New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 15
Judge:John P Mastando III
Case #: 1:23-bk-12030
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2023
Terminated:Jun 10, 2024

Debtor
China Aoyuan Group Limited

,
Represented By
Christopher J. Hunker
Linklaters LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Foreign Representative
Chen Zhi Bin and David Wan
Represented By
Christopher J. Hunker
Linklaters LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 46 minutes ago
Monday, June 10, 2024
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 06/10 11:03 AM
Case Closed. (Suarez, Aurea)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
25 25 2 pgs order Order, Closing Chapter 15 Case Fri 06/07 2:42 PM
Order Closing Chapter 15 Cases signed on 6/7/2024. Related [+] (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-] 22
Thursday, April 04, 2024
24 24 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 04/04 10:44 AM
Affidavit of Service of Kong Ying Jie Kenneth Related [+] Filed by Christopher J. Hunker on behalf of Chen Zhi Bin and David Wan. (Hunker, Christopher)
Related: [-] 22
23 23 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 04/04 10:43 AM
Affidavit of Service of Shauin Wang Related [+] Filed by Christopher J. Hunker on behalf of Chen Zhi Bin and David Wan. (Hunker, Christopher)
Related: [-] 22
Monday, April 01, 2024
22 22 12 pgs notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Mon 04/01 9:48 AM
Notice of Presentment of Foreign Representatives (i) Final Report and (ii) Motion for an Order Closing the Chapter 15 Cases filed by Christopher J. Hunker on behalf of Chen Zhi Bin and David Wan. with presentment to be held on 5/8/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (JPM) Objections due by 5/3/2024, (Hunker, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
21 21 27 pgs misc Transcript Fri 02/02 9:41 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 01/11/24 at 11:01 A.M. RE: Order Signed On 12/22/2023 Scheduling A Hearing On Chapter 15 Petition And Related Relief And Specifying Form And Manner Of Services Of Notice Related [+]. With Hearing To Be Held On 1/11/2024 At 11:00 Am At Courtroom 501 (Jpm) (Rodriguez- Castillo, Maria) Etc. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 4/29/2024. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Reliable.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 2/6/2024. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 2/20/2024. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 3/1/2024. Transcript access will be restricted through 4/29/2024. (Su, Kevin)
Related: [-] 715 ,7 ,6 ,3 ,9 ,5 ,4
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
20 20 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 01/17 9:11 PM
Affidavit of Service of Christopher J. Hunker Related [+] Filed by Christopher J. Hunker on behalf of China Aoyuan Group Limited, Chen Zhi Bin and David Wan. (Hunker, Christopher)
Related: [-] 17 ,16 ,18
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
19 19 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 01/16 10:30 AM
Affidavit of Service of Constandino Sofillas Related [+] Filed by Christopher J. Hunker on behalf of China Aoyuan Group Limited, Chen Zhi Bin and David Wan. (Hunker, Christopher)
Related: [-] 17 ,16 ,18
Thursday, January 11, 2024
18 18 11 pgs order Order Re: Recognition of the Foreign Proceeding Thu 01/11 4:57 PM
Order signed on 1/11/2024 Granting Verified Petition Under Chapter 15 for Recognition of Foreign Main Proceedings and Related Relief. Related [+] (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-] 3 ,1
17 17 160 pgs ans Declaration Thu 01/11 6:58 AM
Declaration / Supplemental Declaration of Andrew Payne as Hong Kong Counsel in Support of Verified Petition under Chapter 15 for Recognition of Foreign Main Proceedings and Related Relief filed by Christopher J. Hunker on behalf of China Aoyuan Group Limited, Chen Zhi Bin and David Wan. (Hunker, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
16 16 3 pgs notice Notice, Agenda Wed 01/10 1:45 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on January 11, 2024 at 11:00 A.M. Related [+] Filed by Christopher J. Hunker on behalf of China Aoyuan Group Limited, Chen Zhi Bin and David Wan. with hearing to be held on 1/11/2024 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (JPM) (Hunker, Christopher)
Related: [-] 15 ,6 ,3 ,9 ,5 ,4
Monday, January 08, 2024
15 15 27 pgs misc Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Mon 01/08 6:22 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 with Respect to Verified Petition under Chapter 15 for Recognition of Foreign Main Proceedings and Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Christopher J. Hunker on behalf of China Aoyuan Group Limited, Chen Zhi Bin and David Wan. (Hunker, Christopher)
Related: [-] 6 ,3 ,9 ,5 ,4
Friday, January 05, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order So Ordered Stipulation Fri 01/05 6:56 PM
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 1/5/2024 Re: Granting Virtual Appearances. Related [+] (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-] 12
13 13 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 01/05 4:03 PM
Affidavit of Service of Patrick Canavan Related [+] Filed by Christopher J. Hunker on behalf of China Aoyuan Group Limited, Chen Zhi Bin and David Wan. (Hunker, Christopher)
Related: [-] 6 ,3 ,1 ,5 ,4
12 12 2 pgs misc Letter Fri 01/05 2:26 PM
Letter Requesting Virtual Appearances Filed by Christopher J. Hunker on behalf of China Aoyuan Group Limited, Chen Zhi Bin and David Wan. with hearing to be held on 1/11/2024 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (JPM) (Hunker, Christopher)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs misc Affidavit Fri 01/05 10:50 AM
Affidavit of Publication by Wayne Sidor Filed by Christopher J. Hunker on behalf of China Aoyuan Group Limited, Chen Zhi Bin and David Wan. (Hunker, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
10 10 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 01/03 10:40 AM
Affidavit of Service of Constandino Sofillas Related [+] Filed by Christopher J. Hunker on behalf of China Aoyuan Group Limited, Chen Zhi Bin and David Wan. (Hunker, Christopher)
Related: [-] 6 ,3 ,8 ,9 ,1 ,5 ,4
Friday, December 22, 2023
9 9 5 pgs order Motion, Approve Fri 12/22 3:10 PM
Order signed on 12/22/2023 Scheduling a Hearing on Chapter 15 Petition and Related Relief and Specifying Form and Manner of Service of Notice Related [+]. With hearing to be held on 1/11/2024 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (JPM) (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-] 7
8 8 4 pgs order Motion, Joint Administration Fri 12/22 2:53 PM
Order signed on 12/22/2023 Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 15 Cases And Granting Related Relief. Related [+] . (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-] 2
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
7 7 17 pgs motion Motion, Approve Wed 12/20 4:52 PM
Motion to Approve / Motion for Entry of an Order Scheduling a Hearing on Chapter 15 Petitions for Recognition and Related Relief and Specifying Form and Manner of Service of Notice filed by Christopher J. Hunker on behalf of China Aoyuan Group Limited, Chen Zhi Bin and David Wan. (Hunker, Christopher)
Related: [-]
6 6 28 pgs ans Declaration Wed 12/20 4:45 PM
Declaration of Andrew Payne as Hong Kong Counsel in Support of Verified Petition Under Chapter 15 for Recognition of Foreign Main Proceedings and Related Relief filed by Christopher J. Hunker on behalf of China Aoyuan Group Limited, Chen Zhi Bin and David Wan. (Hunker, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A1 - Aoyuan Originating Summons
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit A2 - Add Hero Originating Summons
Att: 3 38 pgs Exhibit B1 - Aoyuan Practice Statement Letter
Att: 4 24 pgs Exhibit B2 - Add Hero Practice Statement Letter
Att: 5 206 pgs Exhibit C1 - Aoyuan Convening Order
Att: 6 112 pgs Exhibit C2 - Add Hero Convening Order
Att: 7 1623 pgs Exhibit D1 - Aoyuan Explanatory Statement
Att: 8 945 pgs Exhibit D2 - Supplement to the Aoyuan Explanatory Statement
Att: 9 1516 pgs Exhibit D3 - Add Hero Explanatory Statement
Att: 10 865 pgs Exhibit D4 - Supplement to the Add Hero Explanatory Statement
5 5 34 pgs ans Declaration Wed 12/20 4:34 PM
Declaration of Chen Zhi Bin in Support of the Verified Petition Under Chapter 15 for (I) Recognition of a Foreign Main Proceeding, (II) Recognition of Foreign Representatives and (III) Related Relief with Respect to Add Hero Holdings Limited filed by Christopher J. Hunker on behalf of China Aoyuan Group Limited, Chen Zhi Bin and David Wan. (Hunker, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 125 pgs Exhibit A - Restructuring Support Agreement
Att: 2 8 pgs Exhibit B - Board Resolution
4 4 35 pgs ans Declaration Wed 12/20 4:30 PM
Declaration of Chen Zhi Bin in Support of the Verified Petition Under Chapter 15 for (I) Recognition of a Foreign Main Proceeding, (II) Recognition of Foreign Representatives and (III) Related Relief with Respect to China Aoyuan Group Limited filed by Christopher J. Hunker on behalf of China Aoyuan Group Limited, Chen Zhi Bin and David Wan. (Hunker, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 125 pgs Exhibit A - Restructuring Support Agreement
Att: 2 12 pgs Exhibit B - Board Resolution
3 3 78 pgs ans Statement Wed 12/20 4:17 PM
Statement / Verified Petition Under Chapter 15 for Recognition of Foreign Main Proceedings and Related Relief filed by Christopher J. Hunker on behalf of China Aoyuan Group Limited, Chen Zhi Bin and David Wan. (Hunker, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 11 pgs motion Motion, Joint Administration Wed 12/20 4:08 PM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by Christopher J. Hunker on behalf of China Aoyuan Group Limited, Chen Zhi Bin and David Wan. (Hunker, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 28 pgs misc Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding (Chapter 15) Wed 12/20 11:16 AM
Chapter 15 Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding . Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Christopher J. Hunker of Linklaters LLP on behalf of China Aoyuan Group Limited, Christopher J. Hunker. (Hunker, Christopher)
Related: [-]
misc Add Judge Wed 12/20 11:34 AM
Judge John P. Mastando III added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]