Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Case #: 1:23-ap-05209
Nature of Suit1 null
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Neu Benefits, LLC, Defendant
Represented By
Neu Benefits, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Onviant Insurance Agency Inc., Defendant
Represented By
Onviant Insurance Agency Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Onviant LLC, Defendant
Represented By
Onviant LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Aliera LT, LLC, as Liquidating Trustee for The Aliera Companies, Inc. D/B/A Aliera Healthcare Inc., ET AL,, Plaintiff
3333 Piedmont Road, NE Suite 2500 Attn.: John D. Elrod
Atlanta, GA 30305
Represented By
John D. Elrod
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Allison J. McGregor
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Neil F. Luria, in his capacity as the Trustee of the Sharity Ministries, Inc. Liquidating Trust, Plaintiff
3333 Piedmont Road, NE Suite 2500 Attn.: John D. Elrod
Atlanta, GA 30305
Represented By
John D. Elrod
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Allison J. McGregor
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
26 26 misc Stipulation Tue 04/01 4:14 PM
Amended Joint Stipulation Extending Mediation Procedure Deadlines Filed by John D. Elrod on behalf of Aliera LT, LLC, as Liquidating Trustee for The Aliera Companies, Inc. D/B/A Aliera Healthcare Inc., ET AL,, Neil F. Luria, in his capacity as the Trustee of the Sharity Ministries, Inc. Liquidating Trust. Related [+] (Elrod, John)Modified on 4/2/2025 (yl)
Related: [-] 16 ,23
Sunday, February 16, 2025
25 25 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Mon 02/17 12:42 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Notice Date 02/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
24 24 3 pgs notice Order and Notice Fri 02/14 3:30 PM
Order and Notice on Omnibus Status Hearing. Service by BNC. Hearing to be held on 3/24/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1404, Atlanta. [Review order for virtual hearing information.] Entered on 2/14/2025. Related [+] (yl)
Related: [-] 23
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
23 23 misc Stipulation Wed 01/29 11:42 AM
Joint Stipulation Extending Mediation Procedure Deadlines Filed by John D. Elrod on behalf of Aliera LT, LLC, as Liquidating Trustee for The Aliera Companies, Inc. D/B/A Aliera Healthcare Inc., ET AL,, Neil F. Luria, in his capacity as the Trustee of the Sharity Ministries, Inc. Liquidating Trust. Related [+] (Elrod, John)
Related: [-] 16
Thursday, November 07, 2024
22 22 answer None Thu 11/07 3:06 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Robert C Furr on behalf of Neu Benefits, LLC, Onviant Insurance Agency Inc., Onviant LLC. Related [+] (Furr, Robert)
Related: [-] 9
Saturday, October 26, 2024
21 21 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Dismiss Sun 10/27 12:49 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Dismiss Notice Date 10/26/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
20 20 order Dismiss, Motion to Thu 10/24 2:22 PM
Order ion Motion to Dismiss. ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss Counts VII, VIII, and IX of the Amended Complaint for lack of standing, the in pari delicto defense and failure to state a claim is denied; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss Counts I, II, III, IV, and V of the Amended Complaint for lack of standing is denied; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Onviants and OIAs Motion to Dismiss Count VI for lack of standing is denied, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Onviants and OIAs Motion to Dismiss Count VI for failure to state a claim is granted, such that Count VI against Onviant and OIA is dismissed with prejudice; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Neu Benefits Motion to Dismiss Count VI for lack of standing, and in the alternative for failure to state a claim, is granted, such that Count VI against Neu Benefits is dismissed with prejudice; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion for More Definite Statement is denied. Related [+] Service by BNC. Entered on 10/24/2024. (yl)
Related: [-] 10
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
19 19 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/15 12:55 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Notice Date 08/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 08/12 4:30 PM
Order GRANTING Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason S. Rigoli Esq. on behalf of Neu Benefits, LLC Related [+] Service by BNC. Entered on 8/12/2024. (jlc)
Related: [-] 17
Monday, August 05, 2024
17 17 motion 10-Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/08 8:43 AM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, USDC receipt # 100012494, (Document is restricted and can only be viewed by Court staff.) filed by Jason S. Rigoli Esq. on behalf of Neu Benefits, LLC . (klt)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
16 16 order Mediation, Motion for Fri 07/05 9:51 AM
Order Establishing Mediation Procedures. Related [+] Service by BNC. Entered on 7/5/2024. (ngs)
Related: [-] 13
Thursday, May 30, 2024
15 15 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Fri 05/31 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Notice Date 05/30/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
14 14 2 pgs notice Order and Notice Tue 05/28 9:29 AM
Order and Notice of Status Conference. Service by BNC. Hearing to be held on 6/25/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1404, Atlanta. [Review order for virtual hearing information.] Entered on 5/28/2024. Related [+] (mrw)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, May 24, 2024
13 13 motion Mediation, Motion for Fri 05/24 2:13 PM
Motion for Mediation / Motion to Establish Mediation Procedures filed by John D. Elrod on behalf of Aliera LT, LLC, as Liquidating Trustee for The Aliera Companies, Inc. D/B/A Aliera Healthcare Inc., ET AL,, Neil F. Luria, in his capacity as the Trustee of the Sharity Ministries, Inc. Liquidating Trust. Hearing to be held on 6/25/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1404, Atlanta. (Elrod, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
12 12 answer Reply to Response Fri 05/10 7:03 PM
Defendants Reply To Plaintiffs Response To Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint And Memorandum Of Law filed by Robert C Furr on behalf of Neu Benefits, LLC, Onviant Insurance Agency Inc., Onviant LLC. Related [+](Furr, Robert) Modified on 5/13/2024 (jlc)
Related: [-] 11
Friday, April 26, 2024
11 11 answer Response to Motion Fri 04/26 3:11 PM
Plaintiffs Response And Memorandum Of Law In Opposition To Defendants Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint filed by John D. Elrod on behalf of Aliera LT, LLC, as Liquidating Trustee for The Aliera Companies, Inc. D/B/A Aliera Healthcare Inc., ET AL,, Neil F. Luria, in his capacity as the Trustee of the Sharity Ministries, Inc. Liquidating Trust. Related [+](Elrod, John) Modified on 4/29/2024 (jlc)
Related: [-] 10
Friday, April 12, 2024
10 10 motion Dismiss, Motion to Fri 04/12 4:15 PM
Motion to Dismiss Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Robert C Furr on behalf of Neu Benefits, LLC, Onviant Insurance Agency Inc., Onviant LLC. (Furr, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/29 6:58 PM
Amended Complaint filed by John D. Elrod on behalf of Aliera LT, LLC, as Liquidating Trustee for The Aliera Companies, Inc. D/B/A Aliera Healthcare Inc., ET AL,, Neil F. Luria, in his capacity as the Trustee of the Sharity Ministries, Inc. Liquidating Trust. Related [+] (Elrod, John)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Att: 7 Exhibit G
Att: 8 Exhibit H
Friday, March 15, 2024
8 8 misc Stipulation Fri 03/15 11:11 AM
Joint Stipulation Extending Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Filed by John D. Elrod on behalf of Aliera LT, LLC, as Liquidating Trustee for The Aliera Companies, Inc. D/B/A Aliera Healthcare Inc., ET AL,, Neil F. Luria, in his capacity as the Trustee of the Sharity Ministries, Inc. Liquidating Trust. Related [+] (Elrod, John)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, March 08, 2024
7 7 motion Dismiss, Motion to Fri 03/08 4:46 PM
Motion to Dismiss Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Robert C Furr on behalf of Neu Benefits, LLC, Onviant Insurance Agency Inc., Onviant LLC. Related [+] (Furr, Robert)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/13 11:43 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Robert C Furr on behalf of Neu Benefits, LLC, Onviant Insurance Agency Inc., Onviant LLC. (Furr, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
5 5 misc Stipulation Wed 02/07 10:07 AM
Joint Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Filed by John D. Elrod on behalf of Aliera LT, LLC, as Liquidating Trustee for The Aliera Companies, Inc. D/B/A Aliera Healthcare Inc., ET AL,, Neil F. Luria, in his capacity as the Trustee of the Sharity Ministries, Inc. Liquidating Trust. Related [+] (Elrod, John)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Tue 02/06 11:41 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint filed by John D. Elrod on behalf of Aliera LT, LLC, as Liquidating Trustee for The Aliera Companies, Inc. D/B/A Aliera Healthcare Inc., ET AL,, Neil F. Luria, in his capacity as the Trustee of the Sharity Ministries, Inc. Liquidating Trust. Related [+] (Elrod, John)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
Monday, January 08, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Issued (PAPER) Mon 01/08 12:32 PM
Summons for Neu Benefits, LLC Issued on 1/8/2024, Answer due on 2/7/2024; Onviant Insurance Agency Inc. Issued on 1/8/2024, Answer due on 2/7/2024; Onviant LLC Issued on 1/8/2024, Answer due on 2/7/2024 (jlc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
misc 06-Payment of Filing Fee on Adversary Proceeding Tue 01/02 10:49 AM
Payment of Filing Fees on Adversary Proceeding Filed by John D. Elrod on behalf of Aliera LT, LLC, as Liquidating Trustee for The Aliera Companies, Inc. D/B/A Aliera Healthcare Inc., ET AL,, Neil F. Luria, in his capacity as the Trustee of the Sharity Ministries, Inc. Liquidating Trust. Related [+] (Elrod, John)
Related: [-] 1
crditcrd Autodocket of Credit Card Tue 01/02 10:50 AM
Receipt of Payment of Filing Fee on Adversary Proceeding([LINK 23-05209 jrs] ) [misc,232] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt Number A60238873. Fee Amount 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
2 2 notice Notice of Deficiency - Adversary Proceeding Wed 12/27 11:42 AM
Notice of deficient filing re: Complaint against Neu Benefits, LLC, Onviant Insurance Agency Inc., Onviant LLC - Missing Fee, $350.00 . Service by BNC. Related [+] (jlc)
Related: [-] 1
court Notice of Incorrect Docket Entry Wed 12/27 12:28 PM
Notice that Document Number 2 - Notice of deficient filing re: Complaint against Neu Benefits, LLC, Onviant Insurance Agency Inc., Onviant LLC - Missing Fee, $350.00 ., was entered in error. Related [+] (jlc)
Related: [-] 2
court Miscellaneous Deficiencies Wed 12/27 12:28 PM
Notice that the Complaint against Neu Benefits, LLC, Onviant Insurance Agency Inc., Onviant LLC , filed by John Elrod is incorrect or deficient in the following manner: Missing Fee, $350.00 Related [+] (jlc)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/20 11:29 AM
Complaint against Neu Benefits, LLC, Onviant Insurance Agency Inc., Onviant LLC , 14 Related [+] 01 (Determination of removed claim or cause) Filed by Aliera LT, LLC, as Liquidating Trustee for The Aliera Companies, Inc. D/B/A Aliera Healthcare Inc., ET AL,, Neil F. Luria, in his capacity as the Trustee of the Sharity Ministries, Inc. Liquidating Trust (Elrod, John)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Neu Benefits Call Center Agreement
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Onviant Call Center Agreement
Att: 3 Exhibit C - OIA Call Center Agreement
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Neu Benefits Transfers
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Onviant Transfers
Att: 6 Exhibit F - OIA Transfers