California Southern District Court
Judge:Linda Lopez
Referred: Karen S Crawford
Case #: 3:23-cv-02319
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:0271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jun 17, 2024 1:17 AM PDT
Defendant
Sports Inovation Corp.
Represented By
Kevin Michael Bell
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
contact info
James Y.C. Sze
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
contact info
Kristopher L Reed
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Slick Slide LLC
Represented By
William F. Small, III
Small Law PC
contact info
Brett A Schatz
Wood, Herron & Evans LLP
contact info

GPO Nov 19 2024
ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion to Stay re (ECF No.23) Motion to Stay. Case stayed until pending resolution of the Colorado case, Slick Slide LLC v. Reed, No. 23cv1649- CNS-NRN (D. Colo. filed June 28, 2023). Joint Status Report due by 2/18/2025. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 11/19/2024. (mef)

Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
28 28 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 11/19 3:17 PM
ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion to Stay re (ECF No.23 ) Motion to Stay. Case stayed until pending resolution of the Colorado case, Slick Slide LLC v. Reed, No. 23cv1649 CNS-NRN (D. Colo. filed June 28, 2023). Joint Status Report due by 2/18/2025. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 11/19/2024. (mef)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
27 27 minutes ~Util - Terminate Hearings Mon 06/03 12:24 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: The Court vacates the June 4, 2024 Status Conference. Counsel must contact Judge Crawford's chambers regarding resetting the Status Conference within three (3) days of the Court's ruling on defendant's Motion to Stay (Doc. No. 23) if the case is not stayed.(no document attached) (kxb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
26 26 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 05/07 3:33 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re23 MOTION to Stay Defendants Notice of Motion to Stay and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Sports Inovation Corp.. Related [+] (ddf)
Related: [-] ed, Kristopher
Att: 1 17 pgs Exhibit A
Monday, April 29, 2024
25 25 order Order Mon 04/29 6:30 PM
ORDER: The parties have lodged a Joint Discovery Statement with Chambers, pursuant to Section VIII. of Judge Crawford's Civil Chambers Rules. After reviewing the Joint Discovery Statement, the Court resets the deadline for defendant True Movement Tech ("Defendant") to respond to plaintiff Slick Slide LLCs ("Plaintiff") written discovery requests. If Defendant's pending Motion to Stay (Doc. No. 23) is denied, Defendant must serve substantive responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Document Requests within fourteen days of the Court's ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 4/29/24.(no document attached) (kxb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
24 24 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/23 12:35 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re23 MOTION to Stay Defendants Notice of Motion to Stay and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Slick Slide LLC. (Schatz, Brett) (ddf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
23 23 motion Stay Tue 04/09 3:06 PM
MOTION to Stay Defendants Notice of Motion to Stay and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Sports Inovation Corp.. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Kristopher
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Monday, April 01, 2024
22 22 minutes Case Management Conference Early Neutral Evaluation Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 04/01 5:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: An Early Neutral Evaluation Conference was held on April 1, 2024. The Case Management Conference was not held. Defendant must file any motion to stay and/or transfer the case on or before April 15, 2024. A telephonic Status Conference will be held on June 4, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. To join the Conference, counsel must call the Court's teleconference line: 1-877-873-8017; enter the Access Code: 2924630 (participants will then be put on hold until the Court activates the conference call); and when prompted, press * to bypass the Security Code.(Plaintiff Attorney Brett Schatz). (Defendant Attorneys Kristopher Reed & Kevin Bell). (no document attached) (kxb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order Wed 03/27 9:51 AM
ORDER Re Zoom Procedures For Early Neutral Evaluation And Case Management Confrence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 3/27/2024.(ddf)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk Wed 03/27 9:50 AM
PRO HAC APPROVED: Kevin Michael Bell appearing for Defendant Sports Inovation Corp. (no document attached) (jrd)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/27 8:13 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Related [+](Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Bell, Kevin)(jrd)
Related: [-] fer to ECF No.15 for payment and receipt information.
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/27 8:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by James Y.C. Sze on behalf of Sports Inovation Corp. (Sze, James)Attorney James Y.C. Sze added to party Sports Inovation Corp.(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
17 17 notice Joint Discovery Plan Mon 03/25 8:43 AM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Slick Slide LLC (Schatz, Brett)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Fri 03/22 2:02 PM
ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Kevin M. Bell, re15 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 3/22/2024.(rmc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
15 15 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/19 8:16 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $224.00 receipt number ACASDC-18681493.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Bell, Kevin)(jrd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
14 14 order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 03/05 10:42 AM
ORDER: The parties' Joint Motion to Continue the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference ("ENE") is granted. Doc. No. 13. The March 25, 2024 ENE and Case Management Conference are vacated and reset for April 1, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel must meet and confer pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) no later than March 11, 2024. The deadline to exchange Rule 26(a)(1)(A-D) initial disclosures, lodge confidential briefs, including ENE participant names and attorney contact information, and file the Joint Discovery Plan is March 25, 2024.Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 3/5/2024. (no document attached) (kxb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
13 13 motion Continue Fri 03/01 12:15 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference by Slick Slide LLC. (Schatz, Brett)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/26 9:31 AM
Notice: Judge Crawfords Civil Chambers Rules, General Considerations for Written Discovery, and Zoom Guidelines are updated effective February 22, 2024 and are available on the Courts website. The parties must familiarize themselves with these publications. (no document attached) (ddf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
11 11 7 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Tue 02/13 8:14 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference In A Patent Case; Rule 26 Compliance; And Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 2/12/2024.(ddf)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/09 12:57 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sports Inovation Corp.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Kristopher
9 9 11 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/09 12:53 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Sports Inovation Corp. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Kristopher
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/09 12:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kristopher L Reed on behalf of Sports Inovation Corp. Related [+]Attorney Kristopher L Reed added to party Sports Inovation Corp.(pty:dft)
Related: [-] ed, Kristopher
Monday, January 22, 2024
7 7 7 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/22 7:22 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Slick Slide LLC. Sports Inovation Corp. served. (Schatz, Brett)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
6 6 misc Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk Fri 12/29 8:15 AM
PRO HAC APPROVED: Brett A Schatz appearing for Plaintiff Slick Slide LLC. (no document attached) (jrd)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 12/29 5:46 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $224.00 receipt number ACASDC-18459223.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Schatz, Brett)(jrd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 12/20 11:51 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ggv)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Report Regarding Patent & Trademark FORM Wed 12/20 11:46 AM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *D973,821* cc:USPTO (ggv)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Wed 12/20 11:43 AM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Slick Slide LLC. No Parties With Financial Interest. (ggv)
Related: [-]
1 1 27 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 12/20 11:41 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Sports Inovation Corp. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18441074.), filed by Slick Slide LLC. The new case number is 3:23-cv-2319-LL-KSC. Judge Linda Lopez and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Small, William)(ggv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 9 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Exhibit I,
Att: 11 Exhibit J,
Att: 12 Exhibit K