West Virginia Southern District Court
Judge:Frank W Volk
Case #: 5:23-cv-00802
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jun 17, 2024 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By
Lauren E. Motes
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Jill Cranston Rice
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Alex Manuel Greenberg
Huddleston Bolen
contact info
Defendant
Bodyshopbids, Inc.
Represented By
Debra Tedeschi Varner
Varner & Van Volkenburg
contact info
Mariah A. Young
Cooley
contact info
Robert Earles
Cooley
contact info
Jeffrey D. Van Volkenburg
Varner & Van Volkenburg
contact info
Plaintiff
Terry Vanover
Represented By
George W. Sidiropolis
Flanigan Legal
contact info
George N. Sidiropolis
Flanigan Legal
contact info
David A. Bosak
Bailey Javins & Carter
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
192 192 5 pgs respm Memorandum In Support Thu 05/15 12:37 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Terry Vanover in support of191 MOTION by Terry Vanover to File Exhibits 2-4 to 190 Consolidated Reply Under Seal (New, Stephen)
Related: [-]
191 191 motion Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; Sends NEF ; No Document Access) Thu 05/15 12:37 PM
MOTION by Terry Vanover to File Exhibits 2-4 to190 Consolidated Reply Under Seal(New, Stephen) (Modified on 5/15/2025 to add link to #190 reply) (ts)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 2,
Att: 2 Exhibit 3,
Att: 3 Exhibit 4
190 190 respm Reply To Response Thu 05/15 12:35 PM
CONSOLIDATED REPLY by Terry Vanover to185 Response In Opposition,187 Memorandum In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(New, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
189 189 respm Reply To Response Wed 05/14 1:56 PM
REPLY by Terry Vanover to186 Consolidated and Joint Memorandum (New, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
188 188 respm Response In Opposition Mon 05/12 3:17 PM
COMBINED RESPONSE by Terry Vanover in opposition to176 MOTION by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company to Strike Untimely169 Memorandum In Opposition,177 MOTION by Bodyshopbids, Inc. to Strike Untimely172 MEMORANDUM of Law by Terry Vanover in opposition to 163 MOTION by Bodyshopbids, Inc. for Summary Judgment (New, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
187 187 17 pgs respm Memorandum In Opposition Thu 05/08 11:31 PM
MEMORANDUM by Bodyshopbids, Inc. in opposition to166 MOTION by Terry Vanover to Amend Complaint to Seek Class Certification and to Certify Class re:57 Amended Complaint(Baldwin, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
186 186 15 pgs respm Memorandum In Support Thu 05/08 5:15 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in support of167 MOTION by Terry Vanover to File Exhibits 2, 3, 4, 5, 6 and 8 to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint to Seek Class Certification and to Certify Class Under Seal Pursuant to Protective Order,170 MOTION by Terry Vanover to File Exhibits to Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition (ECF No. 169) to MOTION by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for Summary Judgment Under Seal Pursuant to Protective Order,173 MOTION by Terry Vanover to File Exhibits to Memorandum of Law (ECF No. 172) in Opposition to Bodyshopbids, Inc.'s Motion for Summmary Judgment Under Seal Pursuant to Protective Order(Rice, Jill)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C
185 185 respm Response In Opposition Thu 05/08 4:42 PM
RESPONSE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company in opposition to166 MOTION by Terry Vanover to Amend Complaint to Seek Class Certification and to Certify Class re:57 Amended Complaint(Rice, Jill)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G