Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Lynne A Sitarski
Case #: 2:23-cv-05053
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2023
Re-opened:May 01, 2025
Terminated:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Monday Jun 17, 2024 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant
BRETT SABOL PLUMBING & HEATING, LLC
Represented By
ALEXANDER V. BATOFF
Stevens & Lee
contact info
BRANDON SHABY SHEMTOB
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Defendant
BRETT T. SABOL
Represented By
ALEXANDER V. BATOFF
Stevens & Lee
contact info
BRANDON SHABY SHEMTOB
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Plaintiff
NATHAN CLARY
Represented By
SCOTT M. POLLINS
Pollins Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
26 26 1 pgs order Order Fri 05/02 10:56 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S UNCONTESTED REQUEST FOR THIS COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION UNTIL 12/15/2025 IS GRANTED. THE COURT SPECIFICALLY RETAINS JURISDICTION UNTIL 12/15/2025. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 5/2/2025. 5/2/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 08/15 1:33 PM
ORDER THAT THE MATTER IS MARKED SETTLED AND CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. THIS COURT SPECIFICALLY RETAINS JURISDICTION UNTIL 6/15/2025. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 8/15/2024. 8/15/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
Related: [-]
24 24 minutes Settlement Conference Thu 08/15 1:31 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS. Settlement Conference via video held on 8/15/2024. (ahf)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Mon 08/12 9:46 PM
NOTICE by NATHAN CLARY Notice of Consent Filing for FLSA collective, signed by Christopher Negron (POLLINS, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Mon 08/12 9:45 PM
NOTICE by NATHAN CLARY Notice of Consent Filing for FLSA collective, signed by Tucker Goschinski (POLLINS, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 05/29 1:33 PM
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SET FOR 8/15/2024 10:00 AM Via Video/Telephone Conference BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 5/29/24. 5/29/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order Thu 05/16 8:05 AM
ORDER THAT THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE CAROL MOORE WELLS, UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO IMMEDIATELY CONTACT JUDGE WELLS CHAMBERS TO CHOOSE A MUTUALLY CONVENIENT DATE FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, TO TAKE PLACE IN AUGUST, DEPENDING ON JUDGE WELLS AVAILABILITY. WITHIN SEVEN (7) DAYS OF THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WITH JUDGE WELLS, THE PARTIES SHALL FILE A JOINT STATUS REPORT. THEREAFTER, IF NEEDED, THE COURT SHALL SCHEDULE A TELEPHONIC RULE 16 STATUS CONFERENCE TO ADDRESS FURTHER SCHEDULING. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 5/15/24. 5/16/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
19 19 order Consent and Order to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 05/09 7:56 AM
CONSENT AND ORDER TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO A RANDOMLY ASSIGNED UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE TO CONDUCT ALL PROCEEDINGS AND ORDER THE ENTRY OF A FINAL JUDGMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH 28 U.S.C. § 636(C) AND FED. R. CIV. P. 73. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 5/8/24. 5/9/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) Modified on 5/9/2024 (jaa, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CLERK'S MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT
18 18 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge (Not Social Security) Wed 05/08 3:23 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by BRETT SABOL PLUMBING & HEATING, LLC.. (BATOFF, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Scheduling Order Tue 04/30 11:21 AM
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS, SCHEDULING ORDER:( FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/12/2025 10:00 AM IN Video Conference BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE., DISCOVERY DUE BY 8/29/2024., MOTIONS DUE BY 11/12/2024., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 11/12/2024. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 4/30/24. 4/30/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Tue 04/30 10:56 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE RULE 16 Conference held on 4/30/24. (JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
15 15 misc Report Of Tue 04/23 10:49 AM
Report Of Joint Report of FRCivP 26f Meeting by NATHAN CLARY. (POLLINS, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/01 5:20 PM
NOTICE by NATHAN CLARY Notice of Consent Filing for FLSA collective, signed by Joey Corsey (POLLINS, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
13 13 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Tue 03/19 4:44 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by BRETT SABOL PLUMBING & HEATING, LLC, BRETT T. SABOL.(BATOFF, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/19 4:35 PM
Defendants ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by BRETT SABOL PLUMBING & HEATING, LLC, BRETT T. SABOL.(BATOFF, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order Setting Answer Deadline Stipulation and Order Tue 03/05 10:16 AM
JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 3/4/24. 3/5/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
10 10 misc Stipulation Mon 03/04 1:32 PM
STIPULATION for Extn of Deadline for Defs to File Answer and AD to Pltfs Complaint by BRETT SABOL PLUMBING & HEATING, LLC, BRETT T. SABOL. (BATOFF, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/22 8:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRANDON SHABY SHEMTOB on behalf of BRETT SABOL PLUMBING & HEATING, LLC, Brett Sabol Plumbing & Heating, LLC with Certificate of Service(SHEMTOB, BRANDON)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/22 8:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER V. BATOFF on behalf of BRETT SABOL PLUMBING & HEATING, LLC, Brett Sabol Plumbing & Heating, LLC with Certificate of Service(BATOFF, ALEXANDER)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
misc Remark Mon 02/12 12:20 PM
DOC. 7 MAILED TO UNREPS. (sg)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 02/09 12:08 PM
ORDER THAT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/30/2024 10:00 AM IN Video Conference BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 2/9/24. 2/9/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO UNREPS. (jaa, )
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/09 10:42 AM
NOTICE by NATHAN CLARY Notice of Consent Filing for FLSA collective, signed by Joseph Garber (POLLINS, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/08 2:43 PM
NOTICE by NATHAN CLARY Notice of Consent Filing for FLSA collective, signed by Hamzah Mohammed (POLLINS, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/08 2:41 PM
NOTICE by NATHAN CLARY FLSA Plaintiff Consent Form signed by Nathan Clary (POLLINS, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 01/09 6:30 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NATHAN CLARY. All Defendants. (POLLINS, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 12/20 3:40 PM
Summons Issued as to BRETT SABOL PLUMBING & HEATING, LLC, BRETT T. SABOL. EMAILED To: COUNSEL on 12/20/23. (jaa, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 12/20 1:12 PM
COMPLAINT against Brett Sabol Plumbing & Heating, LLC, Brett T sabol ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17144914.), filed by nathan clary.(POLLINS, SCOTT)
Related: [-]