New York Southern District Court
Judge:Margaret M Garnett
Case #: 1:23-cv-11004
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12111 Americans with Disabilities Act - Employment
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jun 17, 2024 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Jewish Board of Family and Children's Services, Inc.
463 7th Avenue 18th Floor
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
Caterina Catalano
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Mary Augusta Smith
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Vanessa Menjivar
1039 Hall Place Apt. 2
Bronx, NY 10459
Represented By
Greg Mansell
Mansell Law - Greg Mansell
contact info
Carrie Dyer
Mansell Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
22 22 misc Letter Fri 04/25 3:16 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Margaret M. Garnett from Carrie J. Dyer Elrod dated April 25, 2025 re: Private Mediation. Document filed by Vanessa Menjivar..(Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Fri 04/25 11:08 AM
ORDER granting19 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document: The requested conference was held on March 19, 2025. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Margaret M. Garnett)(Text Only Order) (Garnett, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
minutes Status Conference Wed 03/19 9:52 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Margaret M. Garnett: Status Conference held on 3/19/2025. Counsel Greg Mansell present for Plaintiff. Counsel Mary Smith present for Defendant. (Court Reporter Nicole DiMasi) (kv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
20 20 respm Response to Motion Tue 03/11 1:50 PM
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Margaret M. Garnett from Carrie J. Dyer Elrod dated 03/11/2025 re:19 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Pre-Motion Letter Outlining Its Motion for Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Margaret M. Garnett from Mary A. Smith dated March 5, 2025. . Document filed by Vanessa Menjivar..(Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
19 19 motion Leave to File Document Wed 03/05 1:33 PM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Pre-Motion Letter Outlining Its Motion for Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Margaret M. Garnett from Mary A. Smith dated March 5, 2025. Document filed by Jewish Board of Family and Children's Services, Inc...(Smith, Mary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
18 18 order Order Wed 12/04 1:26 PM
ORDER As discussed on the record at the December 4, 2024 conference in this matter, the deadline for the completion of all discovery in this case is now February 20, 2025. The Court will hold a post-discovery conference on Wednesday, March 19, 2025 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 906 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, NY. The parties are referred to the Court's Individual Rules for instructions on the correspondence to be submitted between the close of discovery and the March 19 conference. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Margaret M. Garnett) (Text Only Order) (Garnett, Margaret)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Wed 12/04 1:20 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Margaret M. Garnett: Status Conference held on 12/4/2024. Counsel Carrie Dyer present for Plaintiff. Counsel Mary Smith and Caterina Catalano present for Defendant. (Court Reporter Steven Greenblum) (kv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 11/27 10:32 AM
ORDER terminating16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; terminating16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The parties seek an extension of greater than 80 days for the completion of fact discovery. During the Initial Pretrial Conference on July 3, 2024, the Court warned counsel that because ample time was being given to conduct fact discovery, requests to extend the discovery deadline were not likely to be granted. The parties have not provided a sufficient explanation as to why a significant extension of fact discovery is needed. On this record alone, the Court will not grant a more than 80-day extension. Counsel for both parties are ordered to appear for a video conference via Microsoft Teams to discuss their request for an extension on Wednesday, December 4, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. The information for the Teams meeting is below. Counsel are refened to Rule II(A)(2) of the Court's Individual Rules & Practices concerning video conferences. Teams Meeting ID: 229 204 341132 // Passcode: JR2wx2LB. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Dkt. No. 16. SO ORDERED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 11/27/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 11/27 10:33 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/4/2024 at 01:00 PM before Judge Margaret M. Garnett. (mml)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
16 16 motion Extension of Time Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 11/26 4:32 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Margaret M. Garnett from Mary A. Smith dated November 26, 2024., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Margaret M. Garnett from Mary A. Smith dated November 26, 2024. Document filed by Jewish Board of Family and Children's Services, Inc...(Catalano, Caterina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
15 15 order Protective Order Thu 10/03 2:46 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 10/3/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
14 14 misc Proposed Protective Order Wed 10/02 9:02 AM
PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Vanessa Menjivar..(Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
13 13 order Scheduling Order Tue 07/09 2:31 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Deposition due by 12/1/2024. Expert Deposition due by 2/20/2025. Fact Discovery due by 12/1/2024. Expert Discovery due by 2/20/2025. Status Conference set for 1/8/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Margaret M. Garnett. Counsel for the patties have conferred and their best estimate of the length of trial is 3-4 days. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 7/9/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 07/03 11:59 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Margaret M. Garnett: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/3/2024. Counsel Greg Mansell present for Plaintiff. Counsel Caterina Catalano present for Defendant. (Court Reporter Alena Lynch) (kv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
12 12 misc Letter Wed 06/26 10:23 AM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Margaret M. Garnett from Carrie J. Dyer Elrod dated June 26, 2024 re: Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Vanessa Menjivar..(Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Civil Case Management Plan
Thursday, May 23, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 05/23 5:53 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/3/2024 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Margaret M. Garnett. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 5/23/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Fri 03/29 11:41 AM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 5/23/2024 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(sge)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Tue 03/19 11:01 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 4/18/2024.(sge)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
9 9 6 pgs order Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation Mon 02/26 12:14 PM
ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 3/11/2024. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (rpr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/21 4:27 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Greg Mansell on behalf of Vanessa Menjivar..(Mansell, Greg)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Wed 02/21 9:27 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Margaret M. Garnett. Judge Jennifer L. Rochon is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/20 11:18 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caterina Catalano on behalf of Jewish Board of Family and Children's Services, Inc...(Catalano, Caterina)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/20 11:09 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Jewish Board of Family and Children's Services, Inc...(Smith, Mary)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/20 11:08 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Jewish Board of Family and Children's Services, Inc...(Smith, Mary)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/20 11:05 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary Augusta Smith on behalf of Jewish Board of Family and Children's Services, Inc...(Smith, Mary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 12/21 12:00 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 12/21 9:13 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jewish Board of Family and Children's Services, Inc. waiver sent on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. Document filed by Vanessa Menjivar..(Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 12/21 10:30 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 12/21 10:30 AM
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 12/21 10:30 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 12/21 10:30 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Carrie Dyer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $9,999,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $500,000; the County code has been modified to Bronx;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Thu 12/21 10:30 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Carrie Dyer to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/20 12:21 PM
COMPLAINT against Jewish Board of Family and Children's Services, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28718989)Document filed by Vanessa Menjivar..(Dyer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet