New York Southern District Court
Judge:Katherine Polk Failla
Case #: 1:23-cv-11030
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause09:1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2023
Case in other court:California Central, 2:23-cv-07579
Last checked: Monday Jun 17, 2024 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
Warnermedia Direct, LLC
Represented By
Michael W McTigue, Jr
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Meredith Slawe
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Michael W McTigue, Jr.
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Jason D. Russell
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher And Flom LLP
contact info
Petitioner
Marcus Brooks
Represented By
Patrick A. Huber
Keller Postman Lloc
contact info
Albert Pak
Keller Postman LLC
contact info
Patrick Alan Huber
Keller Postman LLC
contact info
Frank Davis
Davis And Norris LLP
contact info
Warren D Postman
Keller Lenkner LLC
contact info
Wesley W Barnett
Davis And Norris LLP
contact info
Dargan M. Ware
Davis And Norris LLP
contact info
Albert Young Pak
Keller Postman LLC
contact info
Jae Kook Kim
Lynch Carpenter, LLP
contact info
Petitioner
Katharine Guzenski
Represented By
Patrick A. Huber
Keller Postman Lloc
contact info
Albert Pak
Keller Postman LLC
contact info
Patrick Alan Huber
Keller Postman LLC
contact info
Frank Davis
Davis And Norris LLP
contact info
Warren D Postman
Keller Lenkner LLC
contact info
Wesley W Barnett
Davis And Norris LLP
contact info
Dargan M. Ware
Davis And Norris LLP
contact info
Albert Young Pak
Keller Postman LLC
contact info
Jae Kook Kim
Lynch Carpenter, LLP
contact info
Petitioner
Rodrigo Maldonado
Represented By
Patrick A. Huber
Keller Postman Lloc
contact info
Albert Pak
Keller Postman LLC
contact info
Patrick Alan Huber
Keller Postman LLC
contact info
Frank Davis
Davis And Norris LLP
contact info
Warren D Postman
Keller Lenkner LLC
contact info
Wesley W Barnett
Davis And Norris LLP
contact info
Dargan M. Ware
Davis And Norris LLP
contact info
Albert Young Pak
Keller Postman LLC
contact info
Jae Kook Kim
Lynch Carpenter, LLP
contact info
Petitioner
Candida Ortiz
Represented By
Patrick A. Huber
Keller Postman Lloc
contact info
Albert Pak
Keller Postman LLC
contact info
Patrick Alan Huber
Keller Postman LLC
contact info
Frank Davis
Davis And Norris LLP
contact info
Warren D Postman
Keller Lenkner LLC
contact info
Wesley W Barnett
Davis And Norris LLP
contact info
Dargan M. Ware
Davis And Norris LLP
contact info
Albert Young Pak
Keller Postman LLC
contact info
Jae Kook Kim
Lynch Carpenter, LLP
contact info
Petitioner
Courtney Walker
Represented By
Patrick A. Huber
Keller Postman Lloc
contact info
Albert Pak
Keller Postman LLC
contact info
Patrick Alan Huber
Keller Postman LLC
contact info
Frank Davis
Davis And Norris LLP
contact info
Warren D Postman
Keller Lenkner LLC
contact info
Wesley W Barnett
Davis And Norris LLP
contact info
Dargan M. Ware
Davis And Norris LLP
contact info
Albert Young Pak
Keller Postman LLC
contact info
Jae Kook Kim
Lynch Carpenter, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 17, 2025
111 111 misc Letter Mon 03/17 12:42 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Kiran Bhat dated March 17, 2025 re: Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority (ECF No. 110). Document filed by Marcus Brooks, Katharine Guzenski, Rodrigo Maldonado, Candida Ortiz, Courtney Walker..(Bhat, Kiran)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
110 110 misc Letter Thu 03/13 5:54 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Michael W. McTigue Jr. dated March 13, 2025 re: Submission of New Authority on WarnerMedia's Cross-Motion to Compel Arbitration ECF No.48 . Document filed by Warnermedia Direct, LLC..(McTigue, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Pilon et al. v. Discovery Communications