Motions. Please download and review the individual practices of the assigned District Judge, located at: https://www.txs.uscourts.gov/sites/txs/files/GCH_Court_Procedures.pdf . (Note: If clicking the link does not work, you can copy/paste the url into your web browser address bar to view the procedures.) (bthomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
48 48 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William S. Cherry III (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30371644) by Prestage Farms of South Carolina, LLC, Prestage Farms, Inc., Prestage Foods, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/7/2023. (Cherry, William) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
49 49 ORDER granting48 Motion for William Cherry III to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] .(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
50 50 ORDER granting48 Motion for William Cherry III to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] .(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
51 51 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tiffany Rider Rohrbaugh (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30376388) by The Hillshire Brands Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2023. (Rohrbaugh, Tiffany) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
52 52 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rachel J. Adcox (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30376776) by The Hillshire Brands Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2023. (Rohrbaugh, Tiffany) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
53 53 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kenina J. Lee (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30376842) by The Hillshire Brands Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2023. (Rohrbaugh, Tiffany) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
54 54 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lindsey Strang Aberg (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30376874) by The Hillshire Brands Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2023. (Rohrbaugh, Tiffany) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
55 55 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Allison M. Vissichelli (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30376901) by The Hillshire Brands Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2023. (Rohrbaugh, Tiffany) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
56 56 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by House of Raeford Farms, Inc., filed.(Burch, Alexander) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
57 57 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Hillshire Brands Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., filed.(Rohrbaugh, Tiffany) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
58 58 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Farbest Foods, Inc., filed.(Bono, Gaspare) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
59 59 ORDER granting54 Motion for Lindsey Strang Aberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] .(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
60 60 ORDER granting52 Motion for Rache Adcox to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] .(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
61 61 ORDER granting53 Motion for Kenina Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] .(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
62 62 ORDER granting51 Motion for Tiffany Rider Rohrbaugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] .(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
63 63 ORDER granting55 Motion for Allison Vissichelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] .(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
64 64 MOTION to Transfer Case to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Case to the Northern Dist of Illinois by Agri Stats, Inc., Butterball, LLC, Cargill Protein North America, Cargill, Inc., Cooper Farms, Inc., Express Markets Inc., Farbest Foods, Inc., Foster Farms LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Hormel Foods Corporation, House of Raeford Farms, Inc., Jennie-O Turkey Store, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Prestage Farms of South Carolina, LLC, Prestage Farms, Inc., Prestage Foods, Inc., The Hillshire Brands Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2023.(Harrell, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
65 65 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for H. Weldon Jones, III (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30380147) by House of Raeford Farms, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2023. (Burch, Alexander) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
66 66 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Henry W. Jones, Jr. (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30380272) by House of Raeford Farms, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2023. (Burch, Alexander) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
67 67 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Foster Farms LLC, Foster Poultry Farms identifying Foster Group Acquisition LLC, Foster Group Parent LLC, ACR Foster Intermediate Group LLC, ACR Group Foster Holdings LLC, ACR III Foster Holdings LLC, ACR IV Foster Holdings LLC as Corporate Parent, filed.(Gray, Kathryne) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
68 68 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Prestage Farms of South Carolina, LLC, Prestage Farms, Inc., Prestage Foods, Inc., filed.(Cherry, William) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
69 69 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cargill Protein North America, Cargill, Inc., filed.(Miller, Britt) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
70 70 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Farbest Foods, Inc., filed.(Bono, Gaspare) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
71 71 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Colin R. Kass (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30388771) by Butterball, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/11/2023. (Kass, Colin) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
72 72 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher E. Ondeck (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30388786) by Butterball, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/11/2023. (Ondeck, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
73 73 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cooper Farms, Inc., filed.(Spiker, Jill) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
74 74 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, filed.(Fales, Lisa) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
75 75 ORDER granting65 Motion for H. Weldon Jones, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] .(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
76 76 ORDER granting66 Motion for Henry W Jones, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] .(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
77 77 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Hormel Foods Corporation, Jennie-O Turkey Store, Inc., filed.(Harrell, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
78 78 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Oral Pottinger (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-30394382) by Foster Farms LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/12/2023. (Gray, Kathryne) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
80 80 ORDER granting71 Motion for Colin Kass to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] .(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
81 81 ORDER granting72 Motion for Christopher E. Ondeck to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] .(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(KimberlyPicota, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
79 79 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Hillshire Brands Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., filed.(Rohrbaugh, Tiffany) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
82 82 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Butterball, LLC, filed.(Ondeck, Christopher) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
83 83 ORDER granting78 Motion for Oral Pottinger to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] . (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr.) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
84 84 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Butterball, LLC served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
85 85 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation served on 7/25/2023, answer due 9/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
86 86 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Cargill, Inc. served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
87 87 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Foster Farms LLC served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
88 88 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Foster Poultry Farms served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
89 89 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Farbest Foods, Inc. served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
90 90 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Prestage Foods, Inc. served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
91 91 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Prestage Farms, Inc. served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
92 92 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Prestage Farms of South Carolina, LLC served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
93 93 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Cooper Farms, Inc. served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
94 94 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Perdue Farms, Inc. served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
95 95 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Perdue Foods LLC served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
96 96 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Hormel Foods Corporation served on 7/25/2023; Jennie-O Turkey Store, Inc. served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
97 97 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to House of Raeford Farms, Inc. served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
98 98 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Tyson Foods, Inc. served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
99 99 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Tyson Fresh Meats Inc. served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
100 100 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
101 101 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to The Hillshire Brands Company served on 7/25/2023, answer due 9/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
102 102 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Agri Stats, Inc. served on 7/25/2023; Express Markets Inc. served on 7/25/2023, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
103 103 RESPONSE in Opposition to64 MOTION to Transfer Case to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Case to the Northern Dist of Illinois, filed by Carina Ventures LLC.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, September 29, 2023
104 104 REPLY in Support of64 MOTION to Transfer Case to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Case to the Northern Dist of Illinois, filed by Agri Stats, Inc., Butterball, LLC, Cargill Protein North America, Cargill, Inc., Cooper Farms, Inc., Express Markets Inc., Farbest Foods, Inc., Foster Farms LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Hormel Foods Corporation, House of Raeford Farms, Inc., Jennie-O Turkey Store, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Prestage Farms of South Carolina, LLC, Prestage Farms, Inc., Prestage Foods, Inc., The Hillshire Brands Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Harrell, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
105 105 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Redline from Original Complaint
Monday, October 16, 2023
106 106 RESPONSE to105 REQUEST for pre-motion conference filed by Agri Stats, Inc., Butterball, LLC, Cargill Protein North America, Cargill, Inc., Cooper Farms, Inc., Express Markets Inc., Farbest Foods, Inc., Foster Farms LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Hormel Foods Corporation, House of Raeford Farms, Inc., Jennie-O Turkey Store, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Prestage Farms of South Carolina, LLC, Prestage Farms, Inc., Prestage Foods, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc..(Coleman, Craig) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, October 19, 2023
107 107 NOTICE by Carina Ventures LLC, filed. (Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
108 108 NOTICE of Setting re:105 REQUEST for pre-motion conference,64 MOTION to Transfer Case to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Case to the Northern Dist of Illinois. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2023 at 11:00 AM by video before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. (ByronThomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
109 109 Joint MOTION for Continuance of Joint Motion to Continue Initial Pre-Trial and Scheduling Conference by Hormel Foods Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/13/2023. (Harrell, Daniel) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
110 110 ORDER granting109 Joint MOTION for Continuance of the Initial Pre-Trial and Scheduling Conference. (Initial Conference reset for 1/3/2024 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified. (ByronThomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
111 111 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George C Hanks, Jr. PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE and MOTION HEARING held on 11/30/2023 re:105 REQUEST for pre-motion conference. The Court gave Plaintiff leave to amend its complaint. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint on or before December 8, 2023. The parties will continue conducting discovery and preparing the case for trial while Defendants motion to transfer the case to the Northern District of Illinois is pending. Appearances: Colleen A. Harrison, Jennifer R Scullion, Scott E. Gant, Britt M Miller, Jill Spiker, Gaspare J. Bono, Leslie Barry, Craig Coleman, Danielle R. Foley, William S. Cherry, III, Allison M Vissichelli. Stephen Chuk. (ERO: yes), filed. (ByronThomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
112 112 80 pgs AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Carina Ventures LLC.(Mitchell, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
113 113 NOTICE of Setting re:64 MOTION to Transfer Case to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Case to the Northern Dist of Illinois. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2023 at 12:15 PM by video before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. (ByronThomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
114 114 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George C Hanks, Jr. MOTION HEARING held on 12/15/2023. The Court held a motion hearing. Defendants motion to transfer this case to the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division Dkt.64 is GRANTED. Appearances: Colleen A. Harrison, Scott E Gant, Stephen Chuk, Rachel Lamorte, Catherine Medvene, Alexander Burch, Jill Spiker, Leslie Barry, Craig Coleman, Alexander D Burch, H. Weldon Jones, III, Danielle R. Foley, William S. Cherry, III, Allison M Vissichelli, Olga Fleysh.(ERO: yes), filed. (ByronThomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
115 115 5 pgs ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division; granting64 MOTION to Transfer Case. Case terminated on December 15, 2023.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JacquelineMata, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division. Case transferred electronically, filed. (JacquelineMata, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
116 116 RECEIVED from Texas Southern; Case Number 4:23-cv-02685. (ph, )
Related: [-]